Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Apple Inc. alleged that Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC copied Apple's technology, user interface, and innovative style in its phone, media player, and table computer products. Patents allegedly infringed include:

  • 5,946,647 -System and method for performing an action on a structure in computer-generated data
  • 6,847,959 - Universal interface for retrieval of information in a computer system
  • 8,046,721 - Unlocking a device by performing gestures on an unlock image
  • 8,074,172 - Method, system, and graphical user interface for providing word recommendations
  • 8,014,760 - Missed telephone call management for a portable multifunction device
  • 5,666,502 - Graphical user interface using historical lists with field classes
  • 7,761,414 - Asynchronous data synchronization amongst devices
  • 8,086,604 - Universal interface for retrieval of information in a computer system

Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00630
Filed: February 8, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2014 1776 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE JOINT LIST OF ADMITTED EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/22/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 22, 2014 1775 MOTION to Withdraw 1774 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 5/6/2014. Replies due by 5/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 22, 2014 1774 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** EXHIBITS re 1771 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibit JX24 Public Redacted Version filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1771 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2014) Modified on 4/22/2014 (fff, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2014 1773 EXHIBITS re 1726 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses re Chevalier, Freeman, Kearl, Parulski, Rao, Schonfeld, Garcia, Hong, Mazur, Millet, and Storer Exhibit D (Public Version) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's HPO Brief (Consolidated Highlighted Version))(Related document(s) 1726 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 22, 2014 1772 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1771 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 22, 2014 1771 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibit JX24 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio ISO AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order Sealing JX24, # 3 Exhibit Highlighted Version of JX 24)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 21, 2014 1770 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/21/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/21/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1768 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1726 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses re Chevalier, Freeman, Kearl, Parulski, Rao, Schonfeld, Garcia, Hong, Mazur, Millet, and Storer filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1726 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1767 Featured Case ORDER RE APPLE'S DROPPED INVALIDITY CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/21/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1766 Featured Case ORDER RE SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES (NEW VERSION) re ECF No. 1740. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/21/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1765 Amended April 21, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified text on 4/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2014 1764 Brief Regarding Theories No Longer Asserted filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1763 Brief Samsung's Brief Regarding Evidence of Apple's Dropped Invalidity Case filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1762 April 21, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified text on 4/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2014 1761 Apple's April 21, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Apple Inc. (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified text on 4/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2014 1759 Featured Case ORDER RE APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES RE 1741-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/21/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified on 4/21/2014 (lhklc5, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2014 1758 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc. REVISED PROPOSED JOINT FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS WITH OBJECTIONS. (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1757 Proposed Form of Verdict by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsung's Statement Regarding the Parties' Proposed Verdict Forms. (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's Proposed Verdict Form)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1756 Brief Apple's Brief Regarding the Parties' Proposed Verdict Forms filed byApple Inc.. (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1755 Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc. . (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1754 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1709 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's HPO Brief re Chandler, Chase, DiCarlo, Erdem, Hall, Joswiak, Rangel, Reibstein, Schiller, Sinclair, and Winship, 1711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Disclosed by Apple and Subject to Samsungs April 16 High Priority Objections Regarding Sarah Chandler, Jeffrey Chase, Nick DiCarlo, Tulin Erdem, Gary Hall, Greg Joswiak, Art Rangel, David Reibstein (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1753 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1748 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1752 EXHIBITS re 1600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE BUCKLEY, HAUSER AND VELLTURO, AND MOTION TO SEAL Exhibit 2 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1600 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1751 Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Justin Denison, Nick DiCarlo, Jun Won Lee, Todd Mowry, Rory Sexton, Tim Sheppard and Alex Snoeren and Motion to Seal re 1593 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal HPO Brief (Public Version) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 1593 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified text on 4/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2014 1750 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLE'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT RE 1746. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/21/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 1749 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1742 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Apple's Notice of Filing of Materials Disclosed by Apple and Subject to Samsung's April 20 High Priority Objections Regarding Jeffrey Chase, Andrew Cockburn, Saul Greenberg, Kevin Jeffay, James, 1740 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Chase, Cockburn, Greenberg, Jeffay, Maccoun, Mowry, Rinard, Schonfeld, Snoeren, Vellturo, and Wignor, 1747 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 1741 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Jeffrey Chase, Andrew Cockburn, Saul Greenberg, Kevin Jeffay, James MacCoun, Todd Mowry, Martin Rinard, Alex Snoren, Christopher Vellturo, and filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1742 , 1740 , 1747 , 1741 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 20, 2014 1748 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Response to Samsung's Interrogatory No. 28 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apples Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/20/2014)
April 20, 2014 1747 EXHIBITS re 1741 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Jeffrey Chase, Andrew Cockburn, Saul Greenberg, Kevin Jeffay, James MacCoun, Todd Mowry, Martin Rinard, Alex Snoren, Christopher Vellturo, and --CORRECTED EXHIBIT 4 TO OLSON DECLARATION filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1741 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/20/2014)
April 20, 2014 1746 MOTION to Withdraw Incorrectly Filed Document (Exhibit 4 to Olson Declaration in Support of Apple's High Priority Objections Dkt. No. 1741 ) by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/20/2014) Modified on 4/21/2014 Counsel posted document incorrectly as a notice (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2014 1745 Samsung's April 20, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2014) Modified text on 4/21/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2014 1744 Apple's April 20, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/20/2014) Modified text on 4/21/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2014 1743 Updated List of Accused Products by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1737 Order (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/20/2014) Modified text on 4/21/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2014 1742 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Apple's Notice of Filing of Materials Disclosed by Apple and Subject to Samsung's April 20 High Priority Objections Regarding Jeffrey Chase, Andrew Cockburn, Saul Greenberg, Kevin Jeffay, James MacCoun, Todd Mowry, Martin Rinard, Alex Snoren, Christopher Vellturo, and Daniel Wigdor filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple's Notice of Filing of Materials Disclosed by Apple and Subject to Samsungs April 20 High Priority Objections Regarding Jeffrey Chase, Andrew Cockburn, Saul Greenberg, Kevin Jeffay, James MacCoun, Todd Mowry, Martin Rinard, Alex Snoren, Christopher Vellturo, and Daniel Wigdor, # 4 PDX-97.103, # 5 PDX-97.124, # 6 PTX-2003 (SEALED), # 7 PTX-2004 (SEALED))(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/20/2014)
April 20, 2014 1741 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Jeffrey Chase, Andrew Cockburn, Saul Greenberg, Kevin Jeffay, James MacCoun, Todd Mowry, Martin Rinard, Alex Snoren, Christopher Vellturo, and Daniel Wigdor filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 3 (SEALED) Apple's HPO Brief, # 4 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Apple's HPO Brief, # 5 Exhibit 1 (SEALED), # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3 (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit 4 ***DOCUMENT REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER 1750 *** (SEALED), # 9 Exhibit 5 (SEALED))(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/20/2014) (Attachment 8 replaced on 4/22/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/22/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2014 1740 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Chase, Cockburn, Greenberg, Jeffay, Maccoun, Mowry, Rinard, Schonfeld, Snoeren, Vellturo, and Wignor filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Fazio Declaration in Support of Samsung's HPO Brief, # 2 Fazio Exhibit A, # 3 Fazio Exhibit B, # 4 Fazio Exhibit C, # 5 Fazio Exhibit D, # 6 Fazio Exhibit E, # 7 Fazio Exhibit F, # 8 Fazio Exhibit G, # 9 Fazio Exhibit H, # 10 Fazio Exhibit I, # 11 Fazio Exhibit J, # 12 JX54 [Subject to HPO], # 13 PX2003 [Subject to HPO], # 14 PX2004 [Subject to HPO], # 15 DX306 - Part 1 [Subject to HPO], # 16 DX306 - Part 2 [Subject to HPO], # 17 DX339 - Notice of Manual Filing [Subject to HPO], # 18 DX462 [Subject to HPO], # 19 PDX97.103 [Subject to HPO], # 20 PDX97.124 [Subject to HPO], # 21 SDX4032 [Subject to HPO], # 22 Collaborative, Programmable Intelligent Agents [Subject to HPO], # 23 Vellturo Testimony [Subject to HPO], # 24 Maccoun Testimony [Subject to HPO], # 25 Fazio Declaration in Support of Sealing Trial Exhibits and Demonstratives, # 26 Proposed Order Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits and Demonstratives, # 27 JX50-A [Subject to Sealing Request], # 28 PX2003 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 29 PX2004 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 30 DX314A [Subject to Sealing Request], # 31 PDX92.86 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 32 PDX92.86A [Subject to Sealing Request], # 33 SDX3792 [Subject to Sealing Request])(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2014)
April 20, 2014 1739 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1727 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Judith Chevalier, Michael Freeman, Roberto Garcia, Jong Pil Hong, James Kearl, Tracey Mazur, Tim Millet, Ken Parulski, Sanjay Rao, Dan Schonfe Voice Over Cellular Inventions (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/20/2014)
April 19, 2014 1738 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1727 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Judith Chevalier, Michael Freeman, Roberto Garcia, Jong Pil Hong, James Kearl, Tracey Mazur, Tim Millet, Ken Parulski, Sanjay Rao, Dan Schonfe upon MAL (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1737 Featured Case ORDER ON ACCUSED PRODUCTS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/19/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1736 Featured Case ORDER ON VERDICT FORMS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/19/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1735 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING APPLE'S SEALING REQUESTS.Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/19/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1734 Featured Case ORDER RE SAMSUNG'S SEALING REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/19/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1733 Featured Case ORDER RE SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES RE 1726-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/19/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1732 EXHIBITS re 1727 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Judith Chevalier, Michael Freeman, Roberto Garcia, Jong Pil Hong, James Kearl, Tracey Mazur, Tim Millet, Ken Parulski, Sanjay Rao, Dan Schonfe --(SEALED) DX-453A--ATTACHMENT TO 1731 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS SUBJECT TO APPLE APRIL 19 MOTION TO SEAL PURSUANT TO DKT. 1730 filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1727 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1731 NOTICE of Filing of Materials Subject to Apple's April 19 Motion to Seal Pursuant to Dkt. 1730 , re 1727 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Judith Chevalier, Michael Freeman, Roberto Garcia, Jong Pil Hong, James Kearl, Tracey Mazur, Tim Millet, Ken Parulski, Sanjay Rao, Dan Schonfe filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 (SEALED) DX371, # 2 (SEALED) DX390, # 3 (SEALED) DX391A, # 4 (SEALED) DX402, # 5 (SEALED) DX499, # 6 (SEALED) PDX102, # 7 (SEALED) SDX3784-3807, # 8 (SEALED) SDX3935, # 9 (SEALED) SDX3721-3750, # 10 (SEALED) PTX295, # 11 (SEALED) SDX3977-4001)(Related document(s) 1727 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/19/2014) Modified text on 4/21/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2014 1730 Featured Case ORDER RE APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES RE 1727-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/19/2014. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1729 Declaration of Christopher Kelley (Intel) in Support of 1727 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Judith Chevalier, Michael Freeman, Roberto Garcia, Jong Pil Hong, James Kearl, Tracey Mazur, Tim Millet, Ken Parulski, Sanjay Rao, Dan Schonfe, 1726 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses re Chevalier, Freeman, Kearl, Parulski, Rao, Schonfeld, Garcia, Hong, Mazur, Millet, and Storer filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1727 , 1726 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1728 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Notice of Filing of Materials Disclosed by Apple and Subject to Samsungs April 19 High Priority Objections Regarding Judith Chevalier, Mitchael Freeman, Michael Freeman, Roberto Garcia, JP Hong, James Kearl, Tracey Mazur, Tim Millet, Ken Parulski, Sanjay Rao, Dan Schonfeld, and James Storer filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple's Notice of Filing of Materials Disclosed by Apple and Subject to Samsungs April 19 High Priority Objections Regarding Judith Chevalier, Mitchael Freeman, Michael Freeman, Roberto Garcia, JP Hong, James Kearl, Tracey Mazur, Tim Millet, Ken Parulski, Sanjay Rao, Dan Schonfeld, and James Storer, # 4 (SEALED) JP Hong Deposition Excerpt, # 5 Analysis Group Website Pages (Part A), # 6 Analysis Group Website Pages (Part B), # 7 PTX-248, # 8 PTX-249, # 9 (SEALED) PTX-251, # 10 (SEALED) PTX-253, # 11 PTX-254, # 12 Rao, Sanjay - Empirical Appraisal of Conjoint Choice Simulators, # 13 Robert Evatt Article)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1727 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Judith Chevalier, Michael Freeman, Roberto Garcia, Jong Pil Hong, James Kearl, Tracey Mazur, Tim Millet, Ken Parulski, Sanjay Rao, Dan Schonfeld, James Storer filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik J. Olson in Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Motion to Seal, # 3 (SEALED) Apples Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Judith Chevalier, Michael Freeman, Roberto Garcia, Jong Pil Hong, James Kearl, Tracey Mazur, Tim Millet, Ken Parulski, Sanjay Rao, Dan Schonfeld, James Storer, # 4 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Apples HPO Brief, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2 (SEALED), # 7 Exhibit 3 (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit 4 (SEALED), # 9 Exhibit 5 (SEALED), # 10 Exhibit 6 (SEALED), # 11 Exhibit 7 (SEALED), # 12 Exhibit 8 (SEALED), # 13 Exhibit 9 (SEALED), # 14 Exhibit 10 (SEALED), # 15 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Sealing Materials that Apple and Samsung May Use During the Examinations of Chevalier, Freeman, Freeman, Garcia, Hong, Kearl, Mazur, Millet, Parulski, Rao, Schonfeld, and Storer, # 16 Proposed Order Sealing Materials that Apple and Samsung May Use During the Examinations of Chevalier, Freeman, Freeman, Garcia, Hong, Kearl, Mazur, Millet, Parulski, Rao, Schonfeld, and Storer)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 19, 2014 1726 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses re Chevalier, Freeman, Kearl, Parulski, Rao, Schonfeld, Garcia, Hong, Mazur, Millet, and Storer filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Fazio in Support of Samsung's Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Samsung's Objections and Responses re Chevalier, Freeman, Kearl, Parulski, Rao, Schonfeld, Garcia, Hong, Mazur, Millet, and Storer, # 4 Fazio Declaration in Support of Samsung's HPO Brief, # 5 Fazio Exhibit A, # 6 Fazio Exhibit B, # 7 Fazio Exhibit C, # 8 Fazio Exhibit D, # 9 Fazio Exhibit E, # 10 Fazio Exhibit F, # 11 Fazio Exhibit G, # 12 JX 41 [Subject to HPO], # 13 JX 42 [Subject to HPO], # 14 JX 43 [Subject to HPO], # 15 PX294 [NMF] [Subject to HPO], # 16 PX298 [NMF] [Subject to HPO], # 17 DX390 [Subject to HPO], # 18 DX396 [Subject to HPO], # 19 PTX248 [Subject to HPO], # 20 PTX249 [Subject to HPO], # 21 PTX251 [Subject to HPO]}, # 22 PTX253 [Subject to HPO}, # 23 PTX254 [Subject to HPO}, # 24 PTX255 [Subject to HPO}, # 25 PTX257 [Subject to HPO]}, # 26 SDX3705 [Subject to HPO], # 27 SDX3706 [Subject to HPO], # 28 SDX3786 [Subject to HPO]}, # 29 SDX3912 [Subject to HPO]}, # 30 SDX3994 [Subject to HPO], # 31 SDX3995 [Subject to HPO], # 32 DX3996 [Subject to HPO], # 33 Apple's Opening Demonstrative No. 56 [Subject to HPO], # 34 Samsung's Opening Demonstrative No. 15 [Subject to HPO], # 35 Hong Designations [Subject to HPO], # 36 Analysis Group Survey Methods [Subject to HPO], # 37 Rao Article [Subject to HPO], # 38 Robert Evatt Article [Subject to HPO], # 39 Fazio Declaration in Support of Sealing Trial Exhibits, # 40 Proposed Order Sealing Trial Exhibits, # 41 DX431 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 42 DX453A [Subject to Sealing Request], # 43 PTX153 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 44 PTX183 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 45 PTX201 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 46 PTX204 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 47 PTX246 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 48 PDX102 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 49 SDX [Subject to Sealing Request], # 50 DX353 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 51 DX396 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 52 DX491 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 53 SDX3720-24 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 54 SDX3926 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 55 SDX3977-79, 90-92 [Subject to Sealing Request])(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 18, 2014 1769 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/18/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/18/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2014)
April 17, 2014 1724 Samsung's April 17, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified text on 4/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2014 1723 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1672 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Apple's HPO Brief Re Butler, Denison, Frid-Nielsen, Gogergy, Greenberg, Jeffay, Kahle, Kim, Lundberg, Pfeifer, Rinard, Wigdor, and Wong (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 1722 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1545 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1668 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 1721 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES RE 1709-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/17/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 1720 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES RE 1710-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/17/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 1719 Joint List of Admitted Exhibits Through April 15, 2014 by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified text on 4/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2014 1718 EXHIBITS re 1546 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE GREGORY CHRISTIE, KEN KOCIENDA, PHIL SCHILLER AND ANDREW COCKBURN, 1666 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Bjorn Bringert, Todd Pendleton, and Paul Westbrook, and Notice Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits REDACTED version of Ex. 4 to Olson Declaration ISO Apple's HPO Brief re Christie, Kocienda, Schiller, and Cockburn [1546-8] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED version of Apple's April 12, 2012 HPO Brief [1666-3], # 2 UNREDACTED version of Apple's April 12, 2012 HPO Brief [1666-3])(Related document(s) 1546 , 1666 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 1717 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-15-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 1716 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-14-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 1715 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-11-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 1714 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-8-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 1713 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1710 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re: Chandler, Chase, DiCarlo, Erdem, Hall, Joswiak, Rangel, Reibstein, Schiller, Sinclair, and Winship (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 1712 EXHIBITS re 1638 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -Notice of Filing of Materials Subject to Samsung's April 9 HPOs Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, and Sohn, 1637 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, and Sohn, and Notice Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits --REDACTED version of [1637-3] Apple's HPO Brief Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, Sohn, and Notice Re Sealing of Trial Exhibits filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 UNREDACTED version of [1637-3] Apple's HPO Brief Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, Sohn, and Notice Re Sealing of Trial Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Olson Decl. iso Apple's HPO Brief [1637-6] (Publicly Filed), # 3 Exhibit 7 to Olson Decl. iso Apple's HPO Brief [1637-11] (Publicly Filed), # 4 (Publicly Filed) [1638-6] Hackborn Dep. Ex 4, # 5 (Publicly Filed) [1638-9] PTX-147)(Related document(s) 1638 , 1637 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 1711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Disclosed by Apple and Subject to Samsungs April 16 High Priority Objections Regarding Sarah Chandler, Jeffrey Chase, Nick DiCarlo, Tulin Erdem, Gary Hall, Greg Joswiak, Art Rangel, David Reibstein, Philip Schiller, Steven Sinclair, and Daniel Winship filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ruth N. Borenstein, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Filing Materials Subject to Samsung's April 16 HPOs Re Chandler, Chase, DiCarlo, Erdem, Hall, Joswiak, Rangle, Reibstein, Schiller, Sinclair, and Winship, # 4 Exhibit --Chandler Dep., # 5 Exhibit --PTX-218 (SEALED), # 6 Exhibit --WSJ Article, # 7 Exhibit --AT&T Website for Galaxy S3, # 8 Exhibit --Rangel Dep., # 9 Exhibit --Samsung Website for Galaxy S3, # 10 Exhibit --Schiller Dep.)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 1710 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re: Chandler, Chase, DiCarlo, Erdem, Hall, Joswiak, Rangel, Reibstein, Schiller, Sinclair, and Winship filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio iso Admin. Mot. to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Admin. Mot. to Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Samsung's High Priority Objection and Responses, # 4 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Fazio, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Fazio, # 7 Exhibit C to Fazio, # 8 Exhibit D to Fazio, # 9 Exhibit E to Fazio, # 10 Exhibit F to Fazio, # 11 Proposed Order Granting Request to Seal Trial Exhibit, # 12 PX218 [Subject to HPO], # 13 DX319 [Subject to HPO], # 14 DX320 [Subject to HPO], # 15 DX323 [Subject to HPO] (Part 1 of 2), # 16 DX323 [Subject to HPO] (Part 2 of 2), # 17 DX404 [Subject to HPO], # 18 DX454A [Subject to HPO], # 19 DX489 [Subject to HPO] (Part 1 of 2), # 20 DX489 [Subject to HPO] (Part 2 of 2), # 21 DX493 [Subject to HPO], # 22 SDX3138 [Subject to HPO], # 23 SDX3139 [Subject to HPO], # 24 SDX3171 [Subject to HPO], # 25 SDX3175 [Subject to HPO], # 26 SDX3541 [Subject to HPO], # 27 SDX3544 [Subject to HPO], # 28 SDX3602 [Subject to HPO], # 29 Excerpts from Chandler Deposition [Subject to HPO], # 30 Excerpts from Hall Deposition [Subject to HPO], # 31 Excerpts from Joswiak Deposition [Subject to HPO], # 32 Excerpts from April 5, 2012 Rangel Deposition [Subject to HPO], # 33 Excerpts from June 25, 2013 Rangel Deposition [Subject to HPO], # 34 Excerpts from Schiller Deposition [Subject to HPO], # 35 Excerpts from Sinclair Deposition [Subject to HPO], # 36 WSJ Article [Subject to HPO], # 37 Galaxy S3 Websites [Subject to HPO], # 38 Excerpts from DX437A [Subject to Sealing Request])(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 1709 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's HPO Brief re Chandler, Chase, DiCarlo, Erdem, Hall, Joswiak, Rangel, Reibstein, Schiller, Sinclair, and Winship filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ruth N. Borenstein, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 (SEALED) Apple's HPO Brief re Chandler, Chase, DiCarlo, Erdem, Hall, Joswiak, Rangel, Reibstein, Schiller, Sinclair, and Winship, # 4 Declaration of Ruth N. Borenstein ISO Apple's HPO Brief re Chandler, Chase, DiCarlo, Erdem, Hall, Joswiak, Rangel, Reibstein, Schiller, Sinclair, and Winship, # 5 Exhibit 1 (SEALED), # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3 (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 (SEALED), # 10 Exhibit 6)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 15, 2014 1725 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/15/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/15/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 1708 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses Re: Exhibits and Demonstratives for Denison, Frid-Nielsen, Gogerty, Greenberg, Jeffay, Kahle, Kim, Lundberg, Pfeifer, Rinard, Wigdor, Wong Notice Regarding Samsungs Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 1706 Declaration of William J. Harmon in Support of 1673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses Re: Exhibits and Demonstratives for Denison, Frid-Nielsen, Gogerty, Greenberg, Jeffay, Kahle, Kim, Lundberg, Pfeifer, Rinard, Wigdor, Wong DECLARATION OF THIRD-PARTY MICROSOFT IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNGS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES REGARDING EXHIBITS CONTAINING HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL MICROSOFT INFORMATION filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1673 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 14, 2014 1707 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/14/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/14/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1705 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1704 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1704 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal JX50B and JX50C (Renewed) Pursuant to Court's April 14, 2014 Order (Dkt. 1699) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Renewed Motion to Seal JX50B and JX50C)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1703 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1700 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1702 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Apple's Notice of Lodging PX3005 (Attachments: # 1 PX3005)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1701 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLES SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNGS DISCLOSURES RE 1689.Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/14/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1700 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES RE 1672-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/14/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1699 Featured Case ORDER RE (1) SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES IN CONNECTION WITH SAUL GREENBERG AND KEVIN JEFFAY, AND (2) SAMSUNG'S SEALING REQUESTS RE: 1673-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/14/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1698 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) of Lodging DX506 (Attachments: # 1 DX506 (Thomas Bonura Clip Report))(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1697 Samsung's April 14, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014) Modified text on 4/15/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2014 1696 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1637 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, and Sohn, and Notice Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1695 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1694 Response ( Non Motion ), 1693 Notice (Other),, SAMSUNG'S REPLY TO APPLE'S RESPONSE RE: RESOLUTION OF APPLE'S HPOS RE: JEFFAY DEMONSTRATIVES (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1694 RESPONSE to re 1693 Notice (Other),, Apple's Response to Samsung's Notice Re: Resolution of Apple's High Priority Objections to Jeffary Demonstratives SDX2562 and SDX2558 by Apple Inc.. (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1693 NOTICE RE: RESOLUTION OF APPLE'S HIGH PRIORITY OBJECTIONS TO JEFFAY DEMONSTRATIVES SDX2562 AND SDX2558 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1689 Objection, 1688 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Responses to Apple's Supplemental High Priority Objections re: Greenberg, Jeffay, Lundberg, Pfeifer, and Wigdor (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014) Modified text on 4/15/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2014 1692 NOTICE RE: RESOLUTION OF APPLE'S HIGH PRIORITY OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS AND DEMONSTRATIVES DISCLOSED FOR YOUNGMI KIM by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014) Modified text on 4/15/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2014 1691 Featured Case ORDER RE APPLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTION TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES IN CONNECTION WITH YOUNGMI KIM RE: 1689. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/14/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1690 Featured Case ORDER RE SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES IN CONNECTION WITH JUSTIN DENISON RE: 1673-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/14/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1689 Apple's Supplemental Objections Regarding Saul Greenberg, Keven Jaffay, Youngmi Kim, Jim Lundberg, Ulrich Pfeifer, Martin Rinard, and Daniel Wigdor by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ruth N. Borenstein, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/14/2014) Modified text on 4/15/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2014 1688 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Responses to Apple's Supplemental High Priority Objections re: Greenberg, Jeffay, Lundberg, Pfeifer, and Wigdor filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Samsung's Responses to Apple's Supplemental High Priority Objections, # 3 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Responses, # 4 Exhibit A to Fazio, # 5 Exhibit B to Fazio, # 6 JX61 [Subject to HPO], # 7 DX301 [Subject to HPO], # 8 DX313 [Subject to HPO], # 9 DX321 [Subject to HPO], # 10 SDX2558 [Subject to HPO], # 11 SDX2562 [Subject to HPO], # 12 SDX2707 [Subject to HPO], # 13 SDX2744 [Subject to HPO])(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1687 Featured Case ORDER RE APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES IN CONNECTION WITH YOUNGMI KIM RE: 1672-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/14/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 1686 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses Re: Exhibits and Demonstratives for Denison, Frid-Nielsen, Gogerty, Greenberg, Jeffay, Kahle, Kim, Lundberg, Pfeifer, Rinard, Wigdor, Wong filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1673 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 13, 2014 1684 Samsung's April 13 Rolling List of 7 Witnesses by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2014) Modified text on 4/15/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2014 1683 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 1517 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1546 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1563 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1581 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1618 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1682 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 1663 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1681 Featured Case ORDER RE APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES RE 1666-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/13/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1680 Featured Case ORDER RE SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES RE 1668-3.. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/13/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1679 Featured Case ORDER RE SAMSUNG'S DESIGNATION OF THIRTY WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/13/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1678 Featured Case ORDER ON JOINT NOTICE REGARDING DX411. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/13/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1677 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1671 Stipulation.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1676 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1664 Stipulation.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1675 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1668 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bringert, Pendleton, and Westbrook, 1666 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Bjorn Bringert, Todd Pendleton, and Paul Westbrook, and Notice Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1668 , 1666 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1674 NOTICE by Apple Inc. --NOTICE OF FILING OF MATERIALS SUBJECT TO SAMSUNG'S APRIL 13 HIGH PRIORITY OBJECTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit --WSJ Article, Samsung Tweaks How it Calculates Marketing Costs)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses Re: Exhibits and Demonstratives for Denison, Frid-Nielsen, Gogerty, Greenberg, Jeffay, Kahle, Kim, Lundberg, Pfeifer, Rinard, Wigdor, Wong filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio iso Admin. Mot. to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Admin. Mot. to Seal, # 3 Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses, # 4 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses, # 5 Exhibit A to Fazio, # 6 Exhibit B to Fazio, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C to Fazio, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to Fazio, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E to Fazio, # 10 Exhibit F to Fazio, # 11 Exhibit G to Fazio, # 12 Exhibit H to Fazio, # 13 Exhibit I to Fazio, # 14 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio iso Samsung's Request to Seal Trial Exhibits, # 15 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Request to Seal Trial Exhibits, # 16 April 26 Cohen Declaration [Subject to HPO], # 17 DX305 [Subject to HPO], # 18 DX310 [Subject to HPO], # 19 DX311 [Subject to HPO], # 20 DX312 [ Subject to HPO], # 21 DX314 [Subject to HPO], # 22 DX318 [Subject to HPO], # 23 DX320 [Subject to HPO], # 24 DX323 [Subject to HPO] (Part 1 of 2), # 25 DX323 [Subject to HPO] (Part 2 of 2), # 26 DX324 [Subject to HPO] (Part 1 of 5), # 27 DX324 [Subject to HPO] (Part 2 of 5), # 28 DX324 [Subject to HPO] (Part 3 of 5), # 29 DX324 [Subject to HPO] (Part 4 of 5), # 30 DX324 [Subject to HPO] (Part 5 of 5), # 31 DX326 [Subject to HPO], # 32 DX342 [Subject to HPO], # 33 DX345 [Subject to HPO], # 34 SDX2693 [Subject to HPO], # 35 WSJ Article [Subject to HPO], # 36 JX50B [Subject to Sealing Request], # 37 JX50C [Subject to Sealing Request], # 38 JX51B [Subject to Sealing Request], # 39 JX51C [Subject to Sealing Request], # 40 Excerpts from PX200 [Subject to Sealing Request] (Part 1 of 4), # 41 Excerpts from PX200 [Subject to Sealing Request] (Part 2 of 4), # 42 Excerpts from PX200 [Subject to Sealing Request] (Part 3 of 4), # 43 Excerpts from PX200 [Subject to Sealing Request] (Part 4 of 4), # 44 Excerpts from PX201 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 45 Excerpts from PX216 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 46 DX314 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 47 DX316 [Subject to Sealing Request], # 48 SDX2570 [Subject to Sealing Request])(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 13, 2014 1672 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Apple's HPO Brief Re Butler, Denison, Frid-Nielsen, Gogergy, Greenberg, Jeffay, Kahle, Kim, Lundberg, Pfeifer, Rinard, Wigdor, and Wong filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Admin. Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 (SEALED) Apple's HPO Brief Re Butler, Denison, Frid-Nielsen, Gogergy, Greenberg, Jeffay, Kahle, Kim, Lundberg, Pfeifer, Rinard, Wigdor and Wong, and Motion to Seal, # 4 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Apple's HPO Brief, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3 (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9 (SEALED), # 14 Exhibit 10 (SEALED), # 15 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Sealing Materials that May Be Used During Examinations, # 16 Proposed Order Sealing Materials)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/13/2014)
