Fraley et al v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiffs alleged that Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Sponsored Stories advertising service appropriated their names, photographs, likenesses and identities to advertise products, services or brands for a commercial purpose without Plaintiffs' consent.

Plaintiff: Angel Fraley, Paul Wang, James H Duval, James Duval, William Tait, Russell Tait and Susan Mainzer
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv01726
Filed: April 8, 2011
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2014 452 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re 396 Notice of Appeal. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 451 Featured Case ORDER and MANDATE of USCA as to 396 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carol Barrett. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 11, 2014 450 USCA Case Number 14-15595 for 445 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sam Kazman. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
June 30, 2014 449 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 435 Motion for Posting of Appeal Bonds. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
April 28, 2014 448 Transcript Designation Form (Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 447 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMargaret Becker, Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Kim N. Parsons, Judy Reidel, John Samuel Schachter. (Related document(s) 436 , 435 ) (Michelman, Scott) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 446 Refund Status re 387 Application for Refund approved. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 27, 2014 445 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Sam Kazman. Appeal of Order 443 , Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 442 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-8483781 paid.) (Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 3/27/2014) Modified on 3/27/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2014 444 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 415 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jennifer Deachin, 389 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas L. Cox, Jr., 373 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Bobak, Alec Greenhouse, Zachary Cochran, Wendy Lally, 372 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Margaret Becker, John Samuel Schachter, Kim N. Parsons, 364 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jo Batman, 396 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carol Barrett, 376 Notice of Appeal filed by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane, 375 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael S. Depot (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 28, 2014 443 Featured Case ORDER DENYING OBJECTORS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND INCENTIVE AWARD. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/27/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 442 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET [#443] *** ORDER DENYING 363 OBJECTOR'S MOTION FOR ATTONEY FEES AND INCENTIVE AWARD. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014) Modified on 2/28/2014 (cl, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2014 441 CLERKS NOTICE THE MOTION (DKT #435) FOR BOND SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON FEBRUARY 13, 2014 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 3 ON THE 17TH FLOOR OF THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 450 GOLDEN GATE AVENUE, SAN FRANCISCO SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice.
January 30, 2014 440 REPLY (re 435 MOTION for Bond CORRECTION OF DOCKET #s 434, 434-1, 434-2, 434-3, 434-4 ) filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 24, 2014 439 OPPOSITION (re 435 MOTION for Bond CORRECTION OF DOCKET #s 434, 434-1, 434-2, 434-3, 434-4 ) filed byJo Batman. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 438 RESPONSE (re 435 MOTION for Bond CORRECTION OF DOCKET #s 434, 434-1, 434-2, 434-3, 434-4 ) filed byMichael S. Depot. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl of Robert C. Fellmeth)(Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 23, 2014 437 RESPONSE (re 435 MOTION for Bond CORRECTION OF DOCKET #s 434, 434-1, 434-2, 434-3, 434-4 ) filed byH. L. S., Sheila L Shane. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 436 RESPONSE (re 435 MOTION for Bond CORRECTION OF DOCKET #s 434, 434-1, 434-2, 434-3, 434-4 ) filed byMargaret Becker, Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Kim N. Parsons, Judy Reidel, John Samuel Schachter. (Michelman, Scott) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 10, 2014 435 CORRECTED MOTION for Posting of Appeal Bond by Objectors CORRECTION OF DOCKET #s 434, 434-1, 434-2, 434-3, 434-4 filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/24/2014. Replies due by 1/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2014) Modified on 1/10/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2014 434 MOTION for Bond for Posting of Appeal Bond filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/23/2014. Replies due by 1/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 8, 2014 433 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook, Inc. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
December 20, 2013 432 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 34611092318 re 396 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carol Barrett (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 431 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re 415 Notice of Appeal. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 430 MANDATE of USCA as to 415 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jennifer Deachin. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 429 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re 396 Notice of Appeal. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 428 USCA JUDGMENT as to 396 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carol Barrett. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
November 26, 2013 427 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carol Barrett for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 426 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 7/28/11, 9/29/11, 5/21/12, 8/2/12, 11/15/12, 6/28/13 before Judge Lucy H. Kohn and Richard Seeborg, (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 425 NOTICE by Sam Kazman re 370 Opposition/Response to Motion, 363 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Objector Incentive Payment, 386 Reply to Opposition/Response, 379 Opposition/Response to Motion, NOTICE OF DECISION (Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 21, 2013 424 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 28, 2013, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2014. (Related documents(s) 401 , 391 , 407 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 20, 2013 423 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/17/2012, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2014. (Related documents(s) 404 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 18, 2013 422 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal re 364 Notice of Appeal, 397 Amended Notice of Appeal (Bandas, Christopher) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 421 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on Aug 2, 2012 before Judge Richard Seeborg, (Bandas, Christopher) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 14, 2013 420 USCA Case Number 13-17214 for 415 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jennifer Deachin. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 419 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 396 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carol Barrett. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 5, 2013 418 Transcript Designation Form (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certification under 9th Cir. R. 10-3.1(f))(Michelman, Scott) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 30, 2013 417 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 415 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal Notification Form) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2013: # 2 Docket Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2013 416 NOTICE of Appearance by N. Albert Bacharach, Jr As Appellate Counsel (Bacharach, N. Albert) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 29, 2013 415 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Jennifer Deachin. Appeal of Judgment 368 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-8117598 paid.) ***13-17214*** (Bacharach, N. Albert) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 10/30/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2013 414 USCA Case Number 13-17097 for 396 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carol Barrett. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 25, 2013 413 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-28-11, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2013. (Related documents(s) 412 ) (las, ) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 24, 2013 412 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Michael S. Depot for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 411 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 7/28/2011; 9/29/2011; 8/2/2012; 11/15/2012; 6/28/2013 before Judge Koh / Seeborg, re 375 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 11/25/2013. (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 410 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 09/29/11; 02/17/12; 05/21/12; 08/02/12; 11/15/12; 06/28/13 before Judge Seeborg, re 376 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 11/25/2013. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 409 Transcript Designation Form (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certification under 9th Cir. R. 10-3.1(f))(Michelman, Scott) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 408 ** Due to untimely efiling, this transcript is unlocked and available for immediate downloading. **Transcript of Proceedings held on August 2, 2012, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett, Telephone number c/o Debra_Campbell@cand.uscourts.gov; 415-522-2079. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2012.
