Rocky Mountain Bank -v- Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Bank
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv04385
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2010 59 USCA Case Number 10-15522 9th Circuit Court of Appeals DOCKETED AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/17/2010. Transcript ordered by 03/29/2010. Transcript due 04/27/2010. Appellant MediaPost Communications opening brief due 06/07/2010. Appellee Google, Inc. and Appellee Rocky Mountain Bank answering brief due 07/06/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. re: 54 Notice of Appeal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/10/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2010 58 AMENDED Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 54 Notice of Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
January 27, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MEDIAPOSTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; GRANTING MEDIAPOST LIMITED INTERVENTION; DENYING MEDIAPOSTS MOTION TO UNSEALgranting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Reconsideration re 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 48 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by MediaPost Communications (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 14, 2010 52 Reply Memorandum re 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 48 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed byMediaPost Communications. (Craven-Green, Erica) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 11, 2010 51 AMENDED DOCUMENT to 50 Memorandum in Opposition to Non-Party Mediapost's re 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 48 Order on Motion for Leave to File. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 1/11/2010) Modified on 1/12/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2010 50 Memorandum in Opposition re 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 48 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 28, 2009 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 48 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by MediaPost Communications. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Craven-Green, Erica) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 16, 2009 48 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MEDIAPOST COMMUNICATIONS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge James Ware granting 47 Motion for Leave to File (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 9, 2009 47 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by MediaPost Communications. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Craven-Green, Erica) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 4, 2009 46 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 40 Motion to Intervene; denying 42 Motion to Unseal Document (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
November 20, 2009 45 Reply Memorandum re 42 MOTION to Unseal Document, 40 MOTION to Intervene filed byMediaPost Communications. (Craven-Green, Erica) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
October 21, 2009 44 RESPONSE to NON-Party Mediapost's 42 MOTION to Unseal Document, 40 MOTION to Intervene filed by Google, Inc.. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 10/21/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2009 43 Proposed Order re 42 MOTION to Unseal Google's report lodged with the Court in chambers by MediaPost Communications. (Craven-Green, Erica) (Filed on 10/20/2009) Modified on 10/23/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2009 42 MOTION to Unseal Google's report filed by MediaPost Communications. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Craven-Green, Erica) (Filed on 10/20/2009) Modified on 10/23/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2009 41 Proposed Order re 40 MOTION to Intervene by MediaPost Communications. (Craven-Green, Erica) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 40 MOTION to Intervene filed by MediaPost Communications. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Craven-Green, Erica) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
September 28, 2009 39 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING TO VACATE THE COURT'S SEPTEMBER 23, 2009 ORDER GRANTING THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re 34 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 28, 2009 38 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice re 33 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 28, 2009 37 Featured Case ORDER Finding as Moot 13 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 28, 2009 36 Featured Case ORDER Granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Albert Gidari. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 28, 2009 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 28, 2009 34 Proposed Order TO VACATE THE COURTS SEPTEMBER 23, 2009 ORDER GRANTING THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Google, Inc.. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 28, 2009 33 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) by Google, Inc.. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 9/28/2009) Modified on 9/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2009 32 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING FROM 9/28/2009 to 10/5/2009 re 30 Motion to Vacate; Finding as Moot 28 Motion to Vacate. Stipulated Dismissal and Request to Vacate TRO due 10/1/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/25/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 31 Proposed Order re 30 Amended MOTION to Vacate Hearing on 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. by Google, Inc.. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified on 9/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2009 30 Amended MOTION to Vacate Hearing On Plaintiff's 15 Motion For Preliminary Injunction and TRO related document 23 order amendment to 28 filed by Google, Inc.. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified on 9/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2009 29 Proposed Order 28 Motion To Vacate Hearing On Plaintiff's 15 Motion for TRO and MOTION For Preliminary Injunction related document 23 Order. by Google, Inc.. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified on 9/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2009 28 Joint MOTION to Vacate Hearing on 15 Motion for TRO and Motion For Preliminary Injunction related document 23 Order filed by Google, Inc.. (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified on 9/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2009 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 26 Proposed Order, 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611005992.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 26 Proposed Order re 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Albert Gidari by Google, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Albert Gidari ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611005992.) filed by Google, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy Philip Sauro (Sauro, Troy) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 23, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing re Preliminary Injunction set for 9/28/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 23 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 8 Motion for TRO; granting 15 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff shall serve this Order on Defendant on or before 9/24/2009. Any Response from Defendant shall be file on or before 9/25/2009. Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 9/28/2009 9:00 AM(jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009) Modified docket text on 9/23/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull remains the Referral Judge in this case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/22/09. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 22, 2009 21 CLERKS NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2010 10:00 AM Before the Honorable James Ware in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2009. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 22, 2009 20 REDACTED Declaration of Mark Hendrickson in Support of Motion to Seal to File Under Seal 6 filed by Rocky Mountain Bank. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2009: # 1 Signature Page) (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2009 19 REDACTED MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re 9 filed by Rocky Mountain Bank. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 22, 2009 18 REDACTION to 1 Complaint by Rocky Mountain Bank re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Verification) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/23/2009,(Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Redaction.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2009 17 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Rocky Mountain Bank. (Horoupian, Grace) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 16 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Rocky Mountain Bank. (Horoupian, Grace) (Filed on 9/21/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rocky Mountain Bank. (Horoupian, Grace) (Filed on 9/21/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/25/2009,(Counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 14 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by Rocky Mountain Bank. (Horoupian, Grace) (Filed on 9/21/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 13 MOTION to Seal Documents Complaint, Motion for Injunctive Relief and ALL other pleadings AND filings under seal. filed by Rocky Mountain Bank. (Horoupian, Grace) (Filed on 9/21/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/23/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 12 REDACTED Certificate of Interested Parties re ( 2 ) by Rocky Mountain Bank (Horoupian, Grace) (Filed on 9/21/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2009 11 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte for Magistrate Judge Trumbull Denying 5 Motion to File Pleadings Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 18, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 18, 2009 10 (Proposed) Order Granting MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re ( 8 ) by Rocky Mountain Bank. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL
September 18, 2009 9 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re 8 filed by Rocky Mountain Bank. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL ).
September 18, 2009 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Rocky Mountain Bank. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009) DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2009 7 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal re 5 MOTION to Seal Case by Rocky Mountain Bank. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009) DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2009 6 Declaration of Mark Hendrickson in Support of Motion to Seal to File Under Seal re ( 5 ) filed by Rocky Mountain Bank. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL
September 18, 2009 5 MOTION to File Pleading Under Seal filed by Rocky Mountain Bank. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL
September 17, 2009 4 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 17, 2009 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2010. Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2010 02:00 PM. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 17, 2009 2 Certification of Interested Parties by Rocky Mountain Bank (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009) DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2009 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611005932). Filed by Rocky Mountain Bank. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Bank -v- Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Bank
Represented By: Grace Y Horoupian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]