April 12, 2014 1671 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Authenticity of Trial Exhibits filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/12/2014)
April 12, 2014 1670 OPPOSITION to ( 1663 Samsung's MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/12/2014) Modified text on 4/15/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2014 1669 EXHIBITS re 1668 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bringert, Pendleton, and Westbrook New York Times article, Samsung: Uneasy in the Lead filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1668 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2014)
April 12, 2014 1668 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bringert, Pendleton, and Westbrook filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 3 Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bringert, Pendleton, and Westbrook [Unredacted Version], # 4 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio ISO Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bringert, Pendleton, and Westbrook, # 5 Exhibit A to Fazio Decl., # 6 Exhibit B to Fazio Decl., # 7 Exhibit C to Fazio Decl., # 8 Exhibit D to Fazio Decl., # 9 Exhibit E to Fazio Decl., # 10 Declaration of Fazio in Support of Samsung's Request to Seal Trial Material, # 11 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Request to Seal Trial Materials, # 12 PX154 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 13 PX202 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 14 PX203 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 15 PX227 (Subject to HPO) [unredacted version], # 16 PX268 (Subject to HPO), # 17 SDX2516 (Subject to HPO), # 18 Movie 3 (Subject to HPO))(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2014)
April 12, 2014 1667 NOTICE of Filing of Materials Subject to Samsung's April 12 High Priority Objections Regarding Bjorn Bringert, Todd Pendleton, and Paul Westbrook by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -- PTX-268, # 2 Exhibit -- "Samsung Uneasy in the Lead," NY Times)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/12/2014) Modified text on 4/15/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2014 1666 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Bjorn Bringert, Todd Pendleton, and Paul Westbrook, and Notice Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik J. Olson, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 (SEALED) Apple's HPO Brief Re Bringert, Pendleton and Westbrook, and Notice Re Sealing of Trial Exhibits)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/12/2014)
April 11, 2014 1685 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/11/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/11/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 1665 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Joint Notice Regarding DX411 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 1664 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE AUTHENTICITY OF A DOCUMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 1663 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 4/25/2014. Replies due by 5/2/2014. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 1662 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, Sohn, 1649 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 1661 Featured Case ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE FOR JURORS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/11/14. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 1660 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 1658 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 1658 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of PX229 Pursuant to Court's April 10, 2014 Order (Dkt. 1656) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of PX229, # 2 Supplement Granting Renewed Motion to Seal)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 10, 2014 1657 RESPONSE to re 1653 Notice (Other), Apple's Response to Samsung's "Proffer of Excluded Evidence Regarding Apple's Past Licenses and Licensing Positions" by Apple Inc.. (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 1656 Featured Case ORDER RE SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES RE 1639-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/10/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 1655 Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsung's April 10, 2014 Rolling Witness List. (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 1654 Featured Case ORDER RE APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES RE 1637-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/10/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 1653 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) SAMSUNGS PROFFER OF EXCLUDED EVIDENCE REGARDING APPLES PAST LICENSES AND LICENSING POSITIONS (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 1652 Exhibit List - Joint List of Exhibits Admitted Through April 8, 2014 by Apple Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Updated Joint List of Admitted Exhibits)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 1651 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1640 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 1638 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -Notice of Filing of Materials Subject to Samsung's April 9 HPOs Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, and Sohn, 1639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, Sohn, 1637 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, and Sohn, and Notice Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan In Support of Apple's and Samsung's Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [Docket Nos. 1637, 1638, 1639, 1640] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1640 , 1638 , 1639 , 1637 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 9, 2014 1650 Featured Case ORDER REMOVING EXHIBIT RE: 1648. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/9/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1649 EXHIBITS re 1639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, Sohn CORRECTED EXHIBIT B TO FAZIO DECLARATION filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1639 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1648 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT (EXHIBIT B TO FAZIO DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNGS HIGH PRIORITY OBJECTIONS [DKT. NO. 1639-6]) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2014) Modified on 4/15/2014 Incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2014 1647 ERRATA re 1639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, Sohn by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1646 EXHIBITS re 1600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE BUCKLEY, HAUSER AND VELLTURO, AND MOTION TO SEAL -- REDACTED version of [1600-6] Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Apple's HPO Brief [1600-3] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 (SEALED) Exhibit 2 to Olson Decl. ISO Apple's HPO Brief [1600-3])(Related document(s) 1600 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1645 EXHIBITS re 1581 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal REDACTED VERSIONS of Exhbit 3 1583 and Exhibit 4 [1583-1] to Declaration of Rachel Krevans in Support of Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's April 3, 2014 Order [1581-4] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 - REDACTED VERSION)(Related document(s) 1581 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1644 Brief on Plaintiff Exhibit 137/137A filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Fazio Declaration)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1643 Brief Apple's Brief Supporting Admission of PX137A filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1642 Proposed Form of Verdict by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) . (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1641 Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc. APPLE INC.S REVISED SUBMISSION REGARDING FORM OF VERDICT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1640 EXHIBITS re 1639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, Sohn Excerpts from PDX88 (Subject to HPO) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1639 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, Sohn filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio iso Admin Mot to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Admin Mot to Seal, # 3 Samsung's High Priority Objections and Resposnes re: Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, Sohn, # 4 Declaration of Fazio in Support of Samsung's HPO Brief, # 5 Exhibit A to Fazio, # 6 ***DOCUMENT REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER 1650 ***Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Fazio, # 7 Exhibit C to Fazio, # 8 Exhibit D to Fazio, # 9 Declaration of Fazio in Support of Samsung's Request to Seal Trial Materials, # 10 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Request to Seal Trial Materials, # 11 Bonura 12/11/2012 Transcript (Subject to HPO), # 12 Exhibit 5 to Clark Deposition (Subject to HPO), # 13 Exhibit 4 to Hackborn Deposition (Subject to HPO), # 14 PX147 (Subject to HPO), # 15 PX212 (Subject to HPO), # 16 PX221 (Subject to HPO), # 17 PX227 (Subject to HPO), # 18 DX336 (Subject to HPO), # 19 Excerpts from PX164 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 20 Excerpts from PX165 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 21 Excerpts from PX200 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 22 Excerpts from PX202 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 23 Excerpts from PX203 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 24 PX212 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 25 PX221 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 26 PX227 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 27 PX229 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 28 PX242 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 29 DX336 (Subject to Sealing Request), # 30 Excerpts from PDX88 (Subject to Sealing Request))(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2014) (Attachment 6 replaced on 4/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2014 1638 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -Notice of Filing of Materials Subject to Samsung's April 9 HPOs Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, and Sohn filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Filing of Materials Subject to Samsung's April 9 HPOs Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, and Sohn, # 4 Exhibit --12-11-12 Bonura Deposition, # 5 Exhibit --Clark Ex 5 (SEALED), # 6 Exhibit --Hackborn Ex 4 (SEALED), # 7 Exhibit --PTX-212 (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit --PTX 221 (SEALED), # 9 Exhibit --PTX-147 (SEALED), # 10 Exhibit --PTX-227 (SEALED))(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 1637 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, and Sohn, and Notice Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 (SEALED) Apple's Objections and Response to Objections Re Bonura, Clark, Hackborn, Lockheimer, and Sohn, and Notice Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits, # 4 Declaration of Erik J. Olson ISO Apple's HPO Brief, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2 (SEALED), # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7 (SEALED), # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9 (SEALED))(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 8, 2014 1659 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/8/2014 before Judge Lucy H. koh (Date Filed: 4/8/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 1636 NOTICE of Lodging Deposition Testimony by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2014) Modified text on 4/9/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 1634 NOTICE of Lodging Deposition Testimony by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 4/8/2014) Modified text on 4/9/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 1633 NOTICE Regarding 1581 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 1583 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2014) Modified on 4/9/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 1632 NOTICE Regarding 1593 Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2014) Modified text on 4/9/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 1631 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1630 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 1630 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order re Entry of Source Code Into Evidence, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 1635 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/7/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/7/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1629 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1620 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1628 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1627 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1627 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Trial Exhibits Pursuant to Court's April 7, 2014 Order (Dkt. No. 1619) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Motion to Seal, # 2 Excerpts from DX432, # 3 Excerpts from DX433, # 4 Excerpts from DX434, # 5 Excerpts from DX435 Part 1 of 3, # 6 Excerpts from DX435 Part 2 of 3, # 7 Excerpts from DX435 Part 3 of 3, # 8 Excerpts from DX436, # 9 Excerpts from DX437, # 10 Excerpts from DX438, # 11 Excerpts from DX439, # 12 Excerpts from PX217, # 13 Excerpts from PX182, # 14 Excerpts from PX185)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1626 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES RE: 1600-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/7/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1625 Apple's April 7, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Apple Inc.. (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified text on 4/8/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 1624 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-7-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1623 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-4-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1622 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-1-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1621 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-31-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1620 Notice of Submission of Demonstratives Subject to Pending Motion to Seal (Docket No. 1600-3) and Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Video Demonstratives filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Excerpts from PDX92)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified text on 4/8/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 1619 Featured Case ORDER ON SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES RE 1605-1. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/7/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1618 NOTICE OF ERRATA Regarding Samsung's Request to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits Related to the Parties' Disclsoures for John Hauser, Mark Buckley, and Chris Vellturo (Related to Dkt. No. 1601-3) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Version of Slides Sought to Be Sealed, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Sealing)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified text on 4/8/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 1616 Featured Case ORDER ON SEALING AND OBJECTIONS FOR TRIAL EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/7/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1615 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1611 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Apple Demonstratives Disclosed for Dr. Snoeren filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 2 Highlighted Version of PDX 91.44, # 3 Highlighted Version of PDX 91.45, # 4 Highlighted Version of PDX 91.46, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1613 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1612 Stipulation (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1612 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Re "Victory" Phone filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 1611 Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Materials Pursuant to Court's April 6, 2014 Order (Dkt. 1609 ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 2 Exhibit A to Fazio, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Motion to Seal, # 4 Highlighted Version of PDX91.16, # 5 Highlighted Version of PDX91.17, # 6 Highlighted Version of PDX91.18, # 7 Highlighted Version of Samsung's Third Supplemental Response to Rog 41, # 8 Highlighted Version of Samsung's Objection and Response to Rog 48, # 9 Highlighted Version of Appendix A to Response to Rog 48, # 10 Highlighted Version of Samsung's Supplemental Responses to Rogs 28 and 29)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified text on 4/8/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2014 1610 Apple's April 6, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/6/2014) Modified text on 4/7/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2014 1609 Featured Case ORDER ON SAMSUNG'S MOTION TO SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH APPLE'S DISCLOSURES RE: 1592. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/6/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2014)
April 6, 2014 1608 Featured Case ORDER ON SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES RE: 1592. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/6/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2014)
April 6, 2014 1607 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES RE: 1593-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/6/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2014)
April 6, 2014 1606 NOTICE OF ERRATA regarding the Declaration of Erik J. Olson in Support of Sealing Material that Apple and Samsung May Use During the Examinations of Buckley, Hauser, and Vellturo [1600-7] re 1600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/6/2014) Modified TEXT on 4/7/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2014 1605 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re: Buckley, Hauser, and Vellturo (Dkt. 1601 ) (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re: Buckley, Hauser, and Vellturo, # 2 Exhibit A to Fazio, # 3 Exhibit B to Fazio, # 4 Exhibit C to Fazio)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/6/2014)
April 6, 2014 1604 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re: Buckley, Hauser, Vellturo (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/6/2014)
April 6, 2014 1603 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of Sealing 1592 Objection, filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1592 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 4/6/2014) Modified text on 4/7/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2014 1602 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 1600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE BUCKLEY, HAUSER AND VELLTURO, AND MOTION TO SEAL -- Apple's Notice Re Its Disclosures of Exhibits, Demonstratives, and Designations That Are the Subject of Objections and Responses Re: Buckley, Hauser, and Vellturo (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/6/2014)
April 6, 2014 1601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re: Buckley, Hauser, Vellturo filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio iso Admin. Mot. to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Admin. Mot. to File Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses re: Buckley, Hauser, and Vellturo, # 4 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio iso Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Fazio, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Fazio, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C to Fazio, # 8 Notice of Submission, # 9 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Request to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits, # 10 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Request to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/6/2014)
April 6, 2014 1600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE BUCKLEY, HAUSER AND VELLTURO, AND MOTION TO SEAL filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik Olson in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Re Buckley, Hauser and Vellturo, and Motion to Seal, # 4 Declaration of Erik Olson in Support of HPO Brief, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2 (SEALED), # 7 Declaration Erik Olson ISO Sealing Materials, # 8 Proposed Order)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/6/2014)
April 5, 2014 1599 EXHIBITS re 1582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Supplemental Brief on Apple's Non-Practice of Claim 20 of the '414, Claim 18 of the '172, and Claim 25 of the '959 Exhibit 2 to the Fazio Declaration [public redacted version] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 to the Fazio Declaration [public redacted version])(Related document(s) 1582 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2014)
April 5, 2014 1598 EXHIBITS re 1582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Supplemental Brief on Apple's Non-Practice of Claim 20 of the '414, Claim 18 of the '172, and Claim 25 of the '959 Ex. 3 to Fazio Decl. (Public Version) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to Fazio Decl (conformed highlighted version), # 2 Exhibit 4 to Fazio Decl (conformed highlighted version))(Related document(s) 1582 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2014)
April 5, 2014 1597 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 1582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Supplemental Brief on Apple's Non-Practice of Claim 20 of the '414, Claim 18 of the '172, and Claim 25 of the '959 Public Version of Supplemental Brief filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1582 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2014) Modified TEXT on 4/7/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2014 1596 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Supplemental Brief on Apple's Non-Practice of Claim 20 of the '414, Claim 18 of the '172, and Claim 25 of the '959 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1582 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/5/2014)
April 5, 2014 1595 NOTICE OF ERRATA re 1592 Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses Regarding Exhibits and Demonstratives Disclosed for Denison, DiCarlo, Lee, Mowry, Sexton, Sheppard, and Snoeren by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/5/2014) Modified text on 4/7/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2014 1594 Apple's Notice Regarding Its Disclosures of Demonstratives, Exhibits, and Designations That Are the Subject of Objections and Responses Regarding Justin Denison, Nick Dicarlo, Jun Won Lee, Todd Mowry, Rory Sexton, Tim Sheppard and Alex Snoeren by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/5/2014) Modified text on 4/7/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2014 1593 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED HPO Brief, # 4 Declaration, # 5 UNREDACTED Ex. 1, # 6 UNREDACTED Ex. 2, # 7 Declaration, # 8 Proposed Order)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/5/2014)
April 5, 2014 1592 Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses Regarding Exhibits and Demonstratives Disclosed for Denison, DiCarlo, Lee, Mowry, Sexton, Sheppard, and Snoeren by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio iso Samsung's Objections and Responses, # 2 Exhibit A to Fazio, # 3 Exhibit B to Fazio, # 4 Exhibit C to Fazio, # 5 Exhibit D to Fazio, # 6 Exhibit E to Fazio, # 7 Exhibit F to Fazio, # 8 Samsung's Notice of Submission, # 9 Proposed Order Granting Request to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2014) Modified text on 4/7/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2014 1617 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/4/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/4/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 1591 EXHIBITS re 1517 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1546 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE GREGORY CHRISTIE, KEN KOCIENDA, PHIL SCHILLER AND ANDREW COCKBURN filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Borenstein Decl ISO Apple's Objections and Response to Objections Re Parties' Opening Slides [1517-4] [PUBLIC VERSION], # 2 Exhibit C to Borenstein Decl ISO Apple's Objections and Response to Objections Re Parties' Opening Slides [1517-6] [PUBLIC VERSION], # 3 Apple's Objections and Response to Objections Re Christie, Kocienda, Schiller and Cockburn [1546-3] [PUBLIC VERSION], # 4 Exhibit 3 to Olson Decl ISO Apple's Objections and Response to Objections Re Christie, Kocienda, Schiller and Cockburn [1546-7] [PUBLIC VERSION], # 5 Exhibit 5 to Olson Decl ISO Apple's Objections and Response to Objections Re Christie, Kocienda, Schiller and Cockburn [1546-9] [PUBLIC VERSION])(Related document(s) 1517 , 1546 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 1590 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1585 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 1589 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Ian Kreeger (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 1588 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marie Smith (Smith, Nicole) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 1587 EXHIBITS re 1516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses re: Opening Slides and Exhibits, 1563 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses Regarding Miller and Deniau, 1545 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsungs High Priority Objections And Responses Regarding Exhibits and Demonstratives Disclosed for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda Samsung's HPO for Opening Slides and Exhibits [Public Version] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 HPO for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda [Public Version], # 2 Exhibit A to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda [Public Version], # 3 Exhibit C to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda [Public Version], # 4 Exhibit D to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda [Public Version], # 5 Exhibit E to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda [Public Version], # 6 Exhibit F to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda [Public Version], # 7 Exhibit G to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda [Public Version], # 8 Samsung's HPO for Miller & Deniau [Public Version], # 9 Exhibit B to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Miller & Deniau [Public Version], # 10 Exhibit E to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Miller & Deniau [Public Version], # 11 Exhibit F to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Miller & Deniau [Public Version], # 12 Exhibit G to Fazio Decl. ISO HPO for Miller & Deniau [Public Version])(Related document(s) 1516 , 1563 , 1545 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 1586 Objections to Apple's Slides and Exhibits for Opening Statement and Samsung's Response to Apple's Objections to Samsung's Slide and Exhibits for Opening Statement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/4/2014) Modified text on 4/7/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2014 1585 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibit PX300 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 1583 EXHIBITS re 1581 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal HIGHLIGHTED VERSION Ex. 3 Krevans Declaration ISO Supplemental Brief filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 HIGHLIGHTED VERSION Ex. 4 Krevans Declaration ISO Supplemental Brief)(Related document(s) 1581 ) (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 1582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Supplemental Brief on Apple's Non-Practice of Claim 20 of the '414, Claim 18 of the '172, and Claim 25 of the '959 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio ISO Samsung's Admin. Mot. to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Supplemental Brief on Apple's Non-Practice of Claim 20 of the '414, Claim 18 of the '172, and Claim 25 of the '959, # 4 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Supplemental Brief, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Fazio, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Fazio, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Fazio, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Fazio)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 1581 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's April 3, 2014 Order, # 4 Krevans' Declaration in Support of Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's April 3, 2014 Order, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 3, 2014 1580 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1569 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 1579 Response to 1570 Samsung's Notice Regarding Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits that Samsung May Use During the Examinations of Schiller, Christie, and Cockburn by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn In Support of Apple's Response to Samsung's Notice Regarding Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits that Samsung May Use During the Examinations of Schiller, Christie, and Cockburn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/3/2014) Modified text on 4/4/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2014 1578 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying in part 1567 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Permission to Present Evidence that Apple Practices the 414, 172, and 959 Patents and Curative Instructions; Order Requesting Further Briefing. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 1577 EXHIBITS re 1519 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Public Redacted Versions of Exhibits to Fazio Declaration ISO of Motion for Reconsideration; Ex. 1, part 1 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, part 2 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 2 Exhibit 1, part 3 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 3 Exhibit 1, part 4 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 4 Exhibit 1, part 5 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 5 Exhibit 1, part 6 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 6 Exhibit 1, part 7 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 7 Exhibit 1, part 8 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 8 Exhibit 1, part 9 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 9 Exhibit 1, part 10 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 10 Exhibit 1, part 11 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 11 Exhibit 1, part 12 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 12 Exhibit 1, part 13 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 13 Exhibit 1, part 14 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 14 Exhibit 1, part 15 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 15 Exhibit 1, part 16 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 16 Exhibit 1, part 17 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 17 Exhibit 1, part 18 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 18 Exhibit 1, part 19 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 19 Exhibit 1, part 20 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 20 Errata 2 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 21 Exhibit 3 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 22 Exhibit 4, part 1 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 23 Exhibit 4, part 2 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version], # 24 Exhibit 2, part 3 to Dkt. No. 1478-1 [Public Redacted Version])(Related document(s) 1519 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 1576 ERRATA re 1571 Opposition/Response to Motion,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation). (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 1575 OBJECTIONS to 1562 Samsung's Supplemental Counter-Designations by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/3/2014) Modified text on 4/4/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2014 1574 April 3, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Apple Inc. (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/3/2014) Modified text on 4/4/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2014 1573 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/3/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 1572 Featured Case ORDER ON SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES RE 1563-3. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/3/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 1571 OPPOSITION to ( 1567 MOTION Permission to Present Evidence that Apple Practices the '414, '172, and '959 Patents and Curative Instructions ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/3/2014) Modified text on 4/4/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2014 1570 NOTICE regarding 1569 Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits that Samsung May Use During the Examinations of Schiller, Christie, and Cockburn by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/3/2014) Modified text on 4/4/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2014 1569 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits that Samsung May Use During the Examinations of Schiller, Christie, and Cockburn filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn In Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits that Samsung May Use During the Examinations of Schiller, Christie, and Cockburn, # 2 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/3/2014) Modified text on 4/3/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2014 1568 Featured Case ORDER ON RESPONSE TO APPLE MOTION (ECF NO. 1567). Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/3/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 1567 MOTION Permission to Present Evidence that Apple Practices the '414, '172, and '959 Patents and Curative Instructions filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 4/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik J. Olson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Proposed Order)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 2, 2014 1566 NOTICE regarding 1563 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses Regarding Miller and Deniau by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified text on 4/3/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2014 1565 APPLE'S NOTICE RE ITS DISCLOSURES OF DEMONSTRATIVES, EXHIBITS, AND DESIGNATIONS THAT ARE THE SUBJECT OF OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES RE THOMAS DENIAU AND JAMES MILLER by Apple Inc. re 1564 Objection (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified text on 4/3/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified re: typo on 4/3/2014 (kk, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2014 1564 APPLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE THOMAS DENIAU AND JAMES MILLER by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ruth Borenstein, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified text on 4/3/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2014 1563 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's High Priority Objections and Responses Regarding Miller and Deniau filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Fazio In Support of Sealing, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [Unredacted] Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding Miller and Deniau, # 4 Declaration of Michael Fazio In Support of Samsung's Objections and Responses, # 5 Exhibit A to the Fazio Declaration, # 6 [Unredacted] Exhibit B to the Fazio Declaration, # 7 Exhibit C to the Fazio Declaration, # 8 Exhibit D to the Fazio Declaration, # 9 [Unredacted] Exhibit E to the Fazio Declaration, # 10 [Unredacted] Exhibit F to the Fazio Declaration, # 11 [Unredacted] Exhibit G to the Fazio Declaration, # 12 Notice Regarding Lodging Regarding Direct and Cross Disclosures For Miller and Deniau)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 1, 2014 1584 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/1/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/1/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 1562 Samsung's Objections and Counter-Designations to Apple's Supplemental Deposition Designations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1552 Notice (Other), (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Samsung's Objections and Counter-Designations), # 2 Exhibit B (Objection Codes))(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/1/2014) Modified text on 4/2/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2014 1561 Revised Proposed Joint Final Jury Instructions with Objections by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/1/2014) Modified text on 4/2/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2014 1560 Declaration of Daniel Wooseob Shim in Support of 1546 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE GREGORY CHRISTIE, KEN KOCIENDA, PHIL SCHILLER AND ANDREW COCKBURN filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1546 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 1559 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1545 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsungs High Priority Objections And Responses Regarding Exhibits and Demonstratives Disclosed for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 31, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 1558 Jury Selection (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 1558 Minute Entry: Jury Selection held on 3/31/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 3/31/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 1557 Apple's March 31, 2014 Rolling Witness List by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/31/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2014 1556 Featured Case ORDER ON SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLE'S DISCLOSURES RE: [1545-3]. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/31/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 1555 Featured Case ORDER DENYING APPLE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SLIDE 3 OF SAMSUNG'S OPENING SLIDES. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/31/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 1554 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S DISCLOSURES RE: [1546-3]. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/31/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 1553 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Prendergast (Prendergast, Mary) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 30, 2014 1552 APPLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Apple Inc. re 1550 Order on Stipulation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Deposition Designations)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/30/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2014 1551 NOTICE Regarding 1517 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/30/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2014 1550 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1533 Stipulation.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2014)