October 24, 2013 407 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 406 ** FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane for Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 10/24/2013) Modified on 10/24/2013 (djc, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2013 405 ** FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 10/24/2013) Modified on 10/24/2013 (djc, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2013 404 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 403 ** FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 10/24/2013) Modified on 10/24/2013 (djc, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2013 402 **DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - TO BE REFILED **Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 09/29/11; 02/17/12; 05/21/12; 08/02/12; 11/15/12; 06/28/13 before Judge Seeborg, re 376 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 11/25/2013. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 10/24/2013) Modified on 10/24/2013 (djc, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 401 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Michael S. Depot for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 22, 2013 400 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 6/28/13 before Judge RS, re 375 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 11/25/2013. (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 21, 2013 399 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant re 396 Notice of Appeal (cc to USCA). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 21, 2013 398 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Carol Barrett re 396 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal Notification Form) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2013: # 2 Docket Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2013 397 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jo Batman as to 368 Judgment Final Judgment. Appeal Record due by 11/20/2013. (Bandas, Christopher) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 18, 2013 396 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Carol Barrett. Appeal of Judgment 368 , Order on Motion for Settlement 359 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) ***13-17097*** (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 10/18/2013) Modified on 10/21/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2013 395 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 34611090597 re 373 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Bobak, Alec Greenhouse, Zachary Cochran, Wendy Lally (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 394 USCA Case Number 13-17028 USCA for 389 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas L. Cox, Jr.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 15, 2013 393 CLERKS NOTICE MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 17, 2013 WILL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 12, 2013 392 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Darrell Palmer (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 10/12/2013)
October 10, 2013 391 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Jo Batman for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Bandas, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 8, 2013 390 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 389 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal Notification Form) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2013: # 2 Docket Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2013 389 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Thomas L. Cox, Jr. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 360 , Order on Motion for Settlement 359 (Filing Fee Paid $455.00, Receipt Number 34611090238.). (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 3, 2013 388 NOTICE of Appearance by Roman Melnik (Melnik, Roman) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 2, 2013 387 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 25CGA3A1 by Michael S. Depot. (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 30, 2013 386 REPLY (re 363 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Objector Incentive Payment ) filed bySam Kazman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Citigroup expense order, # 2 Exhibit 3. Dennis MPA motion to reconsider, # 3 Declaration of Theodore H. Frank, # 4 Exhibit A. Arns email)(Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 27, 2013 384 USCA Case Number 13-16936 for 376 Notice of Appeal filed by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 383 USCA Case Number 13-16929 for 375 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael S. Depot. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 382 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 373 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Bobak, Alec Greenhouse, Zachary Cochran, Wendy Lally. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 381 USCA Case Number 13-16919 for 373 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Bobak, Alec Greenhouse, Zachary Cochran, Wendy Lally. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 380 USCA Case Number 13-16918 for 372 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Margaret Becker, John Samuel Schachter, Kim N. Parsons. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 379 RESPONSE (re 363 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Objector Incentive Payment ) Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Motion of Kazman for Attorneys' Fees [Corrected] filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 378 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to 363 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Objector Incentive Payment (Reason: Correcting an error) Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Motion of Kazman for Attorneys' Fees [Corrected] filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. Responses due by 10/11/2013. Replies due by 9/30/2013. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 377 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 364 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jo Batman. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 24, 2013 385 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 34611089934 re 364 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jo Batman. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 376 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit of Appeals H. L. S., Sheila L Shane.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-8029807 paid.) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 9/24/2013) ***13-16936*** Modified on 9/25/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2013 375 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Michael S. Depot. Appeal of Judgment 368 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-8027497 paid.) (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 9/24/2013) ***13-16929*** Modified on 9/25/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2013 374 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. 375*** NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Michael S. Depot. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-8027287. Appeal Record due by 10/24/2013. (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 9/24/2013) Modified on 9/25/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2013 373 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Wendy Lally, Alec Greenhouse, Jonathan Bobak, Zachary Cochran. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 360 , Order on Motion for Settlement 359 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Pentz, John) (Filed on 9/24/2013)***13-16919*** Modified on 9/25/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2013 372 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Margaret Becker, Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Kim N. Parsons, John Samuel Schachter. Appeal of Judgment 368 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-8025429 paid.) (Michelman, Scott) (Filed on 9/24/2013)***13-16918*** Modified on 9/25/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2013 371 Declaration of Robert S. Arns in Support of 370 Opposition/Response to Motion, [Motion of Kazman for Attorneys' Fees] filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 370 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 23, 2013 370 RESPONSE (re 363 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Objector Incentive Payment ) Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Motion of Kazman for Attorneys' Fees filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 19, 2013 369 USCA Case Number 13-16819 for 364 Notice of Appeal filed by Jo Batman. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 368 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/19/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 12, 2013 367 Letter 9/12/13 from Akram Tabet. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 10, 2013 366 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant re 364 notice of appeal (cc to USCA). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all non-efilers. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 365 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 364 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal Notification Form) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2013: # 2 Docket Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2013 364 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Jo Batman. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 360 , Order on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreement 359 (Fee Not Paid). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 9, 2013 363 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Objector Incentive Payment filed by Sam Kazman. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 9/23/2013. Replies due by 9/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theodore H. Frank in support of motion for fees, # 2 Proposed Order)(Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 362 Declaration of Robert L. Bowman in Support of 361 Reply Brief filed by Robert L. Bowman. (Related document(s) 361 ) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 6, 2013 361 Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Objections to Settlement and Fee Motion filed by Robert L. Bowman. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 26, 2013 360 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 26, 2013 359 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 5, 2013 358 NOTICE of Decision by Theodore H Frank, Sam Kazman re 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS, 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, 310 Objection,, of Related Appellate Decision (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit In re Dry Max Pampers Litigation)(Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 8/5/2013) Modified on 8/6/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2013 357 Letter from Jonathan E. Davis Regarding ECF No. 254-The Declaration of Robert S. Arns in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Class Representatives' Service Awards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 28, 2013 356 Minute Entry: Motions Hearing held on 6/28/2013 before Judge Richard Seeborg; MATTERS TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION (Date Filed: 6/28/2013) (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/28/2013)
