"In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation" Featured Case

Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Gould
Case Number: 5:2010cv02389
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: El Dorado
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2012 120 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 10/17/11 and 03/28/11 before Judge James Ware, re 116 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 5/21/2012. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
March 22, 2012 118 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/29/2012. Transcript ordered by 04/20/2012. Transcript due 05/21/2012. Appellant Mike Robertson opening brief due 06/29/2012. Appellee Facebook, Inc. answering brief due 07/30/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. 8113124 (GR) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2012 117 USCA Case Number 12-15619 USCA for the Ninth Circuit. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2012 119 Transmission of Notice of Appeal(over sized)and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Mike Robertson (Attachments: # 1 Docket, # 2 Document 91, # 3 Document 106, # 4 Document 107, # 5 Document 115)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 116 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Mike Robertson.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-6681631 paid.) (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
February 21, 2012 115 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 109 Motion to Alter Judgment (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 3, 2012 114 REPLY (re 109 MOTION to Alter Judgment ) filed byDavid Gould, Mike Robertson. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 20, 2012 113 RESPONSE (re 109 MOTION to Alter Judgment ) (Opposition) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 12, 2012 112 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 108 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sean Patrick Reis; Benjamin Harris Richman; Christopher Lilliard Dore and Jay Edelson terminated (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 3, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 108 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Edelson McGuire LLC's and Edelson McGuire LLP's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs David Gould and Mike Robertson. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 111 Featured Case Set/Reset Deadlines as to 109 MOTION to Alter Judgment, 110 Stipulation., STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 Stipulation filed by Facebook, Inc. Responses due by 1/20/2012. Replies due by 2/3/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/3/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 23, 2011 110 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT (CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(B)) by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 20, 2011 109 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by David Gould, Mike Robertson. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 1/3/2012. Replies due by 1/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 12/20/2011) Modified on 1/3/2012 (sis, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2011 108 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Edelson McGuire LLC's and Edelson McGuire LLP's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs David Gould and Mike Robertson filed by David Gould, Mike Robertson. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 1/3/2012. Replies due by 1/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dore, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
November 22, 2011 107 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 22, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 22, 2011 106 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 96 Motion to Dismiss (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
October 31, 2011 105 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 17, 2011, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2012. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 28, 2011 104 Brief re 101 Opposition/Response to Motion Request for Consideration of Supplemental Authorities filed byMike Robertson. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 17, 2011 103 Minute Entry: Arguments heard, matter submitted. Court to issue order.Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2011 before James Ware (Date Filed: 10/17/2011) re 96 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/17/2011)
September 1, 2011 102 REPLY (re 96 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 11, 2011 101 RESPONSE (re 96 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) filed byDavid Gould, Mike Robertson. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
July 27, 2011 100 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 Stipulation, filed by Facebook, Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/27/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 19, 2011 99 STIPULATION re 96 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule For Motion To Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Complaint (Civil Local Rule 6-1(B)) by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 15, 2011 Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 98 Request for Judicial Notice re 96 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 96 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 97 Declaration of ANA YANG MULLER in Support of 96 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 96 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 96 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 7/29/2011. Replies due by 8/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 95 Featured Case ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
June 24, 2011 94 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING re 93 Stipulation filed by Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/24/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 20, 2011 93 STIPULATION re 92 Amended Complaint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (L.R. 6-1(a)) by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 13, 2011 92 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Consolidated Complaint) against Facebook, Inc.. Filed byMike Robertson, David Gould. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
May 12, 2011 91 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to Dismiss (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
April 20, 2011 90 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 28, 2011, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, Telephone number (408) 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2011. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 10, 2011 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Reginald Von Terrell (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 4/10/2011)
March 28, 2011 88 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2011 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 3/28/2011) re 75 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Gina Colin.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2011)