March 30, 2014 1549 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1522 Stipulation.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2014)
March 30, 2014 1548 Featured Case ORDER ON PRETRIAL ITEMS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/30/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2014)
March 30, 2014 1547 Apple's Notice Regarding Its Disclosures of Demonstratives, Exhibits and Designations Re Gregory Christie, Ken Kocienda, Phil Schiller and Andrew Cockburn by Apple Inc. re 1546 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE GREGORY CHRISTIE, KEN KOCIENDA, PHIL SCHILLER AND ANDREW COCKBURN (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/30/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2014 1546 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE GREGORY CHRISTIE, KEN KOCIENDA, PHIL SCHILLER AND ANDREW COCKBURN filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ruth Borenstein, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apples Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Gregory Christie, Ken Kocienda, Phil Schiller, and Andrew Cockburn, # 4 Declaration of Erik J. Olson, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3 (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit 4 (SEALED), # 9 Exhibit 5 (SEALED))(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/30/2014)
March 30, 2014 1545 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsungs High Priority Objections And Responses Regarding Exhibits and Demonstratives Disclosed for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio ISO of AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's AMTFUS, # 3 Unredacted Version of Samsungs High Priority Objections and Responses Regarding Exhibits and Demonstratives Disclosed for Schiller, Christie, Cockburn, and Kocienda, # 4 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio ISO Samsung's Objections and Responses to Apple's Disclosures for Witnesses Schiller, Cockburn, Christie, and Kocienda, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Fazio Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit C to Fazio Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to Fazio Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit E to Fazio Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit F to Fazio Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit G to Fazio Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit H to Fazio Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit I to Fazio Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit J to Fazio Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit K to Fazio Declaration, # 16 Notice Regarding Submission of Exhibits and Demonstrative Regarding Samsung's Objections and Responses to Apple's Disclosures for Witnesses Schiller, Cockburn, Christie, and Kocienda)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/30/2014)
March 29, 2014 1544 Response to Samsungs Objection to Apples Proposed Version of Federal Judicial Center Patent Instructional Video by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1534 Notice (Other), (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/29/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2014 1543 Preliminary Jury Instructions (Annotated). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/29/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2014)
March 29, 2014 1542 Final Preliminary Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/29/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2014)
March 29, 2014 1541 Order on Samsung's Objections to Apple's Opening Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/29/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2014)
March 28, 2014 1540 Order on Samsung's Objections to Apple's Opening Slides (Corrected). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 03/28/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1538 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S OPENING SLIDES. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/28/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1537 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER DENYING SAMSUNG'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. VELLTURO'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT, RE: [1420-3]. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1536 Featured Case ORDER DENYING SAMSUNGS MISCELLANEOUS REQUEST TO INCLUDE IN THE JURY BOOKS CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS OF CERTAIN CLAIM TERMS OF THE 647 PATENT PURSUANT TO APPLE V. MOTOROLA DECISION, denying 1521 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1535 Featured Case ORDER DENYING SAMSUNG'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. VELLTURO'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT, RE: [1420-3] [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION]. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/28/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1534 SAMSUNGS OBJECTION TO APPLES PROPOSED VERSION OF FEDERAL JUDICIAL CENTER PATENT INSTRUCTIONAL VIDEO by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1490 Order (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/28/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 1533 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Authenticity of Google Documents filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/28/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 1532 Featured Case ORDER CONSTRUING '239 PATENT CLAIM 15. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/28/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1531 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses re: Opening Slides and Exhibits filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1516 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1530 APPLES UPDATE ON ITS OBJECTIONS REGARDING JX28, JX29, JX32, JX33, AND JX35 by Apple Inc. re 1525 Order (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/28/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 1529 CORRECTED JOINT LIST OF WITNESSES, DEPONENTS, ATTORNEYS AND LAW FIRMS by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1158 Order (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/28/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 1528 Featured Case ORDER PERMITTING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN COURTHOUSE BY MEMBERS OF THE PRESS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/28/14. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1527 Letter from Mark D. Selwyn Regarding Additional Case Narrowing . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, Part 1 (Apple's Proposed Verdict Form), # 5 Exhibit D, Part 2 (Samsung's Proposed Verdict Form))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1526 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren B. Fletcher (Fletcher, Lauren) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1525 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE UPDATE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/28/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 1524 JOINT LIST OF WITNESSES, DEPONENTS, ATTORNEYS AND LAW FIRMS by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/28/2014) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 1523 Proposed Order re 1521 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Miscellaneous Request to Include in the Jury Books Claim Constructions of Certain Claim Terms of the '647 Patent Pursuant to Apple v. Motorola Decision (Corrected Proposed Order re Administrative Motion to Seal) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 27, 2014 1522 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Ownership of Asserted Patents filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 1521 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Miscellaneous Request to Include in the Jury Books Claim Constructions of Certain Claim Terms of the '647 Patent Pursuant to Apple v. Motorola Decision filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Fazio Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 3 Miscellaneous Request, # 4 Jenkins Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Proposed Order Granting Miscellaneous Request)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 1520 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Apple's Notice Regarding Disclosures for Objections for Opening Statement (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 1519 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 1478 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 1518 EXHIBITS re 1517 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Ruth N. Borenstein in Support of Apple's Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Parties Opening Slides filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1517 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 1517 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple's Objections, # 4 Exhibit A to Apple's Objections, # 5 Exhibit B to Apple's Objections, # 6 Exhibit C to Apple's Objections)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 1516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses re: Opening Slides and Exhibits filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fazio ISO Admin Mot. to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Admin Mot. to Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version Samsung's Objections to Apple's Proposed Opening Slides and Exhibits and Responses to Apple's Objections to Samsung's Proposed Opening Slides and Exhibits, # 4 Declaration of Fazio ISO Samsung's Objections and Responses, # 5 Exhibit A to Fazio, # 6 Exhibit B to Fazio, # 7 Exhibit C to Fazio, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to Fazio, # 9 Notice Regarding Proposed Slides and Exhibits)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 1515 AMENDED Order Granting Access to Courtroom Connect re 1501 Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/27/2014. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 26, 2014 1514 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1486 Stipulation (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1513 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1512 Stipulation (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1512 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TRANSLATIONS OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS AT TRIAL filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1511 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/26/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 1478 SAMSUNGS MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF MARCH 7, 2014 SEALING ORDER [DKT. NO. 1415]. The court grants Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration. Court to issue written order. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:43 to 4:56) (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1510 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Frederick Llewellyn (Llewellyn, Scott) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1509 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1506 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1508 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1505 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1507 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1504 Proposed Order, filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/26/14. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1506 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Danford ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8481320.) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1505 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Sarah R. Frazier ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8481262.) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 1504 Proposed Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Permitting Use Of Equipment In The Courtroom by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 25, 2014 1503 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1492 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 1502 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Nelson (Nelson, David) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 1501 Order Granting Access to Courtroom Connect. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/25/14. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 1500 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1499 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 1499 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Nelson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8478199.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 1498 Featured Case ORDER TO BRING COPIES OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/25/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 1497 Letter from Rachel Krevans . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 24, 2014 1496 OBJECTIONS to re 1468 Objection,, Apple Inc.'s Objections to Samsung's Deposition Counterdesignations by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 1495 OBJECTIONS to re 1466 Objection, 1493 Errata Samsung's Objections to Apple's Deposition Counter Designations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 1494 OBJECTIONS to re 1489 Order Samsung's Objections to Revised Preliminary Jury Instructions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 1493 ERRATA re 1466 Objection, Apple Inc.'s Corrected Counterdesignations to Samsung's Deposition Designations 1429 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 1492 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Translation of Testimony at Trial filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 21, 2014 1491 Apple Inc.'s Claim Construction Brief Regarding the "Means For Transmission" Limitation of Claim 15 of U.S. Patent No. 5,579,239 re 1470 Order filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of Apple Inc.'s Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 1470 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/21/2014) Modified text on 3/24/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2014 1490 Featured Case ORDER TO BRING FJC VIDEO AND FILE ANY FINAL OBJECTIONS TO PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/21/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 1489 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (CLEAN). Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/21/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 1488 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (ANNOTATED). Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/21/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 1487 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING AS TO 1478 SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF MARCH 7, 2014 SEALING ORDER [DKT. NO. 1415]: Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2014 at 4:30 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 20, 2014 1486 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/20/2014) Modified text on 3/21/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2014 1485 OPPOSITION to Apple's MOTIONS In Limine re 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine Public Redacted Versions of Documents Filed Under Seal; SAMSUNGS OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version], # 2 Exhibit 8 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version], # 3 Exhibit 9 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version], # 4 Exhibit 19 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version], # 5 Exhibit 36 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version], # 6 Exhibit 39 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version], # 7 Exhibit 44 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version], # 8 Exhibit 52 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version], # 9 Exhibit 54 - 60 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version], # 10 Exhibit 64 - 67 to Samsung's Opp to Apple's MIL [Public Redacted Version])(Related document(s) 1337 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2014) Modified text on 3/21/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2014 1484 Samsung's Claim Construction Brief for the '239 Patent Term "Means for Transmission of Said Captured Video Over a Cellular Frequency" filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Profesor Dan Schonfeld)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/19/2014) Modified text on 3/20/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2014 1483 Public Versions of Documents; 516 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Its Infringement Contentions, 531 Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Compel Documents from Related Litigations, 531 Exhibit 19 to the Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Compel Documents from Related Litigations, 582 Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, 738 Apple Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Nokia Corporation's Motion for Protective Order re 1415 Order, filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Apples Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Compel Documents from Related Litigations, Dkt. No. 531 , # 2 Exhibit 19 to the Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apples Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Compel Documents from Related Litigations, Dkt. No. 531 , # 3 Apples Opposition to Samsungs Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, Dkt. No. 582 , # 4 Apple Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Nokia Corporation's Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. No. 738 )(Related document(s) 1415 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/19/2014) Modified text on 3/20/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2014 1482 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1478 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal SAMSUNGS UNOPPOSED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF MARCH 7, 2014 SEALING ORDER [DKT. NO. 1415] (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 19, 2014 1481 Public Versions of Documents Submitted Pursuant to Court Order; Samsung's Motion to Amend Infringement Contention (Dkt. No. 476 ) re 1415 Order, Terminate Motions,, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, 7, 8, 9 to to the Briggs Declaration ISO Samsung's Motion to Amend Infringement Contention [Dkt. No. 476], # 2 Exhibit 6 to the Briggs Declaration ISO Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions [Dkt. No. 528], # 3 Exhibit Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], # 4 Exhibit 3 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], # 5 Exhibit 10 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], # 6 Exhibit 17 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], part 1 of 3, # 7 Exhibit 17 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], part 2 of 3, # 8 Exhibit 17 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], part 3 of 3, # 9 Exhibit 18 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], part 1 of 3, # 10 Exhibit 18 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], part 2 of 3, # 11 Exhibit 18 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], part 3 of 3, # 12 Exhibit 19 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], part 1 of 3, # 13 Exhibit 19 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], part 2 of 3, # 14 Exhibit 19 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 540], part 3 of 3, # 15 Exhibit Samsungs Motion To Preclude Apple From Asserting Untimely Dates Of Conception [Dkt. No. 541], # 16 Exhibit C, D, C, E, F, G, H, I, J, K to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Motion To Preclude Apple From Asserting Untimely Dates Of Conception [Dkt. No. 541], # 17 Exhibit 4 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsungs Reply ISO Motion to Compel Complete Production of Source Code [Dkt. No. 563], # 18 Exhibit 1, 3, 4 to Briggs Declaration ISO Samsungs Supplemental Brief ISO Samsung's Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 577], # 19 Exhibit Samsungs Supplemental Brief ISO Samsung's Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 577], # 20 Exhibit Briggs Declaration ISO Samsungs Supplemental Brief ISO Samsung's Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 577], # 21 Exhibit CORRECTED Exhibit A to Stipulation re Samsungs Proposed Invalidity Contentions [Dkt. No. 649], # 22 Exhibit Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and to Enforce the April 12, 2013 Order [Dkt. No. 669], # 23 Exhibit Thakur Declaration ISO Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and to Enforce the April 12, 2013 Order [Dkt. No. 669], # 24 Exhibit 7, 8, 9 to Thakur Declaration ISO Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and to Enforce the April 12, 2013 Order [Dkt. No. 669], # 25 Exhibit Samsung's Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Financial Documents and Exhibits [Dkt. No. 720], # 26 Exhibit Samsungs Opposition to Apples Notice of Joinder in Nokias Motion for a Protective Order [Dkt. No. 744], # 27 Exhibit Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend [Dkt. No. 613])(Related document(s) 1415 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/19/2014) Modified text on 3/20/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2014 1480 EXHIBITS re 656 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 593 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits B and L to the Declaration of Brian Buroker In Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Preclude Apple From Asserting Untimely Dates of Conception, 711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and to Enforce the April 12, 2013 Order Documents Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 1415: Exhibit B to the Buroker Declaration supporting Apples Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Preclude, Dkt. No. 593 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L to the Buroker Declaration supporting Apples Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Preclude, Dkt. No. 593, # 2 REDACTED Exhibit 13 to the Mader Declaration supporting Apples Opposition to Googles Motion to Quash Apple Subpoenas, Dkt. No. 656, # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Valek Declaration supporting Apples Opposition to Googles Motion to Quash Apple Subpoenas, Dkt. No. 656, # 4 Apples Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Compel Production, Dkt. No. 711)(Related document(s) 656 , 593 , 711 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 19, 2014 1479 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1478 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal SAMSUNGS UNOPPOSED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF MARCH 7, 2014 SEALING ORDER [DKT. NO. 1415] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1478 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 19, 2014 1478 SAMSUNGS UNOPPOSED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF MARCH 7, 2014 SEALING ORDER (DKT. NO. 1415 ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 1 of 20, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 2 of 20, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 3 of 20, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 4 of 20, # 6 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 5 of 20, # 7 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 6 of 20, # 8 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 7 of 20, # 9 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 8 of 20, # 10 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 9 of 20, # 11 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 10 of 20, # 12 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 11 of 20, # 13 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 12 of 20, # 14 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 13 of 20, # 15 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 14 of 20, # 16 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 15 of 20, # 17 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 16 of 20, # 18 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 17 of 20, # 19 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 18 of 20, # 20 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 19 of 20, # 21 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Declaration, part 20 of 20, # 22 Exhibit 2 to Fazio Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 3 to Fazio Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 4 to the Fazio Declaration, part 1 of 3, # 25 Exhibit 4 to the Fazio Declaration, part 2 of 3, # 26 Exhibit 4 to the Fazio Declaration, part 3 of 3, # 27 Exhibit 5 to the Fazio Declaration, # 28 Proposed Order)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/19/2014) Modified text on 3/20/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2014 1477 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1473 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 19, 2014 1476 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward John DeFranco (DeFranco, Edward) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 18, 2014 1475 Declaration of Yan Arrouye in Support of Apple Inc's Oppositon to Samsung's Motion to Compel Documents and Source Code re 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re 533 Admin Motion; Declaration of Arrouye filed in response to 1415 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chu, # 2 Declaration of Krugler, # 3 Declaration of Lew, # 4 Declaration of Manickan, # 5 Declaration of McFarlane, # 6 Declaration of Shenoy)(Related document(s) 516 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified text on 3/19/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 1474 OPPOSITION to Samsung's Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Its Infringement Contentions re 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Its Infringement Contentions filed in response to 1415 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to the Selwyn Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 3 to the Selwyn Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 4 to the Selwyn Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 5 to the Selwyn Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 6 to the Selwyn Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 9 to the Selwyn Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 10 to the Selwyn Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 11 to the Selwyn Declaration)(Related document(s) 516 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified text on 3/19/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 1473 EXHIBITS re 563 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 498 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Compel Complete Production of Source Code, 476 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Its Infringement Contentions, 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 577 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 561 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to the Declaration of Amar Thakur ISO Samsungs Reply On Its MTC Documents From Related Litigations, 528 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, 540 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Consolidated Under Seal Version of Documents Ordered to Be Sealed Pursuant to the Court's 3/06/2014 Order [Dkt. No. 1415]; Ex. 4 to Briggs Decl. [Dkt. No. 476] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 10 Briggs Decl. [Dkt. No. 476], # 2 Exhibit Decl. of Thakur ISO MTC [Dkt. No. 498], # 3 Exhibit Samsung Reply ISO MFL [Dkt. No. 528], # 4 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Briggs Decl. [Dkt. No. 528], # 5 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Briggs Decl. [Dkt. No. 528], # 6 Exhibit Ex. 20 to Thakur Decl. ISO Motion For Leave [Dkt. No. 540, as amended by Dkt. No. 567], # 7 Exhibit Ex. 22 to Thakur Decl. [Dkt. No. 540, as amended by Dkt. No. 567], # 8 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Thakur Decl. ISO Samsung's MTC [Dkt. No. 563], # 9 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Briggs Decl. [Dkt. No. 577], # 10 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Thakur Decl. ISO Samsung's MTC [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 11 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 12 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. No. 669], # 13 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 14 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 15 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 16 Exhibit Ex. 14 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 17 Exhibit Ex. 15 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 18 Exhibit Ex. 16 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 19 Exhibit Ex. 17 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. No. 669], # 20 Exhibit Ex. 18 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 21 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 22 Exhibit Ex. 20 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 23 Exhibit Ex. 21 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 24 Exhibit Ex. 22 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 25 Exhibit Ex. 23 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 26 Exhibit Ex. 24 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 27 Exhibit Ex. 25 to Thakur Decl [Dkt. Nos. 669, 722], # 28 Exhibit Samsung's Reply ISO MTC [Dkt. No. 561, as amended by Dkt. No. 586], # 29 Exhibit Ex. A to Thakur Decl. [Dkt. No. 561, as amended by Dkt. No. 586], # 30 Exhibit Thakur Decl. ISO Samsung's MTC [Dkt. No. 561, as amended by Dkt. No. 586], # 31 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Thakur Decl. [Dkt. No. 561, as amended by Dkt. No. 586], # 32 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Thakur Decl. [Dkt. No. 561, as amended by Dkt. No. 586], # 33 Exhibit Samsung' Motion to Compel [Dkt. No. 498, as amended by Dkt. No. 515], # 34 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Thakur Decl. [Dkt. No. 498, as amended by Dkt. No. 515], # 35 Exhibit Ex. 26 to Thakur Decl. [Dkt. No. 498, as amended by Dkt. No. 515], # 36 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Thakur Decl ISO Samung's MTC [Dkt. No. 528, as amended by Dkt. No. 542], # 37 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Thakur Decl ISO Samsung's MTC [Dkt. No. 528, as amended by Dkt. No. 542])(Related document(s) 563 , 498 , 476 , 669 , 577 , 561 , 528 , 540 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 1472 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1471 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 1471 EXHIBITS re 656 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal UNREDACTED Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Shannon Mader in Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Apple's Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Testimony Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Dkt. 1415 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 656 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 1470 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING LIMITED ADDITIONAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/18/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 17, 2014 1469 OBJECTIONS to 1428 Apple's Designations of Other Discovery to be Offered at Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/17/2014) Modified text on 3/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2014 1468 OBJECTIONS and Counter Designations to 1428 Apple Inc's Identification of Deposition Designations and Other Discovery to be Offered at Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Samsung's Objections and Counter-Designations), # 2 Exhibit B (Objection Codes))(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/17/2014) Modified text on 3/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2014 1467 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STAY AND LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 1462 Motion To Stay Portions of March 7, 2014 Order and Leave To File Motion For Reconsideration.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 1466 OBJECTIONS to 1430 Samsung's Discovery Designations, 1429 Samsung's Deposition Designations , by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/17/2014) Modified text on 3/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2014 1465 RESPONSE (re 1461 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Limited Additional Claim Construction for the '239 Patent Claim 15 Term "Means for Transmission of Said Captured Video Over a Cellular Frequency" ) filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 1464 Joint Notice Regarding Order re Motions to Seal (Docket No. 1415 Order ) by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1415 Order (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/14/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2014 1463 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR LIMITED ADDITIONAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION (ECF NO. 1461). Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/14/14. (lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 14, 2014 1462 MOTION (1) TO STAY PORTIONS OF THE COURTS MARCH 7, 2014 SEALING ORDER [DKT. NO. 1415]; AND (2) FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF MARCH 7 SEALING ORDER [DKT. NO. 1415] re 1415 Order, Terminate Motions,, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 3/28/2014. Replies due by 4/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 13, 2014 1461 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Limited Additional Claim Construction for the '239 Patent Claim 15 Term "Means for Transmission of Said Captured Video Over a Cellular Frequency" filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 3/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Briggs Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 1460 EXHIBITS re 1269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Corrected Exhibit List Redacted Version of Apples 2nd Corrected Exhibit List, DI 1330 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1269 , 1272 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 1459 Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Portions of Vellturo's Supplemental Report re 1438 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Public Redacted Version of Conformed Apple Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Strike Portions of Vellturos Supplemental Expert Report filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1438 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 1458 Revised Proposed Joint Final Jury Instructions with Objections by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 1457 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1426 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,, (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 1456 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Redline of Apple's Amended Exhibit List Filed with Apple's Amended Exhibit List (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 1455 Joint Amended Pretrial Statement by Apple Inc.(a California corporation)(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit B1, # 7 Exhibit B2, # 8 Exhibit B3)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 1454 Samsung's Revised List of Witnesses for Trial Pursuant to 1427 Court's March 10, 2014 Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company)(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redlined Version of Samsung's Revised List of Witnesses for Trial))(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 entry linked to doc. #1427 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 1453 Revised Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1422 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Apple's Revised Proposed Form of Verdict), # 2 Exhibit B (Redline Comparing Apple's Original and Revised Proposed Form of Verdict), # 3 Exhibit C (Samsung's Revised Proposed Form of Verdict), # 4 Exhibit D (Redline Comparing Samsung's Original and Revised Proposed Form of Verdict))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 1452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Redline of Apple's Amended Exhibit List Filed with Apple's Amended Exhibit List filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in Support of Motion to Seal Apple's Exhibit List Redline, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple's Amended Exhibit List, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Apple's Amended Exhibit List, # 5 UNREDACTED Exhibit 2 - Redline of Apple's Amended Exhibit List)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 1451 Samsung's Revised Trial Exhibit List Pursuant to 1427 Court's March 10, 2014 Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Clean Version of Samsung's Revised Trial Exhibit List), # 2 Exhibit B (Redlined Version of Samsung's Revised Trial Exhibit List))(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 doc. #1427 linked(dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 1450 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1427 Order Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Samsung's Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 1449 Proposed Revisions to Court's Tentative Preliminary Jury Instructions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 1448 Apple's Amended Witness List by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1427 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Apple's Amended Witness List), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Redline Comparing Apple's Original and Amended Witness Lists))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified text on 3/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 1447 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1427 Order Apple's Amended Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Apple's Amended Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Redline comparing Original (Dkt. 1362 ) and Amended Notice))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 12, 2014 1445 REPLY in Support of ( 1420 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filing in Connection Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Vellturo's Supplemental Expert Report ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified text on 3/13/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 1444 NOTICE OF ERRATA Regarding Exhibit A to Samsung's Deposition Designations (Designations for Bruce J. Watrous) re 1429 Samsung's Deposition Designations, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Supplement)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified text on 3/13/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 1443 Joint Notice Regarding Order Re Motions To Seal (Docket No. 1415 ) and the Parties' Briefing Relating to Samsung's Motion to Compel (Docket Nos. 632 , 633 , 676 , 689 ) by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1415 Order, Terminate Motions,, (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified text on 3/13/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 1442 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 12, 2014 1441 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1438 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 12, 2014 1440 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1439 Declaration in Support, (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 11, 2014 1446 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 1228 MOTION for Clarification. The court confirms striking paragraphs 300-304 of Dr. Mowry's Expert Report. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 1439 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in Support of 1420 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Vellturo's Supplemental Expert Report filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1420 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 1438 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Rho, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Portions of Vellturo's Supplemental Report)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 1437 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1436 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 1436 Notice of Correction of Exhibits to Apple's Motion in Limine re 1281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 UNREDACTED Ex. 4, # 2 UNREDACTED Ex. 12)(Related document(s) 1281 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/11/2014) Modified text on 3/12/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2014 1435 Public Redacted Versions of Exhibits to Apples Motions in Limine - Ex. 1 re 1281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED Ex. 2, # 2 Ex. 3, # 3 REDACTED Ex. 4, # 4 REDACTED Ex. 5, # 5 REDACTED Ex. 6, # 6 REDACTED Ex. 7, # 7 REDACTED Ex. 8, # 8 REDACTED Ex. 9, # 9 REDACTED Ex. 10, # 10 REDACTED Ex. 11, # 11 REDACTED Ex. 12, # 12 REDACTED Ex. 13)(Related document(s) 1281 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/11/2014) Modified text on 3/12/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2014 1434 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Motions In Limine Ex. 7 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version] re 1283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motions in Limine, 1376 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 1285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version]], # 2 Exhibit 13 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 3 Exhibit 16 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 4 Exhibit 18 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 5 Exhibit 19 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 6 Exhibit 20 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 7 Exhibit 21 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 8 Exhibit 22 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 9 Exhibit 23 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 10 Exhibit 24 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 11 Exhibit 27 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 12 Exhibit 41 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version], # 13 Exhibit 43 to the Fazio Dec. [Public Redacted Version])(Related document(s) 1283 , 1376 , 1285 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/11/2014) Modified text on 3/12/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2014 1433 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1432 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 1432 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Kevin S. Prussia ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8443086.) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 1431 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/11/2014) Modified on 3/12/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 1430 Samsung's Identification of Written and Other Discovery to be Offered at Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified text on 3/11/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 1429 Samsung's Identification of Deposition Designations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified text on 3/11/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 1428 Apple Inc.'s Identification of Deposition Designations and Other Discovery to be Offered at Trial by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified text on 3/11/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 1427 Featured Case ORDER ON PRETRIAL FILINGS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/10/14. (lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 1426 Consolidated Highlighted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's MILs re 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 3 to Fazio Decl., # 2 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 9 to Fazio Decl., # 3 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 19 to Fazio Decl., # 4 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 39 to Fazio Decl., # 5 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 44 to Fazio Decl., # 6 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 52 to Fazio Decl., # 7 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 54 to Fazio Decl., # 8 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 55 to Fazio Decl., # 9 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 56 to Fazio Decl., # 10 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 57 to Fazio Decl., # 11 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 58 to Fazio Decl., # 12 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 59 to Fazio Decl., # 13 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 60 to Fazio Decl., # 14 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 64 to Fazio Decl., # 15 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 65 to Fazio Decl., # 16 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 66 to Fazio Decl., # 17 Exhibit Consolidated Highlighted Version of Ex. 67 to Fazio Decl., # 18 Exhibit 4 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 19 Exhibit 5 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 20 Exhibit 6 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 21 Exhibit 7 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 22 Exhibit 11 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 23 Exhibit 12 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 24 Exhibit 18 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 25 Exhibit 20 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 26 Exhibit 22 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 27 Exhibit 28 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 28 Exhibit 29 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 29 Exhibit 30 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 30 Exhibit 31 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 31 Exhibit 32 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 32 Exhibit 37 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 33 Exhibit 63 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 34 Exhibit 68 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 35 Exhibit 69 to Fazio Decl. [filed under seal in entirety], # 36 Exhibit 6 and 36 to Fazio Decl. [Oversized])(Related document(s) 1337 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified text on 3/11/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 1425 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Sabri, Nathaniel) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 1424 Conformed Highlighted Version of Apples Oppositions to Samsungs Motions in Limine re 1334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1334 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified text on 3/11/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 1423 Featured Case ORDER RELEASING BOND. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/10/14. (lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 1422 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE REVISED PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORMS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/10/14. (lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 9, 2014 1421 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1419 Stipulation.(lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2014)
March 7, 2014 1420 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 SAMSUNG'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. VELLTURO'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT, # 4 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion To Strike, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Declaration of Judith A. Chevalier In Support of Samsung's Motion To Strike, # 10 Exhibit 1, # 11 Exhibit 2, # 12 Exhibit 3, # 13 Exhibit 4, # 14 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Strike)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 1419 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims Without Prejudice filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 1418 Joint Submission on Jury Instruction in Compliance with March 5, 2014 Case Management Order re 1398 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/7/2014) Modified text on 3/10/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2014 1417 Joint Statement Regarding Release of Bond by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1383 Order (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/7/2014) Modified text on 3/10/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2014 1416 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1414 Stipulation as modified.(lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 1415 Featured Case ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL: (Re: Docket Nos. 476 , 490 , 498 , 516 , 526 , 528 , 531 , 533 , 540 , 541 , 561 , 563 , 577 , 582 , 592 , 593 , 613 , 632 , 649 , 656 , 669 , 676 , 681 , 689 , 711 , 721 , 738 , 742 and 743 ). Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/7/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 1414 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1151 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Scope of the January 21, 2014 Summary Judgment Order with Respect to the '172 Patent filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 1413 EXHIBITS re 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine Notice of Replacement Page to Fazio Ex. 37 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Replacement Page to DX489)(Related document(s) 1337 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 1412 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 6, 2014 1411 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-5-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2014. (Related documents(s) 1392 ) (las, ) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 1410 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Documents Filed in Connection with the Parties' Preliminary Injunction Briefing (D.I. 6-25, 114-34, 175-83), as Filed in D.I. 442, Pursuant to D.I. 1347 by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1347 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/6/2014) Modified text on 3/10/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2014 1408 Notice of Compliance with Court's February 26, 2014 Order (Relates to Dkt. No. 1347 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1395 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/6/2014) Modified text on 3/10/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2014 1407 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1347 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Documents filed pursuant to D.I. 460 - Apples Reply In Support Of Apple Inc.'s Motion To Compel Discovery Of Document Production Information And Diff Program Printouts From Google, Inc. by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 5, 2014 1409 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 3/5/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 1406 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1347 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Documents filed in connection with the Parties Preliminary Injunction Briefing (D.I. 6-25, 114-34, 175-83), as filed in D.I. 442 - Apples PI Motion Rangel Ex. 2 by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 2.Apples PI Motion Rangel Ex. 3 Pt. 1, # 2 3.Apples PI Motion Rangel Ex. 3 Pt. 2, # 3 4.Apples PI Motion Rangel Ex. 5 Pt. 1, # 4 5.Apples PI Motion Rangel Ex. 5 Pt. 2, # 5 6.Apples PI Motion Rangel Ex. 6, # 6 7.Apples PI Motion Vellturo Ex. 53, # 7 8.Apples PI Motion Vellturo Ex. 112 Pt. 1, # 8 9.Apples PI Motion Vellturo Ex. 112 Pt. 2, # 9 10.Apples PI Motion Vellturo Attachments A-L, # 10 11.Apples PI Reply Vellturo Ex. 4, # 11 12.Apples PI Reply Vellturo Ex. 22, # 12 13.Apples PI Reply Vellturo Ex. 25, # 13 14.Apples PI Reply Vellturo Ex. 26, # 14 15.Apples PI Reply Vellturo Ex. 27, # 15 16.Apples PI Reply Vellturo Ex. 30, # 16 17.Samsung PI Opposition Posner Ex. Q, # 17 18.Samsung PI Opposition Posner Ex. R, # 18 19.Samsung PI Opposition Posner Ex. T Pt. 1, # 19 20.Samsung PI Opposition Posner Ex. T Pt. 2, # 20 21.Samsung PI Opposition Posner Ex. V, # 21 22.Samsung PI Opposition Posner Ex. W, # 22 23.Samsung PI Opposition Posner Ex. CC, # 23 24.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Declaration, # 24 25.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. B, # 25 26.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. L, # 26 27.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. R, # 27 28.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. S, # 28 29.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. UU, # 29 30.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. XX, # 30 31.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. YY, # 31 32.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. ZZ, # 32 33.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. AAA, # 33 34.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. BBB, # 34 35.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. DDD Pt. 1, # 35 36.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. DDD Pt. 2, # 36 37.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. DDD Pt. 3, # 37 38.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. GGG, # 38 39.Samsung PI Opposition Wagner Ex. III)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 1405 Letter from Josh Krevitt to the Court re 1289 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents under Seal)(Related document(s) 1289 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1404 Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly File Document re 1278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, # 2 Declaration in support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Related document(s) 1278 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1403 Amended Declaration of Ayumi Nishino Regarding Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re 1320 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Declaration of Non-Party (D.I. 1282 ) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1320 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1402 Declaration of Ayumi Nishino Regarding Apple's and Samsung's Administrative Motions to FIle Documents Under Seal re 1322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Non-Party filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1322 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1401 Declaration of Ayumi Nishino Regarding Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re 1282 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Non-Party filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1282 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1400 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1347 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Amend the Case Management Order by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of BJ Watrous)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1399 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1394 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 1398 Case Management Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1327 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 1281 Apple's Motions in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 1283 Samsung's Motions in Limine (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified on 3/6/2014 (lhklc1, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1397 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1347 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Documents filed pursuant to D.I. 432 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Michael Valek in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Relating to Pricing of Apple Products by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Michael Valek in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Relating to Pricing of Apple Products)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1396 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1347 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Documents filed pursuant to D.I. 418 Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery of Document Production Information and Diff Program Printouts from Google, Inc. by Apple Inc. by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Valek, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 15, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 22)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1395 Notice of Compliance with Court's February 26, 2014 Order 1347 re 601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Dkt. 535, 535 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Amend the Case Management Order and for Leave to Amend Its Answer to Apple's Counterclaims in Reply, 440 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Re Court's March 18, 2013 Order) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 1 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], # 2 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 2 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], # 3 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 3 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], # 4 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 7 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], # 5 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 8 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], part one, # 6 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 8 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], part two, # 7 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 9 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], part one, # 8 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 9 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], part two, # 9 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 18 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], # 10 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 20 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], # 11 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 21 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], # 12 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of 22 to Samsung's July 25 Motion [Dkt. No. 440], # 13 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of Samsung Motion to Amend Case Management Order [Dkt. No. 535-1], # 14 Exhibit Conformed Version of Declaration of Kenneth Korean ISO Motion to Amend [Dkt. No. 535-11], # 15 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of Samsung Reply ISO Motion to Amend {Dkt. No. 601-2], # 16 Exhibit Conformed Highlighted Version of Ex. 2 to Baxter Declaration ISO Reply {Dkt. No. 601-4], # 17 Exhibit Public Unredacted Version of Samsung Motion for Reconsideration [Dkt. No. 680-3])(Related document(s) 601 , 535 , 440 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1394 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Peter J. Chassman) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8428642.) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 1393 DECLARATION OF PETER J. CHASSMAN ON BEHALF OF MOTOROLA MOBILITY IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNG'S AND APPLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 1240 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Daubert Motion, Opp to Apple's Daubert Motion, and Samsung's Daubert Reply (See Dkts, 1209, 948, 856, 802), 1244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Motion to Seal and supporting Declaration iso Motion to Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted versions of Apple's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimon filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 1240 , 1244 ) (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1392 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sabri, Nathaniel) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 1391 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Samsung's and Apple's Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1280 re 1323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1323 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1390 Letter from William F. Lee to Judge Grewal regarding Apple's discovery of inadvertent public filing re 1258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letters to the Court filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Letter from Josh Krevitt to Judge Grewal regarding Apple's discovery of inadvertent public filing, # 2 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Related document(s) 1258 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1389 Notice of Withdrawal of Motions to Seal {1276], 1315 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration)(Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 1388 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1387 Notice (Other), (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 1387 NOTICE Of Lodging Of Exhibits 315, 321, and 348 relating to 1386 Second Corrected Trial Exhibit List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re Set/Reset Hearings (correcting location of hearing) Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 1385 Clerks Notice, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 1386 Second Corrected Trial Exhibit List re 1267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's List of Exhibits for Trial, 1331 Corrected Trial Exhibit List filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1267 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/4/2014) Modified text on 3/5/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 1385 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing the Pre-trial Conference: The Pre-trial conference currently scheduled for March 5, 2014 at 2 p.m. is continued to March 5, 2014 at 3 p.m. in Courtroom 1 on the fifth floor. ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.*** (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 1384 TENTATIVE PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (ANNOTATED). Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/4/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 1383 Featured Case ORDER re 1380 USCA Order, dissolving 221 preliminary injunction and requesting statement regarding 232 bond. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/4/2014. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 1382 Declaration of Brett E. Bachtell (Qualcomm) in Support of 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1337 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 1381 Notice of Correction of Exhibit in Support of Samsung's Reply in Support of 948 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Reply)(Related document(s) 948 ) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 3/4/2014) Modified text on 3/5/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 1380 USCA MANDATE for the Federal Circuit as to 292 USCA for the Federal Circuit Opinion and Judgment, re 227 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 1379 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1369 Stipulation (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 3, 2014 1378 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1334 , 1337 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1377 Letter from Rachel Krevans . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Proposed Pretrial Statement, # 2 Exhibit Amended Proposed Verdict Form)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1376 EXHIBITS re 1283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motions in Limine, 1285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FAZIO IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNG'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE Ex. 2 [conformed highlighted version] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, 8, 9, 10, 12, 13, 16, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 27 [conformed highlighted versions], # 2 Exhibit 25, 26, 28, 29, 32, 34, 36-40, 42, 44-50, 52, 53, 54, 55 [to be filed under seal in their entirety], # 3 Exhibit 41 [conformed highlighted version], # 4 Exhibit 43 [conformed highlighted version])(Related document(s) 1283 , 1285 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1375 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1337 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1374 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1372 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1373 RESPONSE (re 1327 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Supplement Motion in Limine #2 ) and Samsung's Supplemental Motion in Limine #2 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1372 EXHIBITS re 1281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) Consolidated Copies of Apple's Motions in Limine and Exhibits 5-6 and 8-13 to Sabri Declaration Conformed to DI-1281, DI-1309, DI-1316 and DI-1321 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 UNREDACTED Ex. 5 to Sabri Declaration, # 2 UNREDACTED Ex. 6 to Sabri Declaration, # 3 UNREDACTED Ex. 8 to Sabri Declaration, # 4 UNREDACTED Ex. 9 to Sabri Declaration, # 5 UNREDACTED Ex. 10 to Sabri Declaration, # 6 UNREDACTED Ex. 11 to Sabri Declaration, # 7 UNREDACTED Ex. 12 to Sabri Declaration, # 8 UNREDACTED Ex. 13 to Sabri Declaration)(Related document(s) 1281 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1371 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of 1334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1334 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1370 Declaration of Non-Party Intel in Support of 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine Non-Party Intel's Declaration in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Dkt. #1337) filed byIntel Corporation. (Related document(s) 1337 ) (Shvodian, Daniel) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1369 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Permitting Use of Equipment in the Courtroom filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1368 Declaration of David Greenbaum in Support of 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 1337 ) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1367 Brief in support of 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed by Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Suzanne Chapman)(Related document(s) 1337 ) (McFarland, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2014) Modified text on 3/5/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2014 1366 Declaration of Bruce Barker in Support of 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed byOmniVision Technologies Inc.. (Related document(s) 1337 ) (Barker, Bruce) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1365 Declaration of Michael C. Barrett (Cirrus Logic, Inc.) in Support of 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1337 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 1364 REPLY in Support of Motion In Limine #6 re ( 1281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) ) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/3/2014) Modified text on 3/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2014 1363 Public Unredacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Seal (Dkt. Nos. 1258-2, 1258-3 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Becher Decl. In Support Of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Seal [Docket Entries 1258-2 and 1258-3], # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Becher Decl.)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/2/2014) Modified text on 3/3/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2014 1362 NOTICE Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/28/2014) Modified text on 3/2/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2014 1361 NOTICE Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/28/2014) Modified text on 3/2/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2014 1360 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 1359 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 1358 NOTICE OF ERRATA re 610 Declaration of Daniel Wooseob Shim by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2014) Modified text on 3/2/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2014 1357 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE ONE PAGE REPLY. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 2/28/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 1356 Public Redacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion In Limine re 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1337 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/27/2014) Modified text on 2/28/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2014 1355 Public Redacted Version of Apples Oppositions to Samsungs Motions in Limine re 1334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1334 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/27/2014) Modified text on 2/28/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2014 1354 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot J Siegel (Siegel, Elliot) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 1353 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 1352 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1349 Motion to Withdraw 1338 Proposed Form of Verdict (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 26, 2014 1351 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 1350 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 1349 JOINT MOTION to Withdraw 1338 Proposed Form of Verdict Filed in Error filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). Responses due by 3/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/26/2014) Modified text on 2/27/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2014 1348 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in Support of 1317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motions in Limine, filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1317 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/26/2014) Modified text on 2/27/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2014 1347 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 432 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 440 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 442 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 460 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 535 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 579 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 680 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 1346 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1332 Stipulation (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 1345 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 1344 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1330 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 1343 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1329 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 1342 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1328 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 1341 Declaration of Alex Baxter in Support of 1340 Samsung's Objections to Apple's Proposed Final Jury Instructions filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 1340 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/26/2014) Modified text on 2/27/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1340 Proposed Joint Final Jury Instructions with Objections by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/27/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1339 Corrected Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) . (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/27/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1338 ***WITHDRAWN - SEE ORDER 1352 Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc.( a California corporation). (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/27/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/27/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Fazio Declaration re Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motions in Limine, # 4 Fazio Declaration re Motions in Limine, # 5 Notice of Manual Filing re Voluminous Documents, # 6 Notice of Manual Filing re Computer Files, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 19, # 19 Exhibit 20, # 20 Exhibit 21, # 21 Exhibit 22, # 22 Exhibit 23, # 23 Exhibit 24, # 24 Exhibit 26, # 25 Exhibit 34, # 26 Exhibit 35, # 27 Exhibit 38, # 28 Exhibit 39, # 29 Exhibit 40, # 30 Exhibit 41, # 31 Exhibit 42, # 32 Exhibit 44, # 33 Exhibit 45, # 34 Exhibit 46, # 35 Exhibit 47, # 36 Exhibit 48, # 37 Exhibit 49, # 38 Exhibit 50, # 39 Exhibit 52, # 40 Exhibit 53, # 41 Exhibit 54, # 42 Exhibit 55, # 43 Exhibit 56, # 44 Exhibit 57, # 45 Exhibit 58, # 46 Exhibit 59, # 47 Exhibit 60, # 48 Exhibit 61, # 49 Exhibit 62, # 50 Exhibit 63, # 51 Exhibit 64, # 52 Exhibit 65, # 53 Exhibit 66, # 54 Exhibit 67, # 55 Exhibit 68, # 56 Exhibit 69)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 1336 Joint Pretrial Statement and Proposed Order by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/26/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1335 Proposed Voir Dire by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) . (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 1334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motions In Limine filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Rho Declaration in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motions in Limine Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motions in Limine, # 4 Sabri Declaration in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motions in Limine, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/26/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1333 Proposed Voir Dire by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. . (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 1332 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Schedule for Objections and Deposition Designations filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/26/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1331 Corrected Trial Exhibit List (Relates to 1267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's List of Exhibits for Trial) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Samsung's Corrected Trial Exhibit List)(Related document(s) 1267 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/26/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1330 Notice of Filing of Apple's Second Corrected Exhibit List, Consolidated Conformed to Sealing Positions re 1269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Corrected Exhibit List, filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 UNREDACTED Apple's 2nd Corrected Exhibit List)(Related document(s) 1269 , 1272 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/26/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1329 Notice of Lodging English Translations of Apple Trial Exhibits Cited in Samsug's Motions In Limine re 1285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FAZIO IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNG'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE, 1283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motions in Limine. Regarding Translations of Korean Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motion In Limine filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 149 - Translated, # 2 Exhibit 152 - Translated, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Trial Exhibits 107, 146, 151, 183, 194, 200)(Related document(s) 1285 , 1283 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/26/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1328 Notice of Filing of Corrected Version of Document Sought to Be Sealed re 1285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FAZIO IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNG'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Re Corrected Fazio Ex. 48 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Fazio Ex. 48)(Related document(s) 1285 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified text on 2/26/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1327 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Supplement 1283 Motion in Limine #2 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay M. Cooper In Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion For Leave to Supplement Motion in Limine #2, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 [Proposed] Order Granting Samsung's Motion For Leave to Supplement Motion in Limine #2, # 8 Samsung's Supplemental Motion in Limine #2, # 9 [Proposed] Order Granting Supplemental Motion in Limine #2)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 linking entry to document #1283 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1326 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 1325 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 802 Samsung's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; granting in part and denying in part 806 Apple's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony - PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 24, 2014 1324 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Samsung's and Apple's Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1280 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Samsung's and Apple's Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1280 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Samsung's and Apple's Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Non-Party filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Non-Party)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1321 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE), 1285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FAZIO IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNG'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE, 1283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motions in Limine filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1281 , 1285 , 1283 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1320 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Declaration of Non-Party Ms. Ayumi Nishino ( D.I. 1282 ) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Amended Declaration of Non-Party)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/24/2014) Modified text on 2/25/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2014 1319 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1318 Declaration of Casey McCracken in Support of 1248 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Highlighted Version of Fazio Ex. DDD to Samsung Daubert Motion, 1292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Highlighted Versions of Documents Samsung Seeks to Seal (See Dkts. 802, 807), 802 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts, 1142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING EXHIBITS H, W, Z, AA, AND KK TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FAZIO IN SUPPORT MOTION AND NOTICE OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CERTAIN OF APPLES EXPERTS Corrected Declaration of Casey McCracken in support of Samsung's Motion to Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts and related corrected filings, D.I. 802, 1142, 1240, 1248, 1292 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1248 , 1292 , 802 , 1142 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 UNREDACTED Rho Declaration in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motions in Limine, # 3 UNREDACTED Samsung's Notice of Motions and Motions in Limine, # 4 UNREDACTED Ex. 7, # 5 UNREDACTED Ex. 26, # 6 UNREDACTED Ex. 41, # 7 UNREDACTED Ex. 43)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1316 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of 1281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1281 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1315 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Redacted Version of Declaration of Ryan Koppelman, # 3 Declaration Unredacted Version of Declaration of Ryan Koppelman)(Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1314 REPLY in Support of ( 1228 MOTION for Clarification of 1127 Order re Motions to Strike and Seal Concerning Dr. Mowry's Theories "Based on his Discussions with Engineers not Disclosed" by Apple, filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/24/2014) Modified text on 2/25/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2014 1313 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1311 Stipulation (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 1312 CLERKS NOTICE RE: LOCATION OF HEARING SET FOR WEDNESDAY, MARCH 5, 2014 AT 2:00 P.M. THE COURT'S CALENDAR WILL BE HEARD IN COURTROOM 1 ON THE FIFTH FLOOR. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 23, 2014 1311 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Submission of Proposed Final Jury Instructions filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/23/2014)