June 27, 2013 355 Letter dated 6/27/13 from Robert E. Rutkowski. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 26, 2013 354 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum filed by Margaret Becker, Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Kim N. Parsons, Judy Reidel, John Samuel Schachter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Supplemental Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Michelman, Scott) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 24, 2013 353 MOTION for Leave to File motion to have objection deemed valid filed by janine menhennet. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Menhennet, Janine) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 21, 2013 352 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 341 Declaration in Support,, 348 Declaration in Support, Supplemental Declaration Regarding Claims Received filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Related document(s) 341 , 348 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 14, 2013 351 Brief re 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 336 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 350 Declaration of Peter Vulgaris in Support of 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Declaration of Peter Vulgaris in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 336 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 349 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin in Support of 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 336 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 348 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 336 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 347 Declaration of Robert S. Arns in Support of 345 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 345 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 346 Declaration of Richard M. Pearl in Support of 345 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 345 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 345 REPLY (re 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS ) filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 7, 2013 344 RESPONSE (re 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS ) Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 343 Brief re 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS, 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Response to Objections to Settlement and Fee Motion filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 253 , 336 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 342 Brief re 280 Brief, Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel and Appointment of Class Representatives Pursuant to Motion for Preliminary Approval filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Related document(s) 280 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 341 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS, 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Regarding Settlement Administration filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 253 , 336 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 340 Declaration of Kevin M. Osborne in Support of 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS, 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 253 , 336 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 339 Declaration of Steven R. Weinmann in Support of 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS, 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) 253 , 336 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 338 Declaration of JONATHAN M. JAFFE in Support of 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS, 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 253 , 336 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 337 Declaration of ROBERT S. ARNS in Support of 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS, 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Related document(s) 253 , 336 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 336 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by James H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 6/21/2013. Replies due by 6/28/2013. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 6, 2013 335 OBJECTIONS to re 280 Brief, 259 Brief, 252 Order, Terminate Motions for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by James H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 1-9, # 2 10, # 3 11, # 4 12-17, # 5 18-59, # 6 60-97, # 7 98, # 8 99-104)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
May 30, 2013 334 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FROM CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-2 FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF REVISED SETTLEMENT. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 23, 2013 333 Letter dated 5/18/2013 from Umesh Heendeniya. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 332 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 331 MOTION Relief from Civil Local Rule 7-2 Joint Administrative Motion for Relief from Civil Local Rule 7-2 for Final Approval of Revised Settlement (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 331 MOTION Relief from Civil Local Rule 7-2 Joint Administrative Motion for Relief from Civil Local Rule 7-2 for Final Approval of Revised Settlement filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 6/6/2013. Replies due by 6/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Stipulation i/s/o Joint Administrative Motion for Relief from Civil Local Rule 7-2 for Final Approval of Revised Settlement, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Administrative Motion for Relief From Civil Local Rule 7-2 For Final Approval of Revised Settlement)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 9, 2013 330 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO EFILE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2013: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service) (cl, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2013 329 Letter dated 5/1/2013 from Everett Drayden Shumpert. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 8, 2013 327 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY AARON M. ZIGLER PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 8, 2013 326 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SCOTT MICHELMAN PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 7, 2013 325 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Aaron M. Zigler ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7681028.) filed by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 6, 2013 328 Letter dated 5/2/2013 from Jo Batman. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 324 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCKET NO. 318*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Adam Rorty (Rorty, Jay) (Filed on 5/6/2013) Modified on 5/6/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 323 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCKET NO. 318*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Adam Rorty (Rorty, Jay) (Filed on 5/6/2013) Modified on 5/6/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 322 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCKET NO. 318*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Adam Rorty (Rorty, Jay) (Filed on 5/6/2013) Modified on 5/6/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 321 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCKET NO. 318*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Adam Rorty (Rorty, Jay) (Filed on 5/6/2013) Modified on 5/6/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 320 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCUMENT NO. 318*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Adam Rorty (Rorty, Jay) (Filed on 5/6/2013) Modified on 5/6/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2013 319 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Bronson attorney for Peter Martin, Charisse Holder, Jeff Fagen, Patty Ward, John Garza, Leanne Louise, Matina Battaglia (Bronson, Martha) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 318 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Adam Rorty (Rorty, Jay) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 2, 2013 317 RESPONSE (re 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS ) 252 opposition to settlement filed byPeter Martin, charisse holder, jeff fagen, patty ward, john garza, leanne louse. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jeff Fagen, # 2 Declaration John Garza, # 3 Declaration Charisse Holden, # 4 Declaration Leanne louise, # 5 Declaration Paty Ward, # 6 Declaration Peter Martin, # 7 Declaration Matina Battaglia)(Bronson, Martha) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 316 Notice of OBJECTION, Intention to Appear, and Request to be Heard. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 315 Letter dated 5/1/2013 from Robert L. Bowman. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 314 OBJECTIONS to re 252 Order, Terminate Motions by Sheila L Shane, H. L. S.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sheila Shane)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 313 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Settlement by Jennifer Deachin. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Sherwood, Alan) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 312 OBJECTIONS to Amended Settlement Agreement and Release by Carol Barrett. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carol Barrett (Redacted))(Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 311 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Darrell Palmer and Notice of Intent to Appear (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 310 OBJECTIONS to re 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS, 252 Order, Terminate Motions and to Settlement; Notice of Intent to Appear by Sam Kazman, Theodore H Frank. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sam Kazman, # 2 Declaration of Theodore H. Frank, # 3 Exhibit 1. Order in In re Checking Overdraft Lit., # 4 Exhibit 2. Erichson law review article)(Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 308 OBJECTIONS to re 252 Order, Terminate Motions and Notice of Intent To Appear by Margaret Becker, Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Kim N. Parsons, Judy Reidel, John Samuel Schachter. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Interested Parties, # 2 Declaration of John Schachter, # 3 Declaration of Judy Reidel, # 4 Declaration of Kim Parsons, # 5 Declaration of Ann Leonard, # 6 Declaration of Margaret Becker, # 7 Declaration of Michael Carome)(Michelman, Scott) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 307 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Scott Michelman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7670250.) filed by Margaret Becker, Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Kim N. Parsons, Judy Reidel, John Samuel Schachter. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certification of Good Standing)(Michelman, Scott) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 306 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Matthew Michelman (Michelman, Scott) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 1, 2013 309 OBJECTION to Settlement by Zara Watkins. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 305 OBJECTIONS to Preliminarily Approved Settlement Agreement by Michael S. Depot. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration)(Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Fellmeth on behalf of Michael Depot, as Guardian ad Litem for Katelyn Depot and Christopher Depot (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 29, 2013 303 Letter from Tracey Klinge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 302 Letter from Katie Sibley. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 15, 2013 301 Letter from Akram Tabet. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 300 Letter dated 3/30/13 from Danielle Biton/Bitton. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 2, 2013 299 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Responses due by 4/16/2013. Replies due by 4/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
April 2, 2013 298 Letter dated 3/28/2013 from Thomas L. Cox, Jr.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
April 1, 2013 297 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by A.D.Y., B.A.W., C.M.D., H.E.W., R.P.Y., T.A.B. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 22, 2013 296 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 15, 2012, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2013. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 295 Letter dated 3/21/13 from Akram Tabet. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 11, 2013 294 Letter dated 1/27/13 from Danielle Westfield. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 7, 2013 293 Letter dated 2/1/13 from David Burg regarding Legal Notice of Settlement of Class Action. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 22, 2013 292 EXHIBITS re 254 Declaration in Support,, CORRECTED EXHIBIT 1 to the Declaration of Robert S. Arns In Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees, CORRECTION OF DOCKET #, [254-1] filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Related document(s) 254 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 7, 2013 291 CLERKS NOTICE re Motion to Relate Cases: The Court has reviewed the motion and has determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 3, 2013 290 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucy Funes re 289 Reply to Opposition/Response AMENDED (Restis, William) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
January 3, 2013 289 REPLY (re 258 Third Party MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civ L.R. 7-11 ) filed byLucy Funes. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Restis, William) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
