King v. Google, Inc. et al

Defendant: Google, Inc., Flurry, Inc. and Mobclix, Inc
Plaintiff: Juliann King
Case Number: 5:2011cv02167
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/14/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
May 20, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Seeking Additional Information Re: Defendant Flurry, Inc.'s Motion to Relate Case Number 11-CV-02167-PSG to Case Number 10-CV-05878-LHK. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/20/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 26, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FINDING CASES NOT RELATED. This case is not related to 10-CV-05878. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/26/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Google, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flurry, Inc.
Represented By: Gail E. Lees
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobclix, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliann King
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Suzanne L. Havens Beckman
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: David A. Stampley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]