March 14, 2011 87 REPLY (re 75 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
February 25, 2011 86 RESPONSE (re 75 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byDavid Gould. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 9, 2011 85 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the discussion at the Conference, the Court refers the parties to Judge Grewal as to any disputes with respect to discovery. However, the Court declines to address the issue of bifurcation or consolidation of discovery at this time. The Court will set a Further Case Management Conference date in its Order addressing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 7, 2011 84 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 2/7/2011 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 2/7/2011). The Court referred any discovery disputes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal as to BOTH cases. The Court to issue Further Case Management Conference dates in both cases to follow the pending motion to dismiss in C-10-02389 JW, In re Facebook Privacy Litigation. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2011)
February 3, 2011 83 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 28, 2011 82 Featured Case ORDER Granting 79 Motion to Relate Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1) Noble v. Facebook, Inc., No. 10-cv-05781-HRL, is related to In re Facebook Privacy Litigation, No. 10-cv-02389-JW, the lower numbered case, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 and, accordingly, should be reassigned to the Honorable James Ware. 2) Noble v. Facebook, Inc., No. 10-cv-05781-HRL, and In re Facebook Privacy Litigation, No. 10-cv-02389-JW, are consolidated for all purposes into one action, and the Noble action, No. 10-cv-05781, shall be administratively closed. 3) All future filings shall be made in, and bear the caption of, In re Facebook Privacy Litigation, No. 10-cv-02389-JW, which will be the lead case. The existing Consolidated Class Action Complaint in In re Facebook Privacy Litigation shall be the operative complaint in the consolidated action. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 21, 2011 81 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mike Robertson. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 13, 2011 80 STIPULATION re 79 MOTION to Relate Case Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To Relate and Consolidate Cases by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 79 MOTION to Relate Case Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To Relate and Consolidate Cases filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 10, 2011 78 Proposed Order re 75 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/11/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 77 Declaration of ANA YANG in Support of 76 Request for Judicial Notice, 75 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C)(Related document(s) 76 , 75 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 76 Request for Judicial Notice re 75 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 75 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 75 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 29, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 74 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 1/31/2011 to 2/7/2011 re 73 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 23, 2010 73 STIPULATION to continue Jan. 31, 2011 CMC to Feb. 7, 2011 by David Gould. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 21, 2010 72 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 66 MOTION TO RELATE CASES; CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Court consolidates these ActionsCV 10-02389 and CV 10-05301into one action. The Clerk of Court shall consolidate these actions such that the earliest filed action, CV 10-02389, is the lead case. All future filings shall be in CV 10-02389 and bear the caption: "In re Facebook Privacy Litigation." Since the later action is now consumed in first filed action, the Clerk shall administratively close CV 10-05301. All future related cases shall be automatically consolidated and administratively closed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 10, 2010 ***1/24/2011 CMC Deadlines terminated. CMC reset for 1/31/2011 at 10:00 AM. See Order (69 in 5:10-cv-02389-JW) and Order (26 in 5:10-cv-04680-JW) for further specifics. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 71 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re 68 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Freed (Freed, Eric) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT FACEBOOK'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; GRANTING DEFENDANT ZYNGA'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL. In sum, the Court DENIES Facebook's Motion to Consolidate and GRANTS Zynga's Motion to Consolidate: (1) The Court consolidates the Zynga ActionsCV 10-04680, CV 10-04902, CV 10-04723, CV 10-04793, CV 10-04794, CV 10-04930, CV 10-04935 and CV 10-05192into one action. The Clerk of Court shall consolidate these actions such that the earliest filed action, CV 10-04680, is the lead case. All future filings shall be in CV 10-04680 and bear the caption: "In re Zynga Privacy Litigation." All future related cases shall be automatically consolidated and administratively closed. Since the later actions are now consumed in first filed action, the Clerk shall administratively close CV 10-04902, CV 10-04723, CV 10-04793, CV 10-04794, CV 10-04930, CV 10-04935 and CV 10-05192. The Court appoints Adam J. Levitt of Wolf, Halderstein, Adler, Freeman and Herz, LLC; Jonathan Shub of Seeger Weiss, LLP; and Michael Aschenbrener of Edelson McGuire, LLC as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. On or before January 10, 2011, Plaintiffs in the In re Zynga Privacy Litigation shall file a Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. The Court sets a Case Management Conference for January 31, 2011 at 9 a.m. for both In re Facebook Privacy Litigation and In re Zynga Privacy Litigation to discuss coordination of the two Actions. On or before January 14, 2011, In re Facebook Privacy Litigation and In re Zynga Privacy Litigation shall file a Joint Case Management Statement. The Statement shall include a good faith plan for coordination and contain, among other things, a proposed schedule for coordinated discovery. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 8, 2010 68 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R. 6-2) by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 7, 2010 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 7, 2010 66 MOTION to Relate Case (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Stipulation ISO Motion, # 6 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 23, 2010 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 58 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 11/23/2010) Modified on 11/24/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2010 64 RESPONSE to Court 47 order Dated November 12, 2010 Requesting Court Separately Consolidate Related Cases as In Re: Zynga Privacy Litigation, Designate Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel filed by Valerie Gudac, Richard Beiles. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam J. Levitt In Support of Majority Group Plaintiffs' Response to Court order Dated November 12, 2010 Requesting court Separately Consolidate Related Cases as In Re: Zynga Privacy Litigation, Designate Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 11/23/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 63 RESPONSE to re 47 Order Relating Case by David Gould, Mike Robertson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Aschenbrener Declaration)(Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 62 Declaration of William OHara, Karen Bryant, Iris Phee, Christopher Brock in Support of 59 Brief, Plaintiff O'Hara's and Bryant's Response to this Court's 47 November 15, 2010 Order Re: Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiff and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Christopher Brock, Karen Bryant. (Related document(s) 59 ) (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 61 Declaration of Jeff S. Westerman in Support of 59 Brief, Plaintiff O'Hara's and Bryant's Response to this Court's 47 November 15, 2010 Order Re: Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiff and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Christopher Brock, Karen Bryant. (Related document(s) 59 ) (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 60 Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in Support of 59 Brief, Plaintiff O'Hara's and Bryant's Response to this Court's 47 November 15, 2010 Order Re: Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiff and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Christopher Brock, Karen Bryant. (Related document(s) 59 ) (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 59 MEMORANDUM in support of 47 Order filed by Christopher Brock, Karen Bryant. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 58 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for All Purposes and to Address Related Issues in Response to Court's November 12, 2010 and 53 Order November 19, 2010 filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 57 RESPONSE to re 47 Order Relating Case by Barbara Moskowitz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lurie, Jordan) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 56 RESPONSE to Request for 47 Order 53 Order re: Briefing Re: Case Consolidation by Zynga Game Network Inc. (Seabolt, Richard) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wendy Marfeo re 54 Response (Zevin, Matthew) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 54 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO 47 CONSOLIDATION AND IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD PLAINTIFF AND CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Interested Party Wendy Marfeo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E *** First Amended Class Action Complaint case no. 10-262 District of Rhode Island )(Zevin, Matthew) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Bryant v. Facebook, Inc., Case No. CV 10-05192-PVT to In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation, Case No. CV 10-02389-JW. On or before November 22, 2010, the parties shall file briefs as to whether this related action should be consolidated into the current action, In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation, or consolidated as a separate action, In Re: Zynga Litigation. In their briefs, the parties shall nominate Lead Plaintiffs as well as Lead Counsel. The Court will take the parties' briefs under submission without oral argument. See Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). Related cases: Create association to 5:10-cv-05192-PVT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 19, 2010 52 Featured Case ORDER Granting 51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher L. Dore. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher L. Dore ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008550.) filed by David Gould, Mike Robertson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 17, 2010 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Brock, Karen Bryant re 49 Declaration in Support, 48 MOTION to Relate Case (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 49 Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in Support of 48 MOTION to Relate Case filed byChristopher Brock, Karen Bryant. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 48 ) (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 48 MOTION to Relate Case C10-5192 PVTfiled by Karen Bryant, Christopher Brock. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 11/17/2010) Modified on 11/17/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2010 47 GRANTING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Graf v. Zynga, Case No. CV 10- 04680-WHA, Albini v. Zynga; Facebook, Inc., Case No. CV 10-04723-JL, Gudac v. Zynga, Case No. CV 10-04793-EMC, Schreiber v. Zynga, Case No. CV 10-04794-JCS, Swanson v. Zynga, Case No. 10-04902-HRL, Carmel-Jessup v. Facebook; Zynga, Case No. 10-04930-MEJ and Phee v. Facebook; Zynga, Case No. CV 10-04935-SC, to In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation, Case No. CV 10-02389-JW. Defendant Zynga, in its Motion to Relate, raises the issue of whether these related actions should be consolidated into a single action. The Court invites the parties to fully brief the issue. On or before 11/22/2010, the parties shall file briefs as to whether these related actions should be consolidated into the current action, In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation or consolidated as a separate action, In Re: Zynga Litigation. In their briefs, the parties shall nominate Lead Plaintiffs as well as Lead Counsel. The Court will take the parties briefs under submission without oral argument. Motions terminated: (10 in 3:10-cv-04794-RS) First MOTION to Relate Case filed by Howard L. Schreiber, (41 in 5:10-cv-02389-JW) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Zynga Game Network Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 10, 2010 46 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER RE: CLASS DISCOVERY: Accordingly, the 11/15/2010 Case Management Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule regarding the first phase of this case, which shall focus on class discovery only: Close of All Discovery due by 4/18/2011. Further Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing on anticipated Class Certification Motion set for 6/20/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010) Modified on 11/10/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/12/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2010 45 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File documents #41, #42 and [Proposed] Order and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 5, 2010 44 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 43 Proposed Order re 41 MOTION to Relate Case by Zynga Game Network Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 42 Declaration of Richard L. Seabolt in Support of 41 MOTION to Relate Case filed byZynga Game Network Inc. (Related document(s) 41 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases by ("Zynga") is a defendant in seven cases. C10-4680 WHA, C10-4723 JL, C10-4793 EMC, C10-4794 RS, C10-4902 HRL, C10-4930 MEJ and C10-4935 SC. filed by Zynga Game Network Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 40 Featured Case ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline to file response by 12/10/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/5/2100. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/5/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2010 39 Proposed Order re 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Facebook, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 11/4/2010) Modified on 11/5/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2010 38 Declaration of James M. Penning in Support of 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant s Administrative Motion To Extend Deadline To Respond To Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Penning, James) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant s Administrative Motion To Extend Deadline To Respond To Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Penning, James) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 11, 2010 36 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc.. Filed by David Gould, Mike Robertson. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 10/11/2010) Modified on 10/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 35 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.Plaintiffs shall file its Consolidated 10/11/2010. Defendant shall file its Response in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or by date set in the parties' Stipulation. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 29, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by GDB on 9/29/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 34 NOTICE by Mike Robertson of Unavailability of Counsel (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 24, 2010 33 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/24/2010) Modified on 9/27/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2010 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/24/2010) Modified text on 9/27/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2010 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by David Gould (Richman, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 21, 2010 30 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 9/29/10 at 2:30 p.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 712-775-7300 and use access code 847955. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 17, 2010 29 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff Robertson (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff Gould (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 9, 2010 25 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 9/27/2010 to 10/4/2010 re 24 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2010. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***CMC Deadlines terminated re 23 Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 8, 2010 24 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference to October 4, 2010 by Mike Robertson. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 20, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AS MODIFIED re (19 in 5:10-cv-02389-JW) Stipulation, (12 in 5:10-cv-02408-JW) Stipulation. As it was first filed, Case No. C 10-02389-JW will be the lead case for consolidation. All future filings shall bear the caption: In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation. In light of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall immediately close Case No. C 10-02408- JW. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. ***Set/Reset CMC Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 11, 2010 22 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re (8 in 5:10-cv-02408-JW) Stipulation, (18 in 5:10-cv-02389-JW) Stipulation. Response due 8/13/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 21 CLERKS NOTICE The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 10, 2010 20 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedinsg (L.R. 3-13) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 19 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Cases for All Purposes, Allowing for the Filing of a Consolidated Complaint, Setting a Case Management Conference for October 25, 2010, and Appointing Lead Counsel by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
July 27, 2010 18 STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 26, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 14 Motion to Relate Case (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 21, 2010 16 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re 14 MOTION to Relate C10-2389 JW and C10-2408 JF Case by Mike Robertson. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/21/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2010 15 Declaration of Kassra P. Nassiri in Support of 14 MOTION to Relate Case filed byMike Robertson. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 14 MOTION to Relate C10-2389 JW and C10-2408 JF Cases filed by Mike Robertson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/21/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER Granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin H. Richman. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/6/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Aschenbrener. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/6/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin H. Richman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007651.) filed by David Gould. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Aschenbrener ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007650.) filed by David Gould. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 28, 2010 9 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re 8 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 24, 2010 8 STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 22, 2010 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Gould OF SUMMONS (Reis, Sean) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 15, 2010 6 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 06/15/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 15, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings:, ***Deadlines terminated. 5 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 15, 2010 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 11, 2010 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by David Gould. (Reis, Sean) (Filed on 6/11/2010) Modified on 6/11/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern California District Court) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 1 Class Action COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611007443). Filed by David Gould. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: "In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation"
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gould
Represented By: Michael James Aschenbrener
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]