January 2, 2013 288 EXHIBITS re 286 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits 9-15 re. Docket Number 286 Declaration of Robert S. Arns in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13, # 5 Exhibit 14, # 6 Exhibit 15-1, # 7 Exhibit 15-2)(Related document(s) 286 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 287 EXHIBITS re 286 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits 4-8 re. Docket Number 286 Declaration of Robert S. Arns in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4-1, # 2 Exhibit 4-2, # 3 Exhibit 4-3, # 4 Exhibit 4-4, # 5 Exhibit 4-5, # 6 Exhibit 4-6, # 7 Exhibit 4-7, # 8 Exhibit 4-8, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 286 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 286 Declaration of ROBERT S. ARNS in Support of 280 Brief, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, In Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1-1, # 3 Exhibit 1-2, # 4 Exhibit 1-3, # 5 Exhibit 1-4, # 6 Exhibit 1-5, # 7 Exhibit 1-6, # 8 Exhibit 1-7, # 9 Exhibit 1-8, # 10 Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 280 , 251 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 285 EXHIBITS re 283 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits 27-36 re. Docket Number 283 Declaration of Jonathan E. Davis In Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27 Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 28, # 3 Exhibit 29, # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibit 31, # 6 Exhibit 32, # 7 Exhibit 33, # 8 Exhibit 34, # 9 Exhibit 35, # 10 Exhibit 36)(Related document(s) 283 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 284 EXHIBITS re 283 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits 14-26 re. Docket Number 283 Declaration of Jonathan E. Davis in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 19, # 6 Exhibit 20, # 7 Exhibit 21, # 8 Exhibit 22, # 9 Exhibit 23, # 10 Exhibit 24, # 11 Exhibit 25, # 12 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 283 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 283 Declaration of Jonathan E. Davis in Support of 280 Brief, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, In Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) 280 , 251 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 282 Declaration of Fernando Torres in Support of 280 Brief, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Regarding the Value of Injunctive Relief filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 280 , 251 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 281 Declaration of Phillip Allman, PHD in Support of 280 Brief, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Regarding the Value of Injunctive Relief filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Related document(s) 280 , 251 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 280 Brief re 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Motion for Prelminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Related document(s) 251 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 31, 2012 279 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 274 DEFENDANT FACEBOOK'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/31/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 31, 2012 278 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Instagram, LLC re 276 Joinder, (Antia, Mazda) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 31, 2012 277 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 275 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 31, 2012 276 Joinder re 275 Opposition/Response to Motion, Instagram, LLC's Joinder in Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Instagram, LLC. (Antia, Mazda) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 31, 2012 275 RESPONSE (re 258 Third Party MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civ L.R. 7-11 ) Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 28, 2012 274 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendant Facebook's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 28, 2012 273 Proposed Order re 271 Opposition/Response to Motion, 258 Third Party MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civ L.R. 7-11 DENYING RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN CASES by James H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 28, 2012 272 Declaration of Steven R. Weinmann in Support of 271 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 271 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 28, 2012 271 RESPONSE (re 258 Third Party MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civ L.R. 7-11 ) FRALEY PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 28, 2012 270 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 259 Brief, (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 27, 2012 269 EXHIBITS re 259 Brief, 262 Declaration in Support, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Exhibits JJ to OO re docket 262 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit KK, # 2 Exhibit LL, # 3 Exhibit MM, # 4 Exhibit NN, # 5 Exhibit OO)(Related document(s) 259 , 262 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 268 EXHIBITS re 259 Brief, 262 Declaration in Support, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Exhibits DD to II re docket 262 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EE, # 2 Exhibit FF, # 3 Exhibit GG, # 4 Exhibit HH, # 5 Exhibit II)(Related document(s) 259 , 262 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 267 EXHIBITS re 262 Declaration in Support, 259 Brief, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Exhibits W to CC re docket 262 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit X, # 2 Exhibit Y, # 3 Exhibit Z, # 4 Exhibit AA, # 5 Exhibit BB, # 6 Exhibit CC)(Related document(s) 262 , 259 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 266 EXHIBITS re 259 Brief, 262 Declaration in Support, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Exhibits S to V re docket 262 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T, # 2 Exhibit U, # 3 Exhibit V)(Related document(s) 259 , 262 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 265 EXHIBITS re 259 Brief, 262 Declaration in Support, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Exhibits P to R re docket 262 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 259 , 262 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 264 EXHIBITS re 259 Brief, 262 Declaration in Support, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Exhibits K to O re docket 262 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 259 , 262 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 263 EXHIBITS re 259 Brief, 262 Declaration in Support, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Exhibits F to J re docket 262 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 259 , 262 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 262 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of 259 Brief, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Re Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 259 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 261 Declaration of Christopher Plambeck in Support of 259 Brief, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Re Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 259 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 260 Declaration of James C. Squires in Support of 259 Brief, 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Re Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 259 , 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 259 Brief re 251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 251 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 258 Third Party MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civ L.R. 7-11 filed by Lucy Funes. (Restis, William) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 21, 2012 257 Proposed Order re 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS by James H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 256 Declaration of JONATHAN M. JAFFE in Support of 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 253 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 255 Declaration of RICHARD M. PEARL in Support of 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 253 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 254 Declaration of ROBERT S. ARNS in Support of 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS filed byJames H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 253 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 253 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' SERVICE AWARDS filed by James H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 1/11/2013. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 3, 2012 252 Featured Case PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROVISIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/3/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
December 3, 2012 251 Featured Case ORDER RE SEALING MOTIONS. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 20, 2012 250 EXHIBITS re 235 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement Revised Class Notice Documents in Further Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - Modified Long Form Notice, # 2 Exhibit 2R - Redline of Modified Long Form Notice, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Modified Email Notice, # 4 Exhibit 3R - Redline of Modified Email Notice, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Modified Publication Notice, # 6 Exhibit 4R - Redline of Modified Publication Notice)(Related document(s) 235 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 15, 2012 249 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2012 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 11/15/2012).(Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2012)
November 7, 2012 248 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Center for Public Interest Law / Children's Advocacy Institute. (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
October 22, 2012 247 Declaration of JENNIFER M. KEOUGH in Support of 235 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement DECLARATION OF JENNIFER M. KEOUGH REGARDING NOTICE GIVEN PURSUANT TO THE CLASS ACTION FAIRNESS ACT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 235 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 12, 2012 246 Administrative Motion to File Additional Documents Under Seal and Response (re 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Submitted by Plaintiffs Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki in Support of Administrative Motions to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2012 245 Declaration of Kevin M. Osborne in Support of 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 236 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 10, 2012 244 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 10, 2012 243 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang re 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 9, 2012 242 Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES PURSUANT TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 241 Featured Case ORDER granting 237 Joint MOTION Relief From Civil Local Rule 7-2 for Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement re 235 Joint MOTION for Settlement. AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 6, 2012 240 Brief re 235 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3)(Related document(s) 235 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2012)
October 5, 2012 239 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 235 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2)(Related document(s) 235 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 238 Declaration of Michael G. Rhodes in Support of 235 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement Declaration of Michael G. Rhodes in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 235 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 237 Joint MOTION Relief From Civil Local Rule 7-2 for Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement re 235 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement Joint Administrative Motion for Relief from Civil Local Rule 7-2 filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Sandeep N. Solanki, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 235 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Settlement filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
September 4, 2012 233 MOTION for Settlement UNREDACTED Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 6/28/2012. Replies due by 7/5/2012. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 232 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 227 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Steven R. Weinmann Declaration Exhibit 13 by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 231 EXHIBITS re 183 Declaration in Support,,, Exhibit 22 (Unredacted) filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Related document(s) 183 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 230 EXHIBITS re 183 Declaration in Support,,, Exhibit 13 (Redacted) filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Related document(s) 183 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 229 Declaration of Fernando Torres in Support of 182 Declaration in Support, regarding the value of injunctive relief(unredacted) filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Related document(s) 182 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 31, 2012 228 Brief in Support of 181 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2012) Modified on 8/31/2012 (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2012 227 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 27, 2012 226 Featured Case ORDER RE COMMUNICATIONS FROM THIRD PARTIES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/27/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 20, 2012 225 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding The Pending Administrative Motions to Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 17, 2012 224 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying 181 Motion for for preliminary approval of settlement, without prejudice. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 3, 2012 223 Letter dated 8/1/2012 from Beth Givens. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 222 Letter dated 8/1/2012 from Laura Antonini. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 2, 2012 221 Letter dated 7/30/12 from Jeff Chester (MSW). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 220 Letter dated 7/12/12 from Marc Rotenberg (EPIC). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 219 Letter dated 7/11/2012 by Marc Rotenberg (EPIC), Jeff Chester (CDD), Beth Givens (PRC) and Prof. Angela Campbell. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 218 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2012 before Judge Richard Seeborg; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. (Date Filed: 8/2/2012) re 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Angel Fraley, William Tait, James H Duval, Paul Wang, Susan Mainzer. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2012)