February 21, 2014 1310 Joint Report re: Status of Settlement Discussions by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1275 Order (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/21/2014) Modified text on 2/24/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2014 1309 Declaration of David Greenbaum in Support of 1285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motion In Limine , 1283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motions in Limine filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 1285 , 1283 ) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 2/21/2014) Modified text on 2/24/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2014 1308 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh regarding sealing relating to Samsung's Motion to Strike granting in part and denying in part 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; withdrawing 1246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1251 Motion to Withdraw (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 1307 EXHIBITS re 1281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) Public Redacted Version of Apple's Motions in Limine filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1281 ) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 1306 EXHIBITS re 1283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motions in Limine Public Redacted Version of Samsung's Motions in Limine filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1283 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 1305 Proposed Joint Preliminary Jury Instructions with Objections by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Baxter in support of Samsung's Objections, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/20/2014) Modified text on 2/21/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2014 1304 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Highlighted Versions of Documents Samsung Seeks to Seal (See Dkts. 802, 807) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 1303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's List of Exhibits for Trial (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 1302 Notice of Withdrawal of 1286 Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Proposed Joint Preliminary Jury Instructions (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/20/2014) Modified text on 2/21/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2014 1301 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part 1202 Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/20/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 1300 EXHIBITS re 1297 Exhibits,,, 1264 Notice (Other), Exhibit BB to Fazio Declaration re: Samsung's Daubert Motion filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1297 , 1264 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 1299 EXHIBITS Regarding Public Versions of 857 Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-3, # 2 Exhibit A-4, # 3 Exhibit A-5, # 4 Exhibit A-6, # 5 Exhibit A-7, # 6 Exhibit A-8, # 7 Exhibit A-9, # 8 Exhibit A-10, # 9 Exhibit A-11, # 10 Exhibit B-1, # 11 Exhibit C-3)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/20/2014) Modified on 2/21/2014 linking entry to document #857 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2014 1298 EXHIBITS Regarding Public Versions of 806 Apple's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/20/2014) Modified on 2/21/2014 linking entry to document #806 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2014 1297 EXHIBITS Regarding Public Versions of Documents Filed in 802 Samsung's Adminsitrative Motion to file Documents Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Combined Exs. A, B, E, F, I, J, N, R, # 2 Combined Exs. C, D, I, O, P, Q, S (redacted), # 3 Exs. T, U, V, W, X, Z, AA, BB, CC, # 4 Combined Exs. HH, II, UU, VV, HHH, # 5 Exs. XX, ZZ, BBB, CCC, DDD, HHH, # 6 Corrected Exhibit KK to Fazio Decl, # 7 Exhibit DD to Fazio Decl., # 8 Exhibit EE to Fazio Decl., # 9 Exhibit FF to Fazio Decl., # 10 Exhibit GG to Fazio, # 11 Exhibits Exs. JJ, KK, MM, NN, oo, PP to Fazio Decl)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2014) Modified text on 2/21/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2014 1296 Joint MOTION to Withdraw Documents Filed in Connection with Daubert Motions filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). Responses due by 3/5/2014. Replies due by 3/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Joint Motion to Withdraw Documents Filed in Connection with Daubert Motions, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Withdraw Documents Filed in Connection with Daubert Motions)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 1295 EXHIBITS Redacted Version of Apple's Reply in support of 806 Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/19/2014) Modified on 2/20/2014 linking entry to document #806 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2014 1294 EXHIBITS Regarding Public Versions of Documents Filed For Samsung's Reply ISO Of Its Daubert Motion ( Dkt. No. 948 ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exs. C, D, H, K, P to Fazio Decl., # 2 Exhibit G to Fazio Decl.)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2014) Modified on 2/20/2014 linking entry to document #948 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2014 1293 EXHIBITS Regarding Public Versions of Documents Filed For Samsung's Opposition to Apple Daubert Motion ( Dkt. No. 856 ) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exs. E, G, H, I, M, N, OO, # 2 Exhibit B to Fazio Decl., # 3 Exhibit C to Fazio Decl., # 4 Exhibit D to Fazio Decl.)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2014) Modified on 2/20/2014 linking entry to document #856 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2014 1292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Highlighted Versions of Documents Samsung Seeks to Seal (See Dkts. 802, 807) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Samsung Daubert Motion, # 2 Corrected Exhibit DDD)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 1291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 1290 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Seal Docket Entries 1258-2 and 1258-3 (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 1289 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter from Josh Krevitt to the Court filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Rho, # 3 Letter from Josh Krevitt)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 1288 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 1283 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/19/2014) Modified text on 2/20/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2014 1287 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation) re 1286 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 1286 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Baxter in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's AMTFUS, # 3 Proposed Joint Preliminary Jury Instructions with Objections, # 4 Declaration of Alex Baxter in Support of Samsung's Objections to Proposed Joint Preliminary Jury Instructions, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 1285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FAZIO IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNG'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19, # 19 Exhibit 20, # 20 Exhibit 21, # 21 Exhibit 22, # 22 Exhibit 23, # 23 Exhibit 24, # 24 Exhibit 25, # 25 Exhibit 26, # 26 Exhibit 27, # 27 Exhibit 28, # 28 Exhibit 29, # 29 Exhibit 30, # 30 Exhibit 31, # 31 Exhibit 32, # 32 Exhibit 33, # 33 Envelope 34, # 34 Exhibit 35, # 35 Exhibit 36, # 36 Exhibit 37, # 37 Exhibit 38, # 38 Exhibit 39, # 39 Exhibit 40, # 40 Exhibit 41, # 41 Exhibit 42, # 42 Exhibit 43, # 43 Exhibit 44, # 44 Exhibit 45, # 45 Exhibit 46, # 46 Exhibit 47, # 47 Exhibit 48, # 48 Exhibit 49, # 49 Exhibit 50, # 50 Exhibit 51, # 51 Exhibit 52, # 52 Exhibit 53, # 53 Exhibit 54, # 54 Exhibit 55, # 55 Exhibit 56)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 1284 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 18, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 1275 Order (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 1283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Samsung's Motions in Limine filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 SAMSUNG'S NOTICE OF MOTIONS AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE, # 4 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motions In Limine, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motions In Limine)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified text on 2/20/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 1282 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Non-Party filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Non-Party)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 1281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Apple's Motions In Limine), # 2 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Apple's Motions In Limine (SEALED), # 4 Declaration of Nathan Sabri in Support of Apple's Motions In Limine, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4 (SEALED), # 9 Exhibit 5 (SEALED), # 10 Exhibit 6 (SEALED), # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8 (SEALED), # 13 Exhibit 9 (SEALED), # 14 Exhibit 10 (SEALED), # 15 Exhibit 11 (SEALED), # 16 Exhibit 12 (SEALED), # 17 Exhibit 13 (SEALED), # 18 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Motions In Limine (SEALED))(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 1280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Becher in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Seal, # 4 Declaration Unredacted Version of Becher Decl. In Support Of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Seal, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Becher Decl.)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 1279 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Corrected Exhibit List (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 1278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in support of Motion to Seal, # 3 Motion to Remove, # 4 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in support of Motion to Remove, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remove)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 1277 Declaration of Lee Patch in Support of 1269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Corrected Exhibit List filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1269 , 1272 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 1276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration REDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION OF RYAN W. KOPPELMAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL, # 2 Declaration UNDER SEAL VERSION OF DECLARATION OF RYAN W. KOPPELMAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 1275 Order Vacating February 20, 2014 Hearing; Requesting Settlement Status Update. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/18/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 17, 2014 1274 OPPOSITION to ( 1228 APPLES MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF 1127 THE COURT'S JANUARY 9, 2014 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND SEAL filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/17/2014) Modified text on 2/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2014 1273 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Corrected Exhibit List (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 1272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Corrected Exhibit List filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Rho Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple's Corrected Exhibit List)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 1271 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1262 Motion ; granting 1263 Stipulation. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 13, 2014 1270 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 1269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Rho Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Exhibit List)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 1268 Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 1267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's List of Exhibits for Trial filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Samsung's Exhibit List, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Appendix 1)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 1266 Witness List by Apple Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 1265 Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) . (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 12, 2014 1264 Amended Notice Regarding Revised Redacted Versions Relating to the Parties' Motions to Seal their Daubert Briefing (Supersedes D.I. 1249 ) by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/12/2014) Modified text on 2/13/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2014 1263 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1262 MOTION Unopposed Administrative Motion for Relief to Consider John Kolakowski Declaration as timely filed re 1257 Declaration in Support, filed by Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 1262 MOTION Unopposed Administrative Motion for Relief to Consider John Kolakowski Declaration as timely filed re 1257 Declaration in Support, filed by Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC. Responses due by 2/26/2014. Replies due by 3/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 1261 Declaration of Kenneth L. Wilton in Support of 802 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts filed byTBWA Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a TBWA\Media Arts Lab. (Related document(s) 802 ) (Wilton, Kenneth) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 11, 2014 1260 Joint Statement Regarding Effect of February 10, 2014, Case Narrowing Decisions re 1219 Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/11/2014) Modified text on 2/12/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2014 1259 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letters to the Court (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 1258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letters to the Court filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration [Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed] Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 [Unredacted Version of Document Sought to Be Sealed] Letter from Josh Krevitt to Judge Grewal, # 3 [Unredacted Version of Document Sought to Be Sealed] Letter from William F. Lee to Judge Grewal, # 4 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 1257 Declaration of John Kolakowski in Support of 1243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted Versions of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, D.I. 857, and supporting Exhibits filed byNokia Solutions and Networks US LLC. (Related document(s) 1243 ) (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 1256 Samsung's Final Reduction of Invalidity References by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Kang, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified text on 2/11/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 1255 Apple Inc.'s February 10, 2014 Case Narrowing Identification of Invalidity References/Systems/Combinations by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1135 Order on Stipulation (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified text on 2/11/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 1254 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Motion to Seal and supporting Declaration iso Motion to Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted versions of Apple's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimon, 1243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted Versions of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, D.I. 857, and supporting Exhibits , 1240 Notice of Samsung's Filing of Revised Highlighted Versions of Documents Sought to be Sealed in Connection with Parties' Daubert Motion, filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1244 , 1243 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 1253 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of 1242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted Version of Apple's Reply in support of Its Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony, D.I. 945, 1244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Motion to Seal and supporting Declaration iso Motion to Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted versions of Apple's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimon, 1243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted Versions of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, D.I. 857, and supporting Exhibits filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1242 , 1244 , 1243 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 1252 REPLYin Support of ( 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified text on 2/11/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 1251 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw 1246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 2/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified text on 2/11/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 1250 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 7, 2014 1249 NOTICE Regarding Revised Redacted Versions Relating to the Parties' Motions to Seal Their Daubert Briefing by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified text on 2/10/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 1248 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Highlighted Version of Fazio Ex. DDD to Samsung Daubert Motion filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. DDD to Samsung Daubert Motion)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 6, 2014 1247 Declaration of RYAN W. KOPPELMAN in Support of 802 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts filed byNokia Corporation. (Related document(s) 802 ) (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 1246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Samsung's Reply)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 5, 2014 1245 EXHIBITS re 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Redacted Versions of Exhibits 3, 5, and 9 to the Kolovos Declaration Sought to Be Sealed filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 to the Kolovos Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 9 to the Kolovos Declaration)(Related document(s) 1220 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 1244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Motion to Seal and supporting Declaration iso Motion to Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted versions of Apple's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony, D.I. 806 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Amended Declaration of Jordan Bekier in support of Apple's Motion to Seal Its Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony, # 2 UNREDACTED CONFORMED version of Apple's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert T Testimony, D.I. 806, # 3 Exhibit UNREDACTED CONFORMED version of Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED CONFORMED version of Ex. A-2, # 5 Exhibit UNREDACTED CONFORMED version of Ex. A-3)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 1243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted Versions of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, D.I. 857, and supporting Exhibits filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 UNREDACTED Conformed Version of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, D.I. 857, # 2 Exhibit UNREDACTED CONFORMED version of Ex. A-9, # 3 Exhibit UNREDACTED CONFORMED version of Ex. A-10, # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED CONFORMED version of Ex. A-11, # 5 Exhibit UNREDACTED CONFORMED version of Ex. B-1)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 1242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Consolidated Highlighted Version of Apple's Reply in support of Its Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony, D.I. 945 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 UNREDACTED Conformed Version of Apple's Reply in support of Its Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony, D.I. 945)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 1241 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING EFFECT OF FEBRUARY 4, 2014, CASE NARROWING DECISIONS re 1219 Order by Apple Inc.. (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified text on 2/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 1240 Notice of Samsung's Filing of Revised Highlighted Versions of Documents Sought to be Sealed in Connection with Parties' Daubert Motion ( See Dkts, 1209 , 948 , 856 , 802 ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Daubert Motion, # 2 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. C to Samsung Daubert Motion, # 3 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. D to Samsung Daubert Motion, # 4 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. I to Samsung Daubert Motion, # 5 Unredacted Version of Fazio Exs. K, M, O, P, Q, S to Samsung Daubert Motion, # 6 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. EE to Samsung Daubert Motion, # 7 Unredacted Version of Fazio Exs. FF, GG, JJ, KK, MM, NN, OO, PP, XX, ZZ, BBB, CCC to Samsung Daubert Motion, # 8 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. EEE to Samsung Daubert Motion, # 9 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. FFF to Samsung Daubert Motion, # 10 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. GGG to Samsung Daubert Motion (part 1), # 11 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. GGG to Samsung Daubert Motion (part 2), # 12 Unredacted Version of Corrected Fazio Ex. KK to Samsung Daubert Motion, # 13 Unredacted Version of Samsung Opp to Apple Daubert Motion, # 14 Unredacted Version of Fazio Exs. B, C, D, J to Samsung Opp to Apple' Daubert Motion, # 15 Unredacted Version of Samsung Reply ISO Daubert Motion, # 16 Unredacted Version of Fazio Ex. G to Samsung Reply ISO to Daubert Motion)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified text on 2/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 1239 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1235 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 4, 2014 1238 Proposed Order re 1228 MOTION for Clarification re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, by Apple Inc.. (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 1237 Apple's List of Accused Products and Asserted Patent Claims Pursuant to 713 July 31, 2013, and 1136 January 16, 2014 Court Orders, by Apple Inc. (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/5/2014 linking entry to document #713, 1136 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2014 1236 Samsung's February 4, 2014 Case Narrowing Statement by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified text on 2/5/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2014 1235 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Financial Data Supplementation filed by Apple Inc.. (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 1234 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d regarding reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 8,074,172 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 1233 Declaration of Brett E. Bachtell (Qualcomm Incorporated) in Support of 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1220 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 1232 Declaration of Paula M. Phillips (AT&T Services, Inc.) in Support of 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1220 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 1231 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byIntel Corporation. (Related document(s) 1220 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 1230 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 1229 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Bennett (Bennett, James) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 1228 MOTION for Clarification re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 2/18/2014. Replies due by 2/25/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Esther Kim)(Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 31, 2014 1227 EXHIBITS re 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1220 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 30, 2014 1226 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1225 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomm Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1224 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Nokia Solutions and Networks (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1223 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Intel Corporation (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1222 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&T Services Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1221 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions, # 4 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 5 Exhibit 1 to the Kolovos Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 2 to the Kolovos Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 3 to the Kolovos Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 4 to the Kolovos Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 5 to the Kolovos Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 6 to the Kolovos Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 7 to the Kolovos Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 8 to the Kolovos Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 9 to the Kolovos Declaration)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1219 Featured Case ORDER regarding case narrowing statements. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/30/2014. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1218 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Highlighted Versions of Documents Samsung Seeks to Seal (See Dkts. 1169, 1170, 1173, 1174) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Version of Exhibit 6 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike (re Samsung's Patents), # 2 Highlighted Version of Exhibit 8 to Briggs (Part 1 of 2), # 3 Highlighted Version of Exhibit 8 to Briggs (Part 2 of 2), # 4 Highlighted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike (re Samsung's Patents), # 5 Highlighted Version of Exhibit 9 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 6 Highlighted Version of Exhibit 13 to Drezdon, # 7 Highlighted Version of Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike (re Samsung's Patents))(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1217 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1169 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motions to Seal Related to Motions to Strike Public Versions of Samsung's Briefing Related to Motions to Strike re: Samsung's Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 1009, 963, 878) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit 5 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 3 Exhibit 6 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 4 Exhibit 7 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 7 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 8 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike (Part 1 of 2), # 7 Exhibit 8 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike (Part 2 of 2), # 8 Exhibit 9 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 9 Exhibit 10 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 10 Exhibit 11 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 11 Exhibit 12 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 12 Exhibit 13 to Briggs iso Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 13 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike re Samsung's Patents, # 14 Exhibit 2 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 15 Exhibit 3 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 16 Exhibit 4 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 17 Exhibit 5 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 18 Exhibit 6 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 19 Exhibit 7 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 20 Exhibit 8 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 21 Exhibit 9 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 22 Exhibit 10 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 23 Exhibit 11 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 24 Exhibit 12 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 25 Exhibit 13 to Drezdon iso Samsung's Opposition, # 26 Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike re Samsung's Patents, # 27 Exhibit 1 to Ducca iso Samsung's Reply, # 28 Exhibit 2 to Ducca iso Samsung's Reply, # 29 Exhibit 3 to Ducca iso Samsung's Reply)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1216 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1156 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 1215 Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1175 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2014) Modified text on 1/31/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 1214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket 1175 - Corrected Unredacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions (D.I. 965) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Unredacted Version of Exhibits 3, 5, 10, 11, 14 and 16 to Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions (D.I. 965), # 2 Corrected Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (D.I. 877), # 3 Corrected Unredacted Version of of Ex. B to Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (D.I. 877))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1213 EXHIBITS re 1017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents 877 , 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 Revised Redacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Revised Redacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents)(Related document(s) 1017 , 1175 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1212 EXHIBITS re 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 , 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] Revised Redacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Revised Redacted Version of Exhibits 3, 5, 10, 11, 14 and 16 to Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions, # 2 Exhibit 7 to Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions, # 3 Exhibit 8 to Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions, # 4 Exhibit 9 to Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions)(Related document(s) 1175 , 965 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1211 EXHIBITS re 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 Revised Redacted Version of Apple Inc's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents 877 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Revised Redacted Ex. A to the Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike, # 2 Revised Redacted Ex. B to the Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike, # 3 Revised Redacted Ex. Dto the Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike)(Related document(s) 1175 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1210 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1169 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motions to Seal Related to Motions to Strike Public Versions of Samsung's Motion to Strike Briefing Regarding Apple's Patents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 to Fazio Motion to Strike Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 27 to Fazio Motion to Strike Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 28 to Fazio Motion to Strike Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 29 to Fazio Motion to Strike Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 33 to Fazio Motion to Strike Declaration, # 6 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike, # 7 Exhibit 1 to Fazio Opposition Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 2 to Fazio Opposition Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 19 to Fazio Opposition Declaration, # 10 Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1209 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1155 Notice (Other),,, Revised Joint Notice Regarding the Parties' Motions to Seal their Daubert Briefing [Supersedes Dkt. No. 1155] (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1208 EXHIBITS re 964 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 (Revised Redacted Version of (D.I. 964) Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Regarding Apple Patents) filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Revised Redacted Version-Exhibit P and S to the Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Opposition), # 2 Exhibit (Revised Version-Rho Declaration Exhibit T), # 3 Exhibit (Revised Version-Rho Declaration Exhibit W))(Related document(s) 964 , 1175 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1207 Declaration of Brett E. Bachtell (Qualcomm) in Support of 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 , 1169 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motions to Seal Related to Motions to Strike filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1175 , 1169 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1206 EXHIBITS re 1011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents) (Revised Redacted Version of Apple's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents) filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1011 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1205 EXHIBITS re 882 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports, 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 (Revised Redacted Version of Apple's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and NonInfringement Expert Reports) filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Revised Redacted Versions of Furman Declaration Exhibits 5, 11, and 36 In Support of Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and NonInfringement Expert Reports))(Related document(s) 882 , 1175 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1204 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 1169 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motions to Seal Related to Motions to Strike filed byIntel Corporation. (Related document(s) 1169 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1203 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Motion to Strike and Trac Declaration Exhibit 1 (see Dkt. 1138 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 1202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conformed Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Motion to Strike and Trac Declaration Exhibit 1 (see Dkt. 1138 ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Conformed Highlighted Version of Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 2 Conformed Highlighted Version of Trac Declaration Exhibit 1, # 3 Redacted Version of Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 4 Redacted Version of Trac Declaration Exhibit 1)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 1201 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1150 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Revised Redacted (Public) Version of Exhibit B-9 IN Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1200 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1175 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1199 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1150 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Revised Public Redacted Version of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment (See Dkts. 805, 1102) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1198 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-23-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2014. (Related documents(s) 1160 ) (las, ) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1197 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 filed byIntel Corporation. (Related document(s) 1175 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1196 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 1170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Exhibits 6, 7, 8, 10, 11 to the Declaration of Todd Briggs in Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike re Samsungs Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 878) filed byIntel Corporation. (Related document(s) 1170 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo Upon Nuance Communications (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1194 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo Upon Nokia Corporation (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1193 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo Upon Media Arts Lab (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo Upon IBM Corporation (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo Upon HTC Corporation (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1189 Declaration of Paula M. Phillips (AT&T Services, Inc.) in Support of 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 , 1169 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motions to Seal Related to Motions to Strike filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1175 , 1169 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 1188 Declaration of Paula M. Phillips (AT&T Services, Inc.) in Support of 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1138 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 27, 2014 1187 Joinder re 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 1186 Declaration of David Greenbaum in Support of 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1156 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 1185 RESPONSE (re 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo ) filed byHTC America Inc, HTC Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 1184 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1156 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 1183 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 1182 Notice (Other) APPLE'S NOTICE OF FILING RE AUGUST 11, 2013, EXPERT REPORT OF JOHN R. HAUSER (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 1182 NOTICE by Apple Inc. EXPERT REPORT OF JOHN R. HAUSER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I1, # 4 Exhibit I2, # 5 Exhibit J-K, # 6 Exhibit L, # 7 Exhibit M-Q)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 1181 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 1122 Third-Party Microsoft's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 1180 NOTICE by International Business Machines Corporation re 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Kenneth S. King In Support Of Administrative Motion For A Limited Sealing Order, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Non-Party International Business Machines Corporation's Administrative Motion For A Limited Sealing Order)(Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 1179 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying [1157-4] Samsung's Motion for Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge 1127 , granting 1157 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, and granting 1165 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 26, 2014 1178 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1158 Order Joint Submission of Excerpts of the Deposition Testimony of Dr. Alex Snoeren Regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,761,414 (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 1/26/2014)
