Digital Chocolate, Inc v. Zynga Game Network, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Digital Chocolate, Inc
Defendant: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03758
Filed: August 24, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2010 10 STIPULATION Second Stipulation Extending Time by Which Defendant Zynga Game Network Inc. Must Respond to the Complaint by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 10/7/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
August 24, 2010 1 COMPLAINT Seeking Damages and Injunctive Relief (Summons Issued); jury demand; OVERSIZED DOCUMENT against Zynga Game Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611049715). Filed by Digital Chocolate, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to Complaint) (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/31/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 5 Exhibit E to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit F to Complaint, # 7 Exhibit G to Complaint, # 8 Exhibit H to Complaint, # 9 Exhibit I to Complaint) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 10 Exhibit J to Complaint, # 11 Exhibit K to Complaint, # 12 Exhibit L to Complaint, # 13 Exhibit M to Complaint, # 14 Exhibit N to Complaint) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 15 Exhibit O to Complaint, # 16 Exhibit Q to Complaint, # 17 Exhibit R to Complaint, # 18 Exhibit S to Complaint, # 19 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 2 Certification of Interested Parties by Digital Chocolate, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to Zynga Game Network, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2010: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2010)
August 31, 2010 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
September 13, 2010 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digital Chocolate, Inc. Zynga Game Network, Inc. served on 8/25/2010, answer due 9/15/2010. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Digital Chocolate, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
September 15, 2010 8 STIPULATION Extending Time By Which Defendant Zynga Game Network Inc. Must Respond To The Complaint by Digital Chocolate, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Chocolate, Inc v. Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Chocolate, Inc
Represented By: Susan Denise Berney-Key
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]