August 1, 2012 217 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE; DENYING REQUEST TO EXPAND LIST OF POTENTIAL CY PRES RECIPIENTS; REQUIRING FURTHER MEET AND CONFER NEGOTIATIONS RE SEALING MOTIONS. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 216 Response re 211 Amicus Curiae Appearance Response to Amicus Curiae Memorandum of Center for Public Interest Law and Children's Advocacy Institute in Opposition to Proposed Settlement Agreement byFacebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 25, 2012 215 Featured Case ORDER RE MOTION TO INTERVENE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 24, 2012 214 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 16, 2012 213 Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki in Support of 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 190 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 12, 2012 212 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 Pursuant to Signed Order of Recusal ( 209 ). Case Reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 211 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Robert Charles Fellmeth on behalf of Center for Public Interest Law / Children's Advocacy Institute. (Fellmeth, Robert) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 210 Featured Case ORDER of Clarification. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/11/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 209 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/11/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 10, 2012 208 Declaration of Steven A. Katz in Further Support of 187 MOTION for Intervention filed by A.D.Y., B.A.W., C.M.D., H.E.W., R.P.Y., T.A.B.. (Related document(s) 187 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified text on 7/12/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2012 207 Declaration of Olimpio Lee Squitieri in Further Support of 187 MOTION for Intervention filed by A.D.Y., B.A.W., C.M.D., H.E.W., R.P.Y., T.A.B.. (Related document(s) 187 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified text on 7/12/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2012 206 Declaration of Edward A. Wallace in Further Support of 187 MOTION for Intervention filed by A.D.Y., B.A.W., C.M.D., H.E.W., R.P.Y., T.A.B.. (Related document(s) 187 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified text on 7/12/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2012 205 Declaration of Aaron M. Zigler in Further Support of 187 MOTION for Intervention to Oppose the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by A.D.Y., B.A.W., C.M.D., H.E.W., R.P.Y., T.A.B.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 187 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified text on 7/12/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2012 204 REPLY (re 187 MOTION for Intervention to Oppose the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement ) filed byA.D.Y., B.A.W., C.M.D., H.E.W., R.P.Y., T.A.B.. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 203 Declaration of John C. Torjesen in Further Support of ( 187 MOTION for Intervention to Oppose the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement ) filed by C.M.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Stuart, Antony) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified text on 7/12/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2012 202 Declaration of Anthony Stuart in Further Support of ( 187 MOTION for Intervention to Oppose the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement ) filed by C.M.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Stuart, Antony) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified text on 7/12/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2012 200 Featured Case ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule for Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/9/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 199 Declaration of STEPHEN BROBECK in Support of 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 181 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 6, 2012 198 OPPOSITION to ( 187 MOTION for Intervention to Oppose the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement ) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 7/6/2012) Modified text on 7/9/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2012 197 Declaration of TIM LITTLE in Support of 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 181 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 196 Declaration of JENNIFER S. GRANICK in Support of 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 181 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 195 Declaration of SHARI STEELE in Support of 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 181 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 194 Declaration of SUSAN E. LINN in Support of 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 181 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 193 Declaration of LESLIE HARRIS in Support of 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 181 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 192 Proposed Order re 191 Opposition/Response to Motion, DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 191 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to ( 187 MOTION for Intervention to Oppose the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2012) Modified text on 7/9/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2012 190 Administrative Motion and Notice to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert S. Arns in Support of Opposition to Motion to Intervene, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2012) Modified text on 7/9/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2012 201 MOTION and Judicial Notice to Include Several Nonprofits in Settlement filed by Jeffrey Allen Pennington. Responses due by 7/17/2012. Replies due by 7/24/2012. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 188 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Facebook's Brief ISO Plts Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 2, 2012 188 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Facebook's Brief ISO Plts Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sandeep Solanki, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Brief ISO Plts Mot for Prelim Approval, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Brief, # 5 Exhibit Gutkin Decl ISO Brief, # 6 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. A, # 7 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. B, # 8 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. C, # 9 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. D, # 10 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. E, # 11 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. F, # 12 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. G, # 13 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. H, # 14 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. I, # 15 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. J, # 16 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. K, # 17 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. L, # 18 Exhibit Gutkin Ex. M, # 19 Declaration of Foster re inability to e-file due to ECF website off-line)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 22, 2012 187 MOTION and Memorandum for Intervention to Oppose the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by C.M.D., T.A.B., H.E.W., B.A.W., A.D.Y., R.P.Y.. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/6/2012. Replies due by 7/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint in Intervention, # 2 Proposed Order)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 6/22/2012) Modified text on 6/25/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2012 186 Declaration of SANDEEP N. SOLANKI in Support of 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion and Notice to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 176 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 185 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang re 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 20, 2012 184 Declaration of ROBERT S. ARNS in Support of 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 181 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 183 Declaration of STEVEN R. WEINMANN in Support of 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 181 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 182 Declaration of Fernando Torres in Support of 181 MOTION for Settlement -Public Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION REGARDING THE VALUE OF INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Related document(s) 181 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 181 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement -Public Redacted Version filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 6/28/2012. Replies due by 7/5/2012. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2012) Modified text on 6/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2012 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 179 Proposed Order GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROVISIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 14, 2012 178 Declaration of HONORABLE EDWARD A. INFANTE (RET.) IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 14, 2012 177 Declaration of JONATHAN M. JAFFE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 14, 2012 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Osborne in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2012) Modified on 6/15/2012 Pursuant to General Order No. 62, attachment #1 sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2012 175 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part 173 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 8, 2012 174 Declaration of Steven R. Weinmann in Suppport of 173 Administrative Motion for Addt'l Pages for Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by James H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Modified on 6/11/2012 counsel posted document incorrectly as a motion and failed to link entry to document #173 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2012 173 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement filed by James H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
May 29, 2012 172 Featured Case ORDER re (171 in 5:11-cv-01726-LHK) Joint Status Report. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/29/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 27, 2012 171 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING REVISED SETTLEMENT TERM SHEET by Facebook, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/27/2012)