January 25, 2014 1177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike re: Samsung's Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 963), 1171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Exhibits 8 and 27 to the Declaration of Michael Fazio in Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike re: Apple's Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 880), 1174 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Version of Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike re: Samsung's Patents (Dkts. 1169, 1003), 1170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Exhibits 6, 7, 8, 10, 11 to the Declaration of Todd Briggs in Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike re Samsungs Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 878), 1172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Version of Exhbiit 19 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike re: Apple's Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 962) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2014)
January 25, 2014 1176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/25/2014)
January 24, 2014 1175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal 1127 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos Regarding Apple Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Admnistrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (D.I. 1127), # 2 Declaration of Samuel K. Whitt in Support of Apple's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal (D.I. 1127), # 3 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos Regarding Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration, # 4 Unredacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (D.I. 877), # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (D.I. 877), # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (D.I. 877), # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (D.I. 877), # 8 Unredacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions (D.I. 965), # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibits 3, 5, 10, 11, 14 and 16 to Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions (D.I. 965), # 10 Unredacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (D.I. 1017), # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (D.I. 1017), # 12 Unredacted Exhibits 5, 11 and 36 to Apple's Motion to Strike re Apple Patents (D.I. 882), # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibits P and S to Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Regarding Apple's Patents (D.I. 964), # 14 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1174 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Version of Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike re: Samsung's Patents (Dkts. 1169, 1003) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike re: Samsung's Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 963) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Drezdon Exhibit 2, # 2 Unredacted Version of Drezdon Exhibit 5, # 3 Unredacted Version of Drezdon Exhibit 7, # 4 Unredacted Version of Drezdon Exhibit 8, # 5 Unredacted Version of Drezdon Exhibit 9, # 6 Unredacted Version of Drezdon Exhibit 13)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Version of Exhbiit 19 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike re: Apple's Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 962) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Exhibits 8 and 27 to the Declaration of Michael Fazio in Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike re: Apple's Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 880) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Fazio Declaration Exhibit 27)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Exhibits 6, 7, 8, 10, 11 to the Declaration of Todd Briggs in Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike re Samsungs Patents (See Dkts. 1169, 878) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Briggs Declaration Exhibit 7 (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Unredacted Version of Briggs Declaration Exhibit 7 (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Unredacted Version of Briggs Declaration Exhibit 8 (Part 1 of 2), # 4 Unredacted Version of Briggs Declaration Exhibit (Part 2 of 2), # 5 Unredacted Version of Briggs Declaration Exhibit 10, # 6 Unredacted Version of Briggs Declaration Exhibit 11)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1169 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motions to Seal Related to Motions to Strike filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A to Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Declaration of Daniel Shim in Support of Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1168 Joint MOTION to Withdraw Documents Filed in Connection with Motions to Strike filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 2/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Joint Motion to Withdraw, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Withdraw)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1167 Joinder In 1175 Apple's Motion for Reconsideration and Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration by Ericsson Inc.. (Callahan, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 document not properly linked to doc. #1175 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 1166 EXHIBITS re 1157 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. 1127) Redacted Motion for Relief filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Motion for Relief)(Related document(s) 1157 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1165 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Dkt. 1173-3) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1164 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) APPLE'S NOTICE OF LODGING (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1162 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1161 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1160 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sabri, Nathaniel) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1159 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) for Court Reporter Candace Yount. (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 1158 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 1/24/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 23, 2014 1163 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 1/23/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 1157 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. 1127) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, *** # 3 Redacted Motion to Strike FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , # 4 Unredacted Motion to Strike, # 5 Briggs Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Relief)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/23/2014) Modified on 1/24/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2014 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer J. Rho, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Expert Report of Christopher Vellturo)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 1155 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 948 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, 945 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Motion To Exclude Certain Unreliable And Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony), 806 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 857 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude, 856 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Inadmissible Samsung Expert Testimony, 802 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts Regarding the Parties' Motions to Seal Their Daubert Briefing (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 21, 2014 1154 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1148 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 1153 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh. The parties' stipulation, 1143 , was granted in 1145 . ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY*** (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 1152 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in Support of 1142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING EXHIBITS H, W, Z, AA, AND KK TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FAZIO IN SUPPORT MOTION AND NOTICE OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CERTAIN OF APPLES EXPERTS filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1142 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 1151 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1150 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and denying Samsung's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2014 1150 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 803 Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 805 Samsung's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 1066 , 1067 , 1069 , 1070 , 1071 , 1073 , 1074 , 1079 , 1093 , 1097 , 1098 , 1099 , 1100 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [PUBLIC VERSION]. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 1149 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1138 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 1148 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (James L. Quarles III ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8311817.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 1147 Order permitting use of equipment in courtroom. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/21/2014. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 1146 Proposed Order Permitting Use of Equipment in the Courtroom by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 1145 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1143 Stipulation. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 1144 CLERKS NOTICE RE CHANGE OF LOCATION FOR HEARINGS SET FOR THURSDAY, JANUARY 23, 2014 AT 1:30 P.M.--JUDGE KOH'S CALENDAR WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 1 ON THE 5TH FLOOR. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 20, 2014 1143 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WITHDRAWAL OF DAUBERT ISSUES RELATED TO SAMSUNG PATENTS filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation). (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 1/20/2014)
January 17, 2014 1142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING EXHIBITS H, W, Z, AA, AND KK TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FAZIO IN SUPPORT MOTION AND NOTICE OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CERTAIN OF APPLES EXPERTS filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Notice of Errata, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit W, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Z, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit AA, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit KK)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 1141 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions Certificate of Service Upon AT&T (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 1140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions Certificate of Service Upon T-Mobile (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 16, 2014 1139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Claim Constructions filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 3 Samsung's Motion to Strike (Redacted), # 4 Samsung's Motion to Strike (Unredacted), # 5 Samsung's Motion to Strike (Unredacted Without Highlighting), # 6 Trac Declaration in Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Strike)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 1137 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND STAY OF DOCKET NO. 1127 SEALING DECISION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 1129 Motion for Leave to File; granting 1130 Motion to Stay (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 1136 Minute Entry: Hearing re: Sealing Practices held before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 1135 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1132 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Hearing Re: Sealing Practices set for 1/16/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 1134 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING REGARDING SEALING PRACTICES re 1130 Joint MOTION to Stay re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Joint Motion for Stay of the Court's Order Denying Sealing of the Parties' Motions to Strike filed by Apple Inc., 1129 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Sealing of the Parties' Motions to Strike 1127 filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 15, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 1133 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-12-13, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2014. (Related documents(s) 1059 ) (las, ) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 1132 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING MODIFICATION OF TIME TO FILE NARROWING STATEMENTS filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 14, 2014 1131 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Joint Notice Regarding the Parties' Motions to Strike (Docket Nos. 877, 878, 880 and 882) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 14, 2014 1130 Joint MOTION to Stay re 1127 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Joint Motion for Stay of the Court's Order Denying Sealing of the Parties' Motions to Strike filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). Responses due by 1/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 14, 2014 1129 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Sealing of the Parties' Motions to Strike 1127 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 14, 2014 1128 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 806 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal of Correction of Exhibits in Support of Apple's Motion to Exclude (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-7 to the McCracken Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B-8 to the McCracken Declaration)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 9, 2014 1127 Featured Case ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part [877, 878, 880, 882] Motions to Strike and Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 8, 2014 1126 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Record held on 12/12/13, before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candace Yount, Telephone number 415-994-5619, e-mail: candace.yount@gmail.com. Tape Number: 8:30 a.m. - 12:32 p.m.. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2014. (Related documents(s) 1061 ) (Yount, Candace) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 1125 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Recording held on 12/10/13, before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candace Yount, Telephone number 415-994-5619, e-mail: candace.yount@gmail.com. Tape Number: 9:59 a.m. - 12:14 p.m.. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2014. (Related documents(s) 1058 , 1061 ) (Yount, Candace) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 6, 2014 1124 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Ronald Richard Demsher (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1123 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Kim (Kim, Esther) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal All Confidential Documents Discovered from Microsoft by Subpoena Without the Need for Repeated Confirming Declarations filed by Microsoft. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Third Declaration of W. Harmon)(Parker, Henrik) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1121 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Wiener (Wiener, Christopher) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1120 NOTICE of Appearance by Efrain Staino Flores (Staino Flores, Efrain) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1119 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany N. DePuy (DePuy, Brittany) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1118 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Leonard Robinson (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1117 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Bryan Sabri (Sabri, Nathaniel) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1116 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Alexander Kuwayti (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1115 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik J. Olson (Olson, Erik) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1114 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth N. Borenstein (Borenstein, Ruth) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1113 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Krevans (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1112 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Williford Londen (Londen, Jack) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 1111 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold J. McElhinny (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 23, 2013 1110 EXHIBITS re 853 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version) Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1 (Redacted Version) to the Declaration of Joshua Furman in support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment (Furman Declaration), # 2 Exhibit A-2 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A-4 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A-5 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B-2 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 6 Exhibit B-3 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 7 Exhibit B-4 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 8 Exhibit B-6 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 9 Exhibit B-8 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 10 Exhibit B-9 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 11 Exhibit C-2 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration, # 12 Exhibit D-1 (Redacted Version) to the Furman Declaration)(Related document(s) 853 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1109 EXHIBITS re 944 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) (Redacted Version) Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply in support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-11 (Redacted Version) to the Reply Declaration of Jennifer Rho)(Related document(s) 944 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1108 EXHIBITS re 803 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Redacted Version - Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant Apple Inc's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-1 (Redacted Version ) to the Declaration of Jennifer Rho in support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ("Rho Declaration"), # 2 Exhibit B-2 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B-3 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B-4 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B-5 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration, # 6 Exhibit C-1 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration, # 7 Exhibit C-5 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration, # 8 Exhibit C-6 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration, # 9 Exhibit D-1 Part 1 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration, # 10 Exhibit D-1 Part 2 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration, # 11 Exhibit E-6 (Redacted Version) to the Rho Declaration)(Related document(s) 803 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Corrected Highlighted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment [1066-1] (See also Dkt. 1064) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1106 EXHIBITS re 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946), 1071 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Reply in Support of its MSJ and Exhibits (See Dkts. 946, 1064) ; Redacted Version of Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio)(Related document(s) 1064 , 1071 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1105 EXHIBITS re 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946), 1070 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Schonfeld Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ and Exhibits (See Dkts. 854, 1064) ; Redacted Version of Declaration of Dan Schonfeld In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits D-DD to the Declaration of Dan Schonfeld)(Related document(s) 1064 , 1070 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1104 EXHIBITS re 1069 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ and Supporting Declarations and Exhibits (See Dkts. 854, 1064), 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946) ; Redacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Version of Declaration of Jeffrey Chase In Support of Samsung's Opposition, # 2 Redacted Version of Declaration of Kevin Jeffay In Support of Samsung's Opposition, # 3 Redacted Version of Declaration of Martin Rinard In Support of Samsung's Opposition, # 4 Declaration of Paul Westbrook In Support of Samsung's Opposition, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio)(Related document(s) 1069 , 1064 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1103 EXHIBITS re 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946), 1068 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Version of Exhibit 4 to Fazio iso Samsung's Reply iso Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 852, 1064) ; Redacted Version of Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Enforce filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 1064 , 1068 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1102 EXHIBITS re 1066 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits (See Dkts. 805, 1064), 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946) ; Redacted Version of Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 4 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 10 Exhibit 19 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 11 Exhibit 23 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 12 Redacted Version of Exhibit 24 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 13 Exhibit 42 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio)(Related document(s) 1066 , 1064 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1101 EXHIBITS re 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946), 1065 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Exhibits to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 1064) ; Redacted Version of Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 2 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio)(Related document(s) 1064 , 1065 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Corrected Highlighted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment [1066-1] (See also Dkt. 1064) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1099 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket # 1079 and 1074 - Correction of Proposed Order and Exhibits B-1, C-1, and C-5 ([1074-01], [1074-05], [1074-10], [1079-01]) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit CORRECTED UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-1, # 3 Exhibit CORRECTED UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-1, # 4 Exhibit Second CORRECTED VERSION of Ex. C-5)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 1098 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket # 1097 and 1073 - Correction of Proposed Order and Exhibit B-09 ([1097-01], [1097-03]) re Apple's Renewed Motion to Seal Its Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit SECOND CORRECTED UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-9)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 20, 2013 1097 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket # 1073 - Correction of Proposed Order, Rho Declaration, and Exhibit B-09 ([1073-01], [1073-02], [1073-13]) re Apple's Renewed Motion to Seal Its Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Corrected version of the Rho Declaration in support of Apple's Renewed Motion to Seal, # 3 Exhibit CORRECTED UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-09)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 1096 Declaration of Gary H. Levin in Support of 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946), 1073 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment Declaration of Third-Party Microsoft In Support of Apple's and Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motions to Seal Certain Submissions Containing Highly Confidential Microsoft Information filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1064 , 1073 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 1095 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1093 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Highlighted Version of Exhibit 1 to Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ [1066-1] and Corrected Highlighted Version of Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 1074] (See al (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 1094 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1074 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 1067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Reply in support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 1066 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits (See Dkts. 805, 1064), 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946), 1073 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 1069 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ and Supporting Declarations and Exhibits (See Dkts. 854, 1064) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1074 , 1067 , 1066 , 1064 , 1073 , 1069 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 1093 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Highlighted Version of Exhibit 1 to Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ [1066-1] and Corrected Highlighted Version of Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 1074] (See also Dkt. 1064) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Highlighted Version of Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment [See Dkt 1074])(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 1092 EXHIBITS re 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946) Corrected Attachment A to Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Dkt. 1064-1] and Corrected Exhibit A to the Fazio Declaration in Support [Dkt. 1064-3] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit A to the Fazio Declaration in Support of Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Dkt. 1064-3])(Related document(s) 1064 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1091 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of 1074 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 1067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Reply in support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 1079 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket # 1074 - Correction of Exhibits C-5 and C-6, [1074-13] and [1074-14], 1073 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1074 , 1067 , 1079 , 1073 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1090 Declaration of Emily L. Fedman in Support of 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946) filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1064 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1089 EXHIBITS re 853 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment C-1 to the Declaration of Joshua Furman In Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-3 to the Declaration of Joshua Furman In Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) 853 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1088 EXHIBITS re 944 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) C-10 to the Reply Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-10 to the Reply Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) 944 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1087 EXHIBITS re 803 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal A-1 to Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-2 to Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit D-2 to Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit E-4to Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit E-5 to Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit E-7 to Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Professor Andrew Cockburn In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Professor Andrew Cockburn In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Professor Andrew Cockburn In Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) 803 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1086 EXHIBITS re 946 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 3, 11, and 13 to Fazio Declaration iso Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11 to Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Reply, # 2 Exhibit 13 to Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Reply)(Related document(s) 946 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1085 EXHIBITS re 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Versions of Exhibits EE and GG to Schonfeld Declaration iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment (See Dkts. 854, 1057) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GG to Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) 854 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1084 EXHIBITS re 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Versions of Exhibits to Fazio Declaration in Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment (See Dkts. 854, 1057) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 to Fazio iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ, # 2 Exhibit 17 to Fazio iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ, # 3 Exhibit 18 to Fazio iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ, # 4 Exhibit 20 to Fazio iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 21 to Fazio iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ)(Related document(s) 854 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1083 Brief Unredacted Version of Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion to Enforce Apple's Compliance with the Court's Order Regarding Case Narrowing (See Dkts. 852, 1057) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Fazio iso Samsung's Reply)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1082 EXHIBITS re 805 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Versions of Exhibits to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment (See Dkts. 805, 1057) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 15 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit 16 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit 17 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit 18 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit 25 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit 28 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit 29 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit 31 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit 33 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit 34 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 12 Exhibit 35 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 13 Exhibit 36 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 14 Exhibit 38 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 15 Exhibit 39 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) 805 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 1081 EXHIBITS re 1057 Motion Hearing, Case Management Conference - Further, Set Hearings,,, Unredacted Versions of Exhibits to Fazio iso Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 1057) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 to Fazio iso Motion to Enforce, # 2 Exhibit 7 to Fazio iso Motion to Enforce, # 3 Exhibit 9 to Fazio iso Motion to Enforce, # 4 Exhibit 10 to Fazio iso Motion to Enforce)(Related document(s) 1057 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 1080 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946), 1070 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Schonfeld Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ and Exhibits (See Dkts. 854, 1064) filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1064 , 1070 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 1079 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket # 1074 - Correction of Exhibits C-5 and C-6, [1074-13] and [1074-14] filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CORRECTED UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-5, # 2 Exhibit CORRECTED UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-6)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 17, 2013 1078 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 1077 NOTICE of Change of Address by Victoria F. Maroulis (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 1076 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1066 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits (See Dkts. 805, 1064), 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946), 1071 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Reply in Support of its MSJ and Exhibits (See Dkts. 946, 1064), 1065 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Exhibits to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 1064), 1070 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Schonfeld Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ and Exhibits (See Dkts. 854, 1064), 1068 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Version of Exhibit 4 to Fazio iso Samsung's Reply iso Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 852, 1064), 1069 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ and Supporting Declarations and Exhibits (See Dkts. 854, 1064) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 1075 Order Granting 1063 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/17/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 1074 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler, # 3 Declaration of Mark Selwyn, # 4 UNREDACTED version of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-1, # 6 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-2, # 7 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-3, # 8 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-4, # 9 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-5, # 10 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-1, # 11 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-2, # 12 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-4, # 13 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-5, # 14 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-6, # 15 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. D-1 (part 1), # 16 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. D-1 (part 2), # 17 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. E-6)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 16, 2013 1073 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in support of Apple's Motion to Seal Its Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 UNREDACTED version of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. A-1, # 5 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. A-2, # 6 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. A-4, # 7 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. A-5, # 8 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-2, # 9 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-3, # 10 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-4, # 11 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-6, # 12 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-8, # 13 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-9, # 14 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of C-2, # 15 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. D-1)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1072 Proposed Order re 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1071 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Reply in Support of its MSJ and Exhibits (See Dkts. 946, 1064) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's Reply iso MSJ Ex. 1, # 2 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's Reply iso MSJ Ex. 2, # 3 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's Reply iso MSJ Ex. 12)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1070 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Schonfeld Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ and Exhibits (See Dkts. 854, 1064) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. D, # 2 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. E, # 3 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. F, # 4 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. G, # 5 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. H, # 6 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. I, # 7 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. J, # 8 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. K, # 9 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. L, # 10 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. M, # 11 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. N, # 12 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. O, # 13 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. P, # 14 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. Q, # 15 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. R, # 16 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. S, # 17 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. T, # 18 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. U, # 19 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. V, # 20 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. W, # 21 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. X, # 22 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. Y, # 23 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. Z, # 24 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. AA, # 25 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. BB, # 26 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. CC, # 27 Highlighted Version of Schonfeld iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. DD)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1069 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ and Supporting Declarations and Exhibits (See Dkts. 854, 1064) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Version of Chase Declaration iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ, # 2 Highlighted Version of Jeffay Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ, # 3 Highlighted Version of Rinard Decl. iso Samsung's Opp to Apple's MSJ and Ex. 1 Thereto, # 4 Highlighted Version of Westbrook Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ, # 5 Highlighted Version of Fazio Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. 