May 25, 2012 170 Featured Case ORDER Re: Hearing on Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/25/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 24, 2012 169 Interim Joint Status Report by Facebook, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2012) Modified text on 5/25/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2012 168 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05-21-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 167 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Facebook, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/23/2012) Modified text on 5/24/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2012 166 Notice of Withdrawal of [121 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/22/2012) Modified on 5/23/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 22, 2012 165 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 106 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 22, 2012 164 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 163 Order Notice of Execution of Term Sheet (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 21, 2012 163 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/21/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 14, 2012 162 RESPONSE to re 159 Objection PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF FERNANDO TORRES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 11, 2012 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Additional Docs and Portions of Documents Lodged by Plaintiffs ISO their Reply in support of Motion for Class Certification, 159 Objection, 160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5 (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 10, 2012 160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5 filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin ISO Evid Objs to Torres Reply Decl, # 2 Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki ISO Admin Mot to Seal, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 159 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to 156 the Reply Declaration Of Fernando Torres In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification by Facebook, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2012) Modified text on 5/11/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Additional Docs and Portions of Documents Lodged by Plaintiffs ISO their Reply in support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sandeep Solanki ISO Admin Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 8, 2012 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang re 156 Reply to Opposition/Response, PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 156 REPLY Memorandum of Law in Support of ( 121 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition Transcripts filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2012) Modified text on 5/9/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2012 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang re 153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 3, 2012 154 Declaration of Kevin M. Osborne in Support of 153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 153 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 152 EXHIBITS re 145 Declaration in Opposition,, CORRECTED EXHIBIT D to Declaration of James C. Squires in Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification CORRECTION OF DOCKET #[145-4] filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 145 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 151 EXHIBITS re 146 Declaration in Opposition,,,, CORRECTED EXHIBIT P to Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification CORRECTION OF DOCKET #[146-16] filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 146 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 2, 2012 150 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S NOTICE OF E-FILING PUBLIC REDACTED VERSIONS OF DOCUMENTS (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 149 Supplemental Declaration of SANDEEP N. SOLANKI IN SUPPORT OF 129 DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 79-5 filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 linking entry to document #129 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 148 Declaration of RANDOLPH E. BUCKLIN in Support of 141 Opposition/Response to Motion DECLARATION OF RANDOLPH E. BUCKLIN filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 141 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 147 Declaration of ANA YANG MULLER in Support of 141 Opposition to 106 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 141 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified text on 5/3/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 146 DECLARATION of MATTHEW D. BROWN in Support to 141 Opposition to [106 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16*** EXHIBIT P FILED IN ERROR, REFER TO DOCUMENT 151 . *** Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO)(Related document(s) 141 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/3/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 5/3/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 145 DECLARATION of JAMES C. SQUIRES in Support of 141 Opposition to 106 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D *** EXHIBIT FILED D IN ERROR, REFER TO DOCUMENT 152 . *** , # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H-1, # 9 Exhibit H-2, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 106 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/3/2012 lionking entry to document #141 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 144 DECLARATION of CATHERINE TUCKER in Support of 141 Opposition to 106 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 106 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified text on 5/3/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 143 DECLARATION of JOHN HEGEMAN in Support of 141 Opposition to 106 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 106 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 linking entry to document #141 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 142 DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER PLAMBECK in Support of 141 Opposition to 106 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 106 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 linking entry to document #141 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 141 OPPOSITION to ( 106 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified text on 5/3/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2012 140 RESPONSE (re 121 MOTION for Protective Order AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS ) filed byE.K.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration A. Zigler)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 30, 2012 139 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin in Support of 135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Exhibits to Gutkin Declaration Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 135 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 24, 2012 138 OPPOSITION to ( 135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Exhibits to Gutkin Declaration Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 ) filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF STEVEN R. WEINMANN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS TO GUTKIN DECLARATION)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/24/2012) Modified text on 4/25/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2012 137 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION to ( 135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike Decalrations of David Taber, Gary Frazier, and Fernando Torres ) filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/24/2012) Modified text on 4/25/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2012 136 OPPOSITION (re 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed by James H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Steven R. Weinmann)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/23/2012) Modified text on 4/24/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2012 135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 130 , Proposed Motion to Strike, Supporting Declarations, and Proposed Orders)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 4/20/2012) Modified on 4/23/2012 counsel failed to select multiple motion event types (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2012 134 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 20, 2012 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 20, 2012 132 Declaration of STEVEN R. WEINMANN in Support of 131 Response ( Non Motion ),, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SELECTIVE WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Related document(s) 131 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 20, 2012 131 RESPONSE to re 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS LODGED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, 124 Notice (Other),, PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SELECTIVE WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS FROM ITS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, ETC. by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 20, 2012 130 *** INCORRECT ENTRY *** NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion for Leave to File Motion to Strike (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2012) Modified text on 4/23/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2012 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Sandeep Solanki, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 18, 2012 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 124 Notice (Other),, (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 127 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang re 123 Proposed Order, 121 MOTION for Protective Order AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS, 126 Declaration in Support, (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 126 Declaration of STEVEN R. WEINMANN in Support of 121 MOTION for Protective Order AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 121 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 17, 2012 125 Proposed Order re 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS LODGED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION Revised Proposed Order Granting Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 124 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS LODGED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Selective Withdrawal of Certain Documents and Portions of Documents From Its Administrative Motion To File Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 123 Proposed Order re 121 MOTION for Protective Order AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 122 ***EFILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. 126 *** Declaration of STEVEN R. WEINMANN in Support of 121 MOTION for Protective Order AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 121 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/17/2012) Modified on 4/18/2012 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2012 121 MOTION for Protective Order AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 5/1/2012. Replies due by 5/8/2012. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 9, 2012 120 PROPOSED ORDER regarding response (re 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS LODGED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) Proposed Order Denying Defendant Facebook's Administrative Motion To File Documents And Portions Of Documents Under Seal filed bySusan Mainzer. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2012) Modified text to reflect title on pdf document on 4/10/2012 (srm, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2012 119 EXHIBITS regarding response (re 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS LODGED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) Exhibits 1 to Declaration of Robert S. Arns in Opposition To Defendant's Administrative Motion To Seal filed bySusan Mainzer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex.2 to Arns Decl. In Opposition to Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Arns Decl. in Opposition to Motino to Seal)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2012) Modified text to reflect title of pdf document on 4/10/2012 (srm, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2012 118 DECLARATION of Robert S. Arns in Support of response (re 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS LODGED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) Declaration of Robert S. Arns In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Administrative Motion To File Under Seal filed bySusan Mainzer. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2012) Modified text reflect the title of pdf document on 4/10/2012 (srm, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2012 117 RESPONSE (re 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS LODGED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant's Motion To File Additional Documents And Portions of Documents Under Seal filed bySusan Mainzer. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 6, 2012 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS LODGED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 5, 2012 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS LODGED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration SANDEEP N. SOLANKI, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/5/2012) Modified on 4/6/2012 attachment #1 Sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2012 114 Featured Case ORDER re 105 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/30/2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang re 106 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 112 Proposed Order re 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 111 Declaration of KEVIN M. OSBORNE in Support of 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 110 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS AND PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 109 Proposed Order re 106 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 108 Declaration of JONATHAN M. JAFFE in Support of 106 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 106 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 107 Declaration of ROBERT S. ARNS in Support of 106 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 106 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 106 MOTION to Certify Class AND NOTICE filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/19/2012. Replies due by 5/3/2012. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 28, 2012 105 Minute Entry: Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Deposition Questions (Mid-Deposition Dispute) held on 3/28/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 3/28/2012). Witness to respond to disputed questions presented to the Court. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:59 to 5:13.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2012)