3, # 6 Highlighted Version of Fazio Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. 4, # 7 Highlighted Version of Fazio Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. 5, # 8 Highlighted Version of Fazio Decl. iso Samsung's Opp. to Apple's MSJ Ex. 7)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1068 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Version of Exhibit 4 to Fazio iso Samsung's Reply iso Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 852, 1064) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Apple's Reply in support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Emily Fedman in support of Apple's Renewed Motion to Seal Its MSJ Reply, # 3 UNREDACTED version of Apple's Reply in support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. B-7, # 5 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-7, # 6 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-8, # 7 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. C-9, # 8 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. D-10, # 9 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex. D-11)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1066 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits (See Dkts. 805, 1064) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 1, # 2 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 2, # 3 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 4, # 4 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 6, # 5 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 10, # 6 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 11, # 7 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 12, # 8 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 13, # 9 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 14, # 10 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 19, # 11 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 23, # 12 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 24, # 13 Highlighted Version of Fazio iso Samsung's MSJ Ex. 42)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1065 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Highlighted Versions of Exhibits to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 1064) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Version of Exhibit 6 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion to Enforce, # 2 Highlighted Version of Exhibit 8 to Fazio iso Samsung's Motion to Enforce)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Enforce (See Dkts. 804, 805, 852, 854, 946) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 3 Exhibit A to Fazio)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1063 STIPULATION (Joint) re Extension of Time to File Public Redacted Versions filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1062 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1057 Motion Hearing, Case Management Conference - Further, Set Hearings,,, Joint Submission of U.S. Patent No. 6,847,959 Prosecution History (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1061 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1060 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1059 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 1058 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 13, 2013 1057 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2013 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 12/13/2013), Further Case Management Conference held on 12/12/2013 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 12/13/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 1056 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1054 Status Conference, Terminate Hearings,, Joint Chart Identifying Issues in Remaining Motions to Strike (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 12, 2013 1055 OPPOSITION to ( 1041 MOTION to Strike 1038 MOTION for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation re 785 Order, Samsung's Administrative Motion for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/12/2013) Modified text on 12/13/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2013 1054 Minute Entry: Hearing held re: Order Setting Meet and Confer (In Re: Docket No. 1051 ) on 12/12/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Counsel meet and confer. Counsel report to the court what issues were resolved during meet and confer. Counsel to submit table outlining issues resolved and what issues remain outstanding in 4 motions pending before the court by noon of 12/13/2013. (Court Reporter FTR: (8:30 to 8:31; 12:18 to 12:32) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 1051 Order Meet and Confer set for 12/12/2013 at 8:30 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 1053 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1047 Order Joint Submission of Chart Identifying Theories Challenged in the Parties' Motions (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 11, 2013 1051 Featured Case ORDER SETTING MEET-AND-CONFER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/11/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 1050 Featured Case ***EFILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. 1051 ***ORDER SETTING MEET-AND-CONFER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 11, 2013. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013) Modified on 12/11/2013 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2013 1049 Proposed Order re 1048 Opposition/Response to Motion, OPPOSITION TO SAMSUNGS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CERTAIN PROVISIONS OF OCTOBER 2, 2013 STIPULATION (DKT. NO. 1038) by Nokia Corporation. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 10, 2013 1048 OPPOSITION to ( 1038 MOTION for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation re 785 Order, Samsung's Administrative Motion for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation ) filed by Nokia Corporation. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 12/10/2013) Modified text on 12/11/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2013 1047 Featured Case ORDER to File Chart. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/10/2013. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 10, 2013 1046 Minute Entry: Motions to Strike (In Re: Docket Nos. 877 -3, 878 -3, 880 -4 and 882 -4) held on 12/10/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. The court takes matters under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter FTR: (9:59 to 12:14.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/10/2013)
December 9, 2013 1052 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/9/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 1045 Featured Case *****FILED IN ERROR WITHOUT JUDGE'S SIGNATURE*****SEE 1052 *****ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1039 Stipulation (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/11/2013 (mpb, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2013 1044 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Anna Bonny Chauvet (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 1043 Proposed Order re 1041 MOTION to Strike 1038 MOTION for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation re 785 Order, Samsung's Administrative Motion for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation by Nokia Corporation. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 1042 Declaration of RYAN W. KOPPELMAN in Support of 1041 MOTION to Strike 1038 MOTION for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation re 785 Order, Samsung's Administrative Motion for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation filed byNokia Corporation. (Related document(s) 1041 ) (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 1041 MOTION to Strike 1038 MOTION for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation re 785 Order, Samsung's Administrative Motion for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation filed by Nokia Corporation. Responses due by 12/23/2013. Replies due by 12/30/2013. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 1040 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING LOCATION FOR HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 12, 2013. THIS MATTER WILL BE HEARD IN COURTROOM 1 ON THE 5TH FLOOR. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 1039 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Permitting Use of Equipment in the Courtroom filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 6, 2013 1038 MOTION for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation re 785 Order, Samsung's Administrative Motion for Relief from Certain Provisions of October 2, 2013 Stipulation filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 12/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel C. Posner in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion for Relief, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion for Relief)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 1037 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 1035 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 5, 2013 1036 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 1035 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Declaration of Third Party T-Mobile filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 1034 NOTICE by Novell, Inc. of Withdrawal of Declaration of Bradley O. Haque of Third-Party Novell, Inc., Pursuant to L.R. 79-5(d)(1)(A) In Support of Apple, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Brennan, Sterling) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 1033 Declaration of Brett E. Bachtell (Qualcomm) in Support of 1017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents 877 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1017 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 3, 2013 1032 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1027 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 2, 2013 1031 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Previously Undisclosed Theories (Dkt. 880) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Submission of Highlighted Exhibits In Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Previously Undisclosed Theories [Dkt. 880], # 2 Unredacted Version of Exhibits 10-16, 27-28)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 1030 Declaration of Daniel W. Shim in Support of 1017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents 877 , 1011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents) Declaration of Daniel W. Shim in Support of Apple's Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1017 , 1011 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 1029 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 1018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Previously Undisclosed Theories, 1011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1018 , 1011 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 1028 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 1017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents 877 filed byIntel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1017 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 1027 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Authenticity of Documents filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 1026 Declaration of Microsoft Corporation in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to Seal Certain Submissions Containing Highly Confidential Microsoft Information filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 1025 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1009 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions (Dkt. 878) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 1024 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1009 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions (Dkt. 878) filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1009 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 27, 2013 1023 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1009 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions (Dkt. 878) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 1022 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1009 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions (Dkt. 878) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 1021 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents 877 Certificate of Service upon Qualcomm Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 1020 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents 877 Certificate of Service upon Intel Corporation (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 26, 2013 1019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents 877 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Previously Undisclosed Theories filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 3 Redacted Version of Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Previously Undisclosed Theories, # 4 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Previously Undisclosed Theories, # 5 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Previously Undisclosed Theories, # 6 Exhibits 1, 6, 8, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibits 2-5, 7, 9-10, # 8 Declaration of Daniel Wooseob Shim In Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents 877 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Redacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, # 3 Unredacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 11, # 17 12, # 18 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1016 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) of Manual Filing of Exhibit 52 to the Reply Declaration of Joshua L. Furman In Support of Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1015 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents) upon Lars Frid-Nielsen (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1014 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents) upon Google Inc. (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1013 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents) upon Novell, Inc. (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1012 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents) upon Microsoft Corporation (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emily L. Fedman In Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version - Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents, # 4 Declaration of Joshua Furman In Support of Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents, # 5 Exhibit 44,45,46,52, and 53 to Furman Declaration, # 6 Unredacted version - Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents, # 7 Exhibit 47-51 to Furman Declaration)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1009 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions (Dkt. 878) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1009 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions 878 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Samsung's Reply, # 4 Unredacted Samsung's Reply (Highlighted), # 5 Unredacted Samsung's Reply (Unhighlighted), # 6 Ducca Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Unredacted Exhibit 2, # 9 Unredacted Exhibit 3)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/26/2013) Modified on 12/2/2013 linking entry to document #878 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2013 1008 Declaration of Michael C. Barrett (Cirrus Logic, Inc.) in Support of 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 963 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1007 Declaration of Michael Hayes Freeman in Support of 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 965 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1006 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1005 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 1005 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25D9KCDA.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/25/13 filed by Ericsson Inc.. (Callahan, Steven) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 25, 2013 1004 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1003 Declaration in Support, (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 1003 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 963 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 1002 Declaration of Emily L. Fedman in Support of 962 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 962 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 1001 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 964 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 962 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 964 , 962 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 1000 Declaration of Daniel W. Shim in Support of 985 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos and Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ], 964 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 989 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Exhibits to Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike (filed as D.I. 964) Declaration of Daniel W. Shim in Support of Apple's Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 985 , 965 , 964 , 989 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 999 Declaration of Paula M. Phillips in Support of 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byAT&T Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 963 ) (Cadwell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 998 Declaration of William J. Harmon in Support of 964 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 962 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 964 , 962 ) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 997 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] filed byIntel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 965 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 996 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byIntel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 963 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 995 Declaration of John Kolakowski (Nokia Solutions and Networks) in Support of 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 965 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 994 Brief re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] filed byEricsson Inc.. (Related document(s) 965 ) (Adams, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 993 Declaration of Paula M. Phillips (AT&T Services) in Support of 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 965 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 23, 2013 992 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Correction of Exhibit In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike [Docket No. 962-11], # 2 Unredacted Corrected Version of Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike [Docket No. 962-11])(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/23/2013)
November 22, 2013 991 Declaration of Alex Yip (Alcatel-Lucent) in Support of 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 965 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 21, 2013 990 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] upon AT&T Services (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 21, 2013 989 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Exhibits to Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike (filed as D.I. 964) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Correction of Exhibits Filed in support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike regarding Apple Patents, # 2 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Corrected Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Corrected Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Corrected Exhibit N)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 21, 2013 988 Declaration of Brett E. Bachtell (Qualcomm) in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 878 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 20, 2013 987 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] upon Alcatel-Lucent (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 986 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 985 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos and Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 985 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos and Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos and Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, # 2 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 984 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 964 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal upon Google (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 983 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 964 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal upon Oracle (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 982 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 964 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal upon Microsoft (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 981 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 978 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Corrected Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 980 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 962 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 979 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 962 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 978 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Corrected Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Correction of Unredacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Infringement Reports, # 2 Unredacted and Highlighted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 977 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 976 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] upon VOCI (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 975 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] upon T-Mobile (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 974 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] upon Qualcomm (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 973 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] upon Zachary Piech (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 972 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] upon Intel (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 971 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] upon Ericsson (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 970 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] upon Harry Nick Carter (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 969 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 968 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 967 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 966 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 19, 2013 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike [ 878 ] filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Motion to Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 4 Unredacted Version of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 5 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, # 15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 17 Redacted Version of Exhibit 9, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, # 19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, # 20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, # 21 Exhibit 12, # 22 Exhibit 13, # 23 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, # 24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, # 25 Exhibit 15, # 26 Redacted Version of Exhibit 16, # 27 Unedacted Version of Exhibit 16)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 964 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Samuel K. Whitt In Support of Apple's Motion to File Documents Under Seal Relating to Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Regarding Apple Patents (D.I. 880), # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Strike Regarding Apple Patents (D.I. 880), # 3 Exhibit Rho Exhibits A-D, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits E-F, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits G, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits I, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits J, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits K, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits L, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits M, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits N, # 12 Exhibit Rho Exhibits O, # 13 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits P, # 14 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits R, # 15 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits S, # 16 Exhibit Redacted Version Rho Exhibit S, # 17 Exhibit Unredacted version Rho Exhibits T, # 18 Exhibit Rho Exhibits U-V, # 19 Exhibit Rho Exhibits W, # 20 Exhibit Rho Exhibits X, # 21 Exhibit Rho Exhibits Y, # 22 Exhibit Rho Exhibits AA, # 23 Exhibit Rho Exhibits BB-GG, # 24 Redacted Opposition to DI 880, # 25 Unredacted Opposition to DI 880, # 26 Proposed Order)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/19/2013) Modified on 11/20/2013 PURSUANT TO COUNSEL'S REQUEST, ATTACHMENTS 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10 AND 11 LOCKED (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2013 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Samuel Drezdzon in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted and Unhighlighted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, # 4 Declaration of Samuel Drezdzon in Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, # 5 Proposed Order Denying Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Redacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, # 20 Unredacted and Highlighted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Reports Regarding Samsung Patents)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 962 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 3 Redacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents, # 4 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments From Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Apple Patents, # 5 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike, # 6 Exhibit 5, 8, 12-16, # 7 Exhibit 17-18, # 8 Exhibit 20-23, 25-27, 29-30, # 9 Exhibit 32-35, 41-43, 44, 49-52, 55, # 10 Unredacted Versions of Exhibit 1-4, # 11 Unredacted Versions of Exhibit 6-7, 9-11, 19, 24, 28, # 12 Unredacted Versions of Exhibit 31, 36-40, 42, # 13 Unredacted Versions of Exhibit 45-48, 53-54, # 14 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike, # 15 Declaration of Daniel Wooseob Shim In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 961 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Michelle Borden (Borden, Kara) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 18, 2013 960 Declaration of Daniel W. Shim in Support of 945 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Motion To Exclude Certain Unreliable And Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony), 944 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 945 , 944 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 959 RESPONSE (re 948 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts ) Third Parties HTC America, Inc., and HTC Corporation's Response to Samsung's Motion to Seal (Docket No. 948) filed byHTC America Inc, HTC Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Scott R. Mosko, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 958 RESPONSE (re 945 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Motion To Exclude Certain Unreliable And Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony) ) Third Parties HTC America, Inc., and HTC Corporation's Response to Apple's Motion to Seal (Docket No. 945) filed byHTC America Inc, HTC Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 957 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 944 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 944 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 956 Declaration of William J. Harmon in Support of 946 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 946 ) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 955 Declaration of Emily L. Fedman in Support of 948 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, 946 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 948 , 946 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 954 Declaration of Oracle America, Inc. in Support of 944 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 944 ) (Hutchins, Eric) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 953 Appendix re 855 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Documents In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Attachments: Redacted Version of Declaration of Dr. Kevin Jeffay [Appendix 1 to the Declaration of Martin Rinard In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 855-6 through 855-7)] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 855 ) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 952 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 946 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 951 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 944 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) Notice of Manual Filing Exhibit D-7 (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 950 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 944 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 14, 2013 949 Declaration in Support of 948 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, 946 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Consolidated Declaration of Daniel Wooseob Shim in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 948 , 946 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 948 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Public Redacted Version of Samsung's Reply, # 4 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Reply, # 5 Unredacted and Unhighlighted Version of Samsung's Reply, # 6 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Reply, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 10 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, # 15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # 17 Exhibit I, # 18 Exhibit J, # 19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit K, # 20 Exhibit L, # 21 Exhibit M, # 22 Exhibit N, # 23 Exhibit O, # 24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit P, # 25 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q, # 26 Exhibit R, # 27 Exhibit S, # 28 Exhibit T)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 947 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 945 by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) upon HTC Corporation (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/14/2013) Modified on 11/19/2013 linking entry to document #945(dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2013 946 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 3 Redacted Version of Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Supplemental Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Unredacted Exhibits 1-3, 11-13)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 945 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Motion To Exclude Certain Unreliable And Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Casey McCracken In Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted version - Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony, # 4 Redacted version - Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony, # 5 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn In Support of Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Motion To Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted version - B-11, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted version - B-12, # 8 Exhibit C-7, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted version - C-8, # 10 Exhibit C-9, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted version - C-10, # 12 Exhibit Redacted version - C-10, # 13 Exhibit Unredacted version - C-11, # 14 Exhibit Redacted version - C-11, # 15 Exhibit Unredacted version - C-12, # 16 Exhibit Redacted version - C-12)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 944 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emily L. Fedman In Support of Apple's Motion to File Documents Under Seal Relating to Apple's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version Apple's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Redacted Version Apple's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 5 Declaration Reply Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Appl's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 6 Unredacted version B-7, # 7 Unredacted version C-7, # 8 Unredacted version C-8, # 9 Unredacted version C-9, # 10 Unredacted version C-10, # 11 D-7, # 12 D-8, # 13 D-9, # 14 Unredacted version D-10, # 15 Unredacted version D-11, # 16 Unredacted version E-10)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 943 Supplemental Brief re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 926 Brief NON-PARTY ERICSSON INC.S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF SAMSUNG'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed byEricsson Inc.. (Related document(s) 878 , 926 ) (Adams, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 942 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M Adams (Adams, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 941 Declaration of Alex Yip (Alcatel-Lucent) in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 878 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 12, 2013 940 Declaration of Daniel Shim in Support of 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, 882 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports, 890 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 877 , 882 , 890 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 939 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 880 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 882 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 880 , 882 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 938 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 936 Declaration in Support (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 937 Declaration of Emily L. Fedman in Support of 880 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based On Previously Undisclosed Theories filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 880 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 936 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 878 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 935 RESPONSE (re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) T-Mobile's Response to Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elana Matt, # 2 Declaration of John Kolakowski)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 934 Declaration of Brett E. Bachtell (Qualcomm Inc.) in Support of 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 877 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 933 Declaration of William J. Harmon in Support of 880 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 880 , 878 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 932 Declaration of Michael C. Barrett (Cirrus Logic, Inc.) in Support of 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 877 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 931 Declaration of Paula M. Phillips (AT&T Services Inc.) in Support of 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 877 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 930 Declaration of Alex Yip (Alcatel-Lucent) in Support of 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 877 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 929 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byIntel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 878 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 928 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byIntel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 877 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 927 Declaration of Brett Bachtell (Qualcomm) in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 878 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 926 Brief re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEricsson Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Billy Hogan)(Related document(s) 878 ) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 925 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtland Lewis Reichman (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 924 Declaration of Non-Party Broadcom Corporation in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byBroadcom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Non-Party Broadcom Corporation)(Related document(s) 878 ) (McFarland, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 923 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lee McFarland Counsel for Non-Party Broadcom Corporation (McFarland, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 922 Declaration of Michael C. Barrett (Cirrus Logic, Inc.) in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 878 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 921 Declaration of Michael Hayes Freeman (VOCI) in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 878 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 920 Declaration of Bradley O. Haque in Support of 882 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports filed byNovell, Inc.. (Related document(s) 882 ) (Brennan, Sterling) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 11, 2013 919 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Corrected Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment and Ex. B-9 to Furman Declaration (D.I. 853) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Correction of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment and Ex. B-9, # 2 REDACTED version of Apple's Corrected Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 UNREDACTED version of Apple's Corrected Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 UNREDACTED version of Corrected Ex. B-9 to Furman Declaration)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