March 21, 2012 104 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 100 Motion to Relate Case.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 20, 2012 103 Declaration of STEVEN R. WEINMANN in Support of 102 Opposition/Response to Motion, TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Related document(s) 102 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 102 OPPOSITION to ( 100 Facebook's MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related; ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/20/2012) Modified text on 3/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2012 101 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Ashlie Beringer and Jennifer Hall for Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Beringer, Ashlie) (Filed on 3/20/2012) Modified on 3/21/2012 attorney added to docket (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2012 100 MOTION to Relate Case Facebook's Admin Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown ISO Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Brown Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Brown Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Brown Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Brown Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Brown Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Brown Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Brown Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Brown Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Brown Declaration, # 11 Proposed Order Granting Admin Motion)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/16/2012) Modified on 3/19/2012 processed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2012 99 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 86 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Claims and Withdraw Class Representatives.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 9, 2012 98 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. Notice of Transfer of Related Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 6, 2012 97 REPLY (re 86 First MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS AND WITHDRAW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES-MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AND WITHDRAW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
February 29, 2012 96 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 94 Stipulation to Continue Schedule and Enlarge Page Limits for Briefing Re: Motion for Class Certification.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 28, 2012 95 Statement of Non-Opposition re 86 First MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS AND WITHDRAW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES-MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 86 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 27, 2012 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 Case Management Conference - Initial,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, Set Hearings,,, (Stipulation to Continue Schedule and Enlarge Page Limits for Briefing Re Motion for Class Certification) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 21, 2012 93 Featured Case ORDER re 80 denying Motion for Protective Order, filed by Angel Fraley, William Tait, James H Duval, Paul Wang, Susan Mainzer. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/21/2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 17, 2012 92 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/17/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 2/17/2012) re 26 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion For Protetive Order, And Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Facebook, Inc. The Court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/17/2012)
February 16, 2012 91 Brief re 80 Brief, Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 90 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 16, 2012 90 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 91 . *** RESPONSE (re 80 First MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS AND WITHDRAW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES-MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Matt Brown, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/16/2012) Modified on 2/16/2012 (wv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/16/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 89 Proposed Order re 86 First MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS AND WITHDRAW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES-MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND DISMISSING CLAIMS OF ANGEL FRALEY AND PAUL WANG by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 14, 2012 88 Declaration of STEVEN R. WEINMANN in Support of 86 First MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS AND WITHDRAW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES-MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 86 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 14, 2012 87 Declaration of PAUL WANG in Support of 86 First MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS AND WITHDRAW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES-MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Related document(s) 86 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 14, 2012 86 First MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS AND WITHDRAW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES-MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/28/2012. Replies due by 3/6/2012. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 14, 2012 85 Featured Case STIPULATION REQUESTING ORDER AND ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 78 Stipulation (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 13, 2012 84 Proposed Order re 26 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 linking entry to document #26 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2012 83 Declaration of ANGEL FRALEY IN SUPPORT OF 26 MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 linking entry to document #26 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2012 82 Declaration of Kevin M. Osborne IN SUPPORT OF 26 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 linking entry to document #26 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2012 81 Declaration of STEVEN R. WEINMANN IN SUPPORT OF 26 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 linking entry to document #26 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2012 80 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF 26 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 linking entry to document #26 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2012 79 Declaration of STEVEN R. WEINMANN in Support of 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Related document(s) 78 ) (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 13, 2012 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
January 17, 2012 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 1/17/12. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 9, 2012 77 Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to Second Amended Complaint byFacebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 1/9/12. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 1/17/12 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. The court will provide instructions for connecting to the call in a separate notice to the parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 27, 2011 76 Featured Case ORDER re 75 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/27/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 22, 2011 75 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (CIV. L.R. 6-1(B) by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 16, 2011 74 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 1, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 12/1/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 1/9/2012 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that the call-in information remains the same (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 17, 2011 73 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/29/2011, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2012. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 3, 2011 72 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Relevant to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 71 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 70 Motion for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decisions.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified text on 11/3/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 70 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decisions Relevant to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 69 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 70 . *** MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decisions Relevant to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 10/28/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 10/27/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 12/1/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 13, 2011 67 MDL ORDER DENYING TRANSFER: The Motion, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, for centralization of the actions listed on Schedule A is denied. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 29, 2011 66 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/29/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 9/29/2011) re 30 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.s MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2011)
September 15, 2011 65 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 Stipulation filed by Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 15, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
August 23, 2011 64 STIPULATION Re Protective Order For Litigation Involving Highly Sensitive Confidential Information And/Or Trade Secrets by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 23, 2011 63 OBJECTIONS to re 30 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.s MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT REPLY EVIDENCE L. R. 7-3(d) by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 22, 2011 62 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 56 Notice (Other) Notice of Filing of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Notice of Withdrawal of Its Administrative Motion (Civ. L.R. 3-12) in Cohen v. Facebook, Inc., Case No. 10-cv-05282-RS (N.D. Cal.) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 16, 2011 61 NOTICE by J. N. D. of Filing of Downey Plaintiffs' Response to Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Civ. L.R. 3-12) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Tamblyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 15, 2011 60 Request for Judicial Notice re 57 Reply to Opposition/Response, 31 Request for Judicial Notice, Facebook, Inc.s Reply in support of Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 57 , 31 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 59 Declaration of ANA YANG MULLER in Support of 57 Reply to Opposition/Response, Supplemental Declaration of Ana Yang Muller in support of Facebook, Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A2, # 2 Exhibit B2, # 3 Exhibit C2)(Related document(s) 57 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 58 Declaration of MATTHEW D. BROWN in Support of 57 Reply to Opposition/Response, Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in support of Facebook, Inc.s Reply in support of Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 57 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 57 REPLY (re 30 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.s MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) Facebook, Inc.s Reply in support of Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 12, 2011 56 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Filing of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion in Cohen v. Facebook, Inc., Case No. 10-cv-05282-RS (N.D. CAL.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 1, 2011 55 Proposed Order re 31 Request for Judicial Notice, DENYING DEFENDANT FACEBOOK'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 54 OPPOSITION AND OBJECTIONS to 31 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of ( 30 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 8/1/2011) Modified text on 8/4/2011 and linked entry to document #31 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2011 53 Proposed Order re 30 DEFENDANT FACEBOOK'S MOTION TO DISMISS by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 8/1/2011) Modified on 8/4/2011 linking entry to document #30 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2011 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION to ( 30 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 8/1/2011) Modified text on 8/4/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 51 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/28/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 7/28/2011), Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 7/28/2011) re 26 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion For Protetive Order, And Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Facebook, Inc.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 12/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2011)
July 25, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 7/25/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 10-27-11 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that all parties shall call 641-715-3200 and use access code 1007836 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 21, 2011 50 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 46 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Administrative Relief Extending of Time to File and Serve Opposition to Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 49 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [JOINT] filed by James H Duval, Facebook, Inc., Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 19, 2011 48 Proposed Order re 46 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion Extending Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 linking entry to document #46 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2011 47 Declaration of Robert S. Arns in Support of 46 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief Extending Time filed byJames H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 linking entry to document #46 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2011 46 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Administrative Relief Extending Time to File and Serve Opposition to 30 Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by James H Duval, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified text on 7/20/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2011 45 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposition to 30 Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s MOTION to Disimiss, by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/18/2011) Modified text on 7/20/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2011 44 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 7/25/11 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 641-715-3200 and use access code 1007836 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 12, 2011 43 Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki in Support of 41 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion for Protective Order filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 41 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 42 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of 41 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion for Protective Order filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 41 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 41 REPLY (re 26 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion For Protetive Order, And Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 6, 2011 40 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 5, 2011 39 Proposed Order (re 26 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed by James H Duval(a minor by and through ), James Duval(as guardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, Russell Tait, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/5/2011) Modified on 7/12/2011 counsel posted document using incorrect event type (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2011 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION to ( 26 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed by James H Duval(a minor by and through ), James Duval(as guardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, Russell Tait, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/5/2011) Modified text on 7/12/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2011 37 Declaration of Jonathan M. Jaffe in Support of Opposition to ( 26 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion For Protetive Order, And Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Declaration of Jonathan M. Jaffe in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Protective Order filed by James H Duval(a minor by and through ), James Duval(as uardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, Russell Tait, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/5/2011) Modified text on 7/12/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2011 36 Declaration of Steven R. Weinmann in Support of Opposition to ( 26 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion For Protetive Order, And Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Declaration of Steven R. Weinmann in Support of Opposition to Motion for Protective Order filed byJames H Duval(a minor by and through ), James Duval(as uardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, Russell Tait, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Arns, Robert) (Filed on 7/5/2011) Modified text on 7/12/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2011 35 Corrected Declaration of JEFFREY M. GUTKIN in Support of 30 FACEBOOK, INC.s MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT [Replacing Docket #33, filed in error] *** For EXHIBIT A and B. REFER TO DOCUMENT 33 . *** filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2011) Modified on 7/5/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 7/12/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2011 34 Proposed Order re 30 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.s MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 33 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 35 . *** Declaration of JEFFREY M. GUTKIN in Support of 30 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.s MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2011) Modified on 7/5/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2011 32 Declaration of ANA YANG MULLER in Support of 30 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.s MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 31 Request for Judicial Notice re 30 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.s MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Facebook, Inc.s Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 30 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.s MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/15/2011. Replies due by 7/22/2011. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 29, 2011 29 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING HEARING on 26 MOTION for Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/29/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 21, 2011 28 Proposed Order Granting Facebook, Inc.'s Motion For Protective Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 27 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of 26 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion For Protetive Order, And Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C 1 of 3, # 4 Exhibit C 2 of 3, # 5 Exhibit C 3 of 3, # 6 Exhibit D 1 of 2, # 7 Exhibit D 2 of 2, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F 1 of 2, # 10 Exhibit F 2 of 2, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 26 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 26 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion For Protetive Order, And Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/5/2011. Replies due by 7/12/2011. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 14, 2011 24 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Facebook, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 9, 2011 23 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 6, 2011 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT [SECOND] against Facebook, Inc.. Filed byPaul Wang, James H Duval(a minor by and through ), William Tait, Russell Tait, Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, James Duval(as uardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 25, 2011 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by James H Duval(a minor by and through ), James Duval(as uardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Angel Fraley, Susan Mainzer, Russell Tait, William Tait, Paul Wang (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/24/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options James Duval, Guardian ad Litem for James H. Duval (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 19, 2011 18 CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DATE OF MOTION HEARING Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 18, 2011 17 Request for Judicial Notice re 16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 18, 2011 16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ana Yang Muller In Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ana Yang Muller In Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ana Yang Muller In Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ana Yang Muller In Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ana Yang Muller In Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, # 6 Affidavit of Jeffrey M. Gutkin In Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin In Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, # 8 Proposed Order Granting Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 16, 2011 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Susan Mainzer (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 10, 2011 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Paul Wang (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 10, 2011 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Russel Tait, Guardian ad Litem for William Tait (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 10, 2011 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Angel Fraley (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 27, 2011 11 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 14, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/14/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 13, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 9 TERMINATING 6/28/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 6/28/2011 Case Management Conference Vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James H Duval(a minor by and through ), James Duval(as uardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Angel Fraley, Russell Tait, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by James H Duval(a minor by and through ), James Duval(as uardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Angel Fraley, Russell Tait, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 6 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) by Facebook, Inc. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/13/2011) Modified on 4/13/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2011 5 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action To the United States District Court from Santa Clara Superior Court. Filed by Facebook, Inc. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Text modified on 4/12/2011 Incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, # 2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, # 3 Standing Orders for San Jose Division Judges, # 4 Standing Orders for San Jose Division Judges)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Facebook, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (See Attachments to Notice of Removal for First Amended Class Action Complaint). (NO PROCESS); jury demand; from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 111CV196193. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611009443). Filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fraley et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Fraley
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Jaffe
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Wang
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Jaffe
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Duval
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Jaffe
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Duval
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Jaffe
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tait
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Jaffe
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Tait
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Jaffe
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Mainzer
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Jaffe
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey Gutkin
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]