November 11, 2013 918 Declaration of Paula M. Phillips in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAT&T Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 878 ) (Cadwell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
November 11, 2013 917 Declaration of Bruce Barker in Support of 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOmniVision Technologies Inc.. (Related document(s) 878 ) (Barker, Bruce) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
November 8, 2013 916 Declaration in Support of 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed byOmniVision Technologies Inc.. (Related document(s) 877 ) (Barker, Bruce) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 6, 2013 915 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 914 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 913 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 912 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 911 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 910 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 909 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 908 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 907 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 906 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 905 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 904 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 903 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 902 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 901 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 878 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Horniak, David) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 linking entry to document #878 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 900 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 899 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 898 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 897 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 896 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 895 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re 855 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Documents In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Attachments: Redacted Version of Declaration of Dr. Kevin Jeffay (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 894 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 882 (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 linking entry to document #882 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 893 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 890 (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 linking entry to document #890 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 892 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 882 (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 linking entry to document #882 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 891 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 882 (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 linking entry to document #882 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 890 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Corrected Declaration of Emily Fedman In Support of Apple's Motion to File Documents Relating to Its Motion to Strike Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 889 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents Certificate of Service Upon T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 5, 2013 Set Hearing as to 877 -3, 878 -3, 880 -4 and 882 -4: Motions to Strike set for 12/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 888 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents Certificate of Service Upon Qualcomm Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 887 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents Certificate of Service Upon Omnivision (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 886 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents Certificate of Service Upon Intel Corporation (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 885 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents Certificate of Service Upon Cirrus Logic (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 884 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents Certificate of Service Upon AT&T Services Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 883 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Certificate of Service Upon Alcatel-Lucent (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 882 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringement Expert Reports filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Emily Fedman In Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted version-Apple's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Invalidity and Non-Infringment Expert Reports, # 4 Redacted Version-Apple's, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Declaration of Joshua Furman In Support of Apple's Motion to Strike, # 7 Exhibit Furman Ex 1, # 8 Exhibit Furman Ex 2, # 9 Exhibit Furman Ex 3, # 10 Exhibit Furman Ex 4, # 11 Exhibit Furman Ex 5, # 12 Exhibit Furman Ex 6, # 13 Exhibit Furman Ex 7, # 14 Exhibit Furman Ex 8, # 15 Exhibit Furman Ex 9, # 16 Exhibit Furman Ex 10, # 17 Exhibit Furman Ex 11, # 18 Exhibit Furman Ex 12, # 19 Exhibit Furman Ex 13, # 20 Exhibit Furman Ex 14, # 21 Exhibit Furman Ex 15, # 22 Exhibit Furman Ex 16, # 23 Exhibit Furman Ex 17, # 24 Exhibit Furman Ex 18, # 25 Exhibit Furman Ex 19, # 26 Exhibit Furman Ex 20, # 27 Exhibit Furman Ex 21, # 28 Exhibit Furman Ex 22, # 29 Exhibit Furman Ex 23, # 30 Exhibit Furman Ex 24, # 31 Exhibit Furman Ex 25, # 32 Exhibit Furman Ex 26, # 33 Exhibit Unredacted Furman Ex 27, # 34 Exhibit Redacted version Furman Ex 27, # 35 Exhibit Furman Ex 29, # 36 Furman Ex 30, # 37 Furman Ex 31, # 38 Furman Ex 32, # 39 Furman Ex 33, # 40 Furman Ex 34, # 41 Furman Ex 35, # 42 Furman Ex 36, # 43 Furman Ex 37, # 44 Furman Ex 38, # 45 Furman Ex 39, # 46 Furman Ex 40, # 47 Furman Ex 41, # 48 Furman Ex 42, # 49 Furman Ex 43, # 50 Redacted version-Furman Ex 28, # 51 Unredacted version-Furman Ex 28)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/5/2013) Modified on 11/6/2013 sealinging attachment #18 pursuant to counsel's request (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2013 881 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories on Claim Constructions Inconsistent with the Court's Markman Order (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 880 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 2 Declaration of Daniel Shim Wooseob In Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 3 [Proposed] Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion, # 4 Redacted Version of Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Previously Undisclosed Theories, # 5 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Previously Undisclosed Theories, # 6 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 18, # 15 Exhibit 22, # 16 Exhibit 24, # 17 Exhibit 25, # 18 Exhibit 26, # 19 Exhibit 30, # 20 Exhibit 32, # 21 Unredacted Exhibits 8-15, # 22 Unredacted Exhibits 16-17, 19-21, 23, 27-29, 31, 33-34, # 23 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Strike)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 879 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Briggs in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions Inconsistent with the Court's Markman Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, # 4 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions Inconsistent with the Court's Markman Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, # 5 Unredacted and Unhighlighted Version of Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions Inconsistent with the Court's Markman Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7 (Part 1), # 13 Exhibit 7 (Part 2), # 14 Exhibit 8 (Part 1), # 15 Exhibit 8 (Part 2), # 16 Exhibit 9, # 17 Exhibit 10, # 18 Exhibit 11, # 19 Exhibit 12, # 20 Exhibit 13, # 21 Declaration of Briggs in Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions Inconsistent with the Court's Markman Order, # 22 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Theories and Claim Constructions Inconsistent with the Court's Markman Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of Apple's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 3 Redacted Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, # 4 Unredacted Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents, # 5 Declaration Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to the Selwyn Declaration, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to the Selwyn Declaration, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C to the Selwyn Declaration, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit D to the Selwyn Declaration, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to the Selwyn Declaration, # 11 Exhibit E to the Selwyn Declaration, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F to the Selwyn Declaration, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G to the Selwyn Declaration, # 14 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Motion to Strike Arguments from Samsung's Infringement Expert Reports Regarding Samsung Patents)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 876 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 859 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal McCracken Declaration and Exhibit In Support of Apple's Opposition to Motion to Exclude, 853 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 857 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude, 856 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Inadmissible Samsung Expert Testimony, 855 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Documents In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Attachments: Redacted Version of Declaration of Dr. Kevin Jeffay, 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 859 , 853 , 857 , 856 , 855 , 854 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 875 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 854 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 874 Declaration of Daniel Shim in Support of 853 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 857 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 853 , 857 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 873 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 872 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in Support of 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 854 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 871 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 856 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Inadmissible Samsung Expert Testimony filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 856 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 870 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 854 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 869 Declaration of Casey J. McCracken in Support of 856 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Inadmissible Samsung Expert Testimony filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 856 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 868 RESPONSE (re 856 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Inadmissible Samsung Expert Testimony ) Third Parties HTC America, Inc., and HTC Corporation's Response to Samsung's Motion to Seal filed byHTC America Inc, HTC Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Scott R. Mosko on Behalf of Third Parties HTC America, Inc., and HTC Corporation's Response to Samsung's Motion to Seal (Docket No. 856), # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 867 RESPONSE (re 857 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude ) Third Parties HTC America, Inc., and HTC Corporation's Response to Apple's Motion to Seal filed byHTC America Inc, HTC Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Scott R. Mosko on Behalf of Third Parties HTC America, Inc., and HTC Corporation's Response to Apple's Motion to Seal (Docket No. 857), # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 866 Declaration of Ulrich Pfeifer in Support of 855 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Documents In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Attachments: Redacted Version of Declaration of Dr. Kevin Jeffay filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 855 ) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 865 Declaration of William J. Harmon in Support of 853 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 853 , 854 ) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 4, 2013 864 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in Support of 852 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Enforce Apple's Compliance With The Court's Order Regarding Case Narrowing filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 852 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 863 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 855 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Documents In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Attachments: Redacted Version of Declaration of Dr. Kevin Jeffay, 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 2, 2013 862 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Ericsson Inc. re 853 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/2/2013) Modified on 11/4/2013 linking entry to document #853 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2013 861 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Microsoft Corporation re 853 (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/2/2013) Modified on 11/4/2013 linking entry to document #853 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2013 860 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) to HTC Corporation re 857 (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/2/2013) Modified on 11/4/2013 linking entry to document #857 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2013 859 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal McCracken Declaration and Exhibit In Support of Apple's Opposition to Motion to Exclude filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted A-3, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted A-4, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted A-5, # 6 Exhibit Unredactred A-6, # 7 Exhibit Unredactred A-7, # 8 Exhibit Unredactred A-8, # 9 Exhibit Unredactred A-10, # 10 Exhibit Unredactred A-11, # 11 Exhibit A-12, # 12 Exhibit A-13, # 13 Exhibit A-14, # 14 Exhibit A-15, # 15 Exhibit A-16, # 16 Exhibit A-17, # 17 Exhibit A-18, # 18 Exhibit A-19, # 19 Exhibit A-20, # 20 Exhibit A-21, # 21 Exhibit A-22, # 22 Exhibit Unredactred B-1, # 23 Exhibit B-2, # 24 Exhibit B-3, # 25 Exhibit C--1, # 26 Exhibit C-2, # 27 Exhibit Unredactred C-3, # 28 Exhibit Unredactred D-1, # 29 Exhibit Redacted D-2, # 30 Exhibit Unredactred D-2, # 31 Exhibit Unredacted D-3, # 32 Exhibit D-4, # 33 Exhibit Unredacted A-9)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/2/2013)
November 1, 2013 858 Declaration of DANIEL WOOSEOB SHIM in Support of 856 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Inadmissible Samsung Expert Testimony, 855 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Documents In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Attachments: Redacted Version of Declaration of Dr. Kevin Jeffay, 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 856 , 855 , 854 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 1, 2013 857 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jordan Bekier In Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Apple's Opposition to Motion to Exclude, # 4 Unredacted version Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 1, 2013 856 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Inadmissible Samsung Expert Testimony filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Exclude, # 4 Redacted Version of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude, # 5 Declaration of Michael Fazio in Support of Samsung's Opposition, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, # 17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J, # 18 Exhibit K, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M, # 21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit P, # 24 Exhibit Q, # 25 Exhibit R, # 26 Exhibit S, # 27 Exhibit T, # 28 Exhibit U, # 29 Exhibit V, # 30 Exhibit W, # 31 Exhibit X, # 32 Exhibit Y, # 33 Exhibit Z, # 34 Exhibit AA, # 35 Exhibit BB, # 36 Exhibit CC, # 37 Exhibit DD, # 38 Exhibit EE, # 39 Exhibit FF, # 40 Exhibit GG, # 41 Exhibit HH, # 42 Unredacted Version of Exhibit II, # 43 Exhibit JJ, # 44 Exhibit KK Part 1, # 45 Exhibit KK Part 2, # 46 Exhibit LL, # 47 Exhibit MM, # 48 Exhibit NN, # 49 Unredacted Version of Exhibit OO, # 50 Exhibit PP, # 51 Exhibit QQ, # 52 Unredacted Version of Exhibit RR, # 53 Unredacted Version of Exhibit SS, # 54 Unredacted Version of Exhibit TT, # 55 Unredacted Version of Exhibit UU, # 56 Unredacted Version of Exhibit VV, # 57 Declaration of Sanjay K. Rao, # 58 Exhibits A-H to the Declaration of Sanjay K. Rao)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 1, 2013 855 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Documents In Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Attachments: Redacted Version of Declaration of Dr. Kevin Jeffay filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Dr. Kevin Jeffay, # 2 Redacted Version of Declaration of Jeffrey S. Chase, # 3 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Jeffrey S. Chase, # 4 Declaration of Paul Westbrook, # 5 Declaration of Dr. Daniel Wigdor, # 6 Redacted Version of Declaration of Martin Rinard (Part 1 of 2), # 7 Redacted Version of Declaration of Martin Rinard (Part 2 of 2), # 8 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Martin Rinard, # 9 Declaration of Ulrich Pfeifer, # 10 Declaration of Professor Norbert Fuhr (Part 1 of 2), # 11 Declaration of Professor Norbert Fuhr (Part 2 of 2), # 12 Redacted Version of Declaration of Professor Dan Schonfeld (Part 1 of 2), # 13 Redacted Version of Declaration of Professor Dan Schonfeld (Part 2 of 2), # 14 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Professor Dan Schonfeld (Part 1 of 3), # 15 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Professor Dan Schonfeld (Part 2 of 3), # 16 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Professor Dan Schonfeld (Part 3 of 3))(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 1, 2013 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsungs Administrative Motion, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Samsungs Administrative Motion, # 3 Redacted Version of Samsungs Opposition to Apples Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Unredacted Version of Samsungs Opposition to Apples Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 5 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsungs Opposition to Apples Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15 - Part 1 of 2, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Part 2 of 2, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 19, # 18 Redacted Version of Exhibit 20, # 19 Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 2 7, 17 18, and 20 21)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 1, 2013 853 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Rho In Support of Apple's Admin Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unredacted version of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Declaration of Joshua Furman In Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted version A-1 to Furman Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted version A2 to Furman Declaration, # 8 Exhibit A-3 to Furman Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted version A-4 to Furman Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted version A-5 to Furman Declaration, # 11 Exhibit B-1 to Furman Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted version B-2 to Furman Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Unredacted version B-3 to Furman Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Unredacted version B-4 to Furman Declaration, # 15 Exhibit B-5 to Furman Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Unredacted version B-6 to Furman Declaration, # 17 Exhibit B-7 to Furman Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Unredacted version B-8 to Furman Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Unredacted version B-9 to Furman Declaration, # 20 Exhibit B-10 to Furman Declaration, # 21 Exhibit B-11 to Furman Declaration, # 22 Exhibit Unredacted version C-1 to Furman Declaration, # 23 Exhibit Unredacted version C-2 to Furman Declaration, # 24 Exhibit C-3 to Furman Declaration, # 25 Exhibit C-4 to Furman Declaration, # 26 Exhibit C-5 to Furman Declaration, # 27 Exhibit Unredacted version D-1 to Furman Declaration, # 28 Exhibit D-2 to Furman Declaration, # 29 Exhibit Unredacted version D-3 to Furman Declaration)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 852 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Enforce Apple's Compliance With The Court's Order Regarding Case Narrowing filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Declaration of Daniel Wooseob Shim In Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 4 Redacted Version of Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Enforce Apple's Compliance With The Court's Order Regarding Case Narrowing, # 5 Unredacted Version of Samsung's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Enforce Apple's Compliance With The Court's Order Regarding Case Narrowing, # 6 Supplemental Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion to Enforce, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 28, 2013 851 Declaration of Brett Bachtell in Support of 841 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Dkt. 660-1 and 660-2 (Samsung's Third Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions) (for non-party Qualcomm) filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) 841 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 850 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 841 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Dkt. 660-1 and 660-2 (Samsung's Third Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions) filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 841 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 25, 2013 849 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re 841 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Dkt. 660-1 and 660-2 (Samsung's Third Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 848 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 834 Stipulation (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 847 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 846 Stipulation (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 24, 2013 846 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Requests for Admission Concerning Authenticity of Documents filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 845 OPPOSITION to ( 804 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Enforce Compliance with the Court's Order Regarding Case Narrowing ) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/24/2013) Modified text on 10/31/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2013 844 Declaration of Christopher L. Kelley in Support of 841 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Dkt. 660-1 and 660-2 (Samsung's Third Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions) filed byIntel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 841 ) (Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 23, 2013 843 EXHIBITS re 841 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Dkt. 660-1 and 660-2 (Samsung's Third Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions) Exhibit A (Part 1) filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 841 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 22, 2013 842 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re 841 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Dkt. 660-1 and 660-2 (Samsung's Third Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 22, 2013 841 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Dkt. 660-1 and 660-2 (Samsung's Third Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions) filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 22, 2013 840 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Bekier (Bekier, Jordan) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 21, 2013 839 Third Parties HTC America, Inc. and HTC Corporation's Civil Local Rule 75-9 Statement Regarding Confidential Information by HTC America Inc, HTC Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko, # 2 Exhibit A to Scott R. Mosko Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Scott R. Mosko Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Scott R. Mosko Declaration)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 10/21/2013) Modified text on 10/29/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2013 838 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Richard Mosko (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 18, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 836 Order on Stipulation Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 837 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 832 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 836 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 835 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 835 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Management Conference Date filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 834 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION OF SYLVIA HALL-ELLIS filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 17, 2013 833 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 804 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Hearing on Samsung's Motion to Enforce Apple's Compliance With The Court's Order Regarding Case Narrowing (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 17, 2013 832 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Gregory H. Lantier ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8086361.) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 831 Notice of Corrected Filing in Support of 806 Apple's Administrative Motion to Seal Its Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samung Expert Testimony filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended, # 2 Unredacted version-Apple's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Samsung Expert Testimony, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit A-3, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit B-1, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit B-2, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit B-3, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit B-4, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit B-7, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit B-8, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit B-10, # 13 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit C-1, # 14 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit C-2, # 15 Exhibit Unredacted version-McCracken Declaration Exhibit C-5)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/16/2013) Modified text on 10/17/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2013 830 Notice of Corrected Filing and Declaration in Support of 803 Apple's Administrative Motion to Seal Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended, # 2 Declaration Jennifer Rho In Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 Unredacted version-Apple's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted version-Cockburn Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted version-Cockburn Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted version-Cockburn Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit A1, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit A2, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit B-1, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit B-2, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit B-3, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit B-4, # 13 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit B-5, # 14 Exhibit Unredacted version--Exhibit C-1, # 15 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit C-2, # 16 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit C-4, # 17 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit C-5, # 18 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit C-6, # 19 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit D-1 (Part 1 of 2), # 20 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit D-1 (Part 2), # 21 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit D-2, # 22 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit E-4, # 23 Exhibit Unredacted version--Exhibit E-5, # 24 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit E-6, # 25 Exhibit Unredacted version-Exhibit E-7)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/16/2013) Modified text on 10/17/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2013 829 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 824 Declaration in Support,, 823 Declaration in Support, 825 Declaration in Support, (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 15, 2013 828 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 827 Declaration in Support, Exhibits A-C (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 827 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 802 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts, 805 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 802 , 805 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 826 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 806 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 808 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 6-20 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 802 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts, 803 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 805 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 806 , 808 , 802 , 803 , 805 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 825 Declaration of Jordan Bekier in Support of 805 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 805 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 824 Declaration of Casey J. McCracken in Support of 807 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts, 802 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 807 , 802 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 823 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in Support of 804 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Samsung's Motion to Enforce Apple's Compliance with the Court's Order Regarding Case Narrowing filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 804 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 822 Declaration of Jae-Hwan Kim in Support of Apple's Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [Dkt. Nos. 800, 801] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 821 Declaration of Daniel W. Shim in Support of 806 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 803 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Consolidated Declaration of Daniel W. Shim in Support of Apple's Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 806 , 803 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 820 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 789 Motion to Stay; denying 790 Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge Grewal's Nondispositive Pretrial Order; finding as moot 800 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 801 Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 819 Declaration of William J. Harmon in Support of 809 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 21-35 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 808 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 6-20 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 805 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 811 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 36-42 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 809 , 808 , 805 , 811 ) (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 818 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Dylan Proctor (Proctor, Brett) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 817 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Peter James Shen (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 816 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Reed Chiate (Chiate, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 14, 2013 815 NOTICE of Appearance by John Steven Gordon (Gordon, John) (Filed on 10/14/2013)
October 14, 2013 814 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Kassabian (Kassabian, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2013)
October 14, 2013 813 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Stone (Stone, Robert) (Filed on 10/14/2013)
October 11, 2013 812 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 809 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 21-35 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 808 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 6-20 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 805 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 811 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 36-42 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 811 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 36-42 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 37, # 2 Exhibit 38, # 3 Exhibit 39, # 4 Exhibit 40, # 5 Exhibit 41, # 6 Exhibit 42, # 7 Exhibit 36, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 42, # 11 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 810 Declaration of Daniel W. Shim in Support of 804 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 802 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts, 805 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 804 , 802 , 805 ) (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 809 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 21-35 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22, # 2 Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit 24, # 4 Exhibit 25, # 5 Exhibit 26, # 6 Exhibit 27, # 7 Exhibit 28, # 8 Exhibit 29, # 9 Exhibit 30, # 10 Exhibit 31, # 11 Exhibit 32, # 12 Exhibit 33, # 13 Exhibit 34, # 14 Exhibit 35, # 15 Exhibit 23, # 16 Exhibit 24, # 17 Exhibit 25, # 18 Exhibit 28, # 19 Exhibit 29, # 20 Exhibit 31, # 21 Exhibit 33, # 22 Exhibit 34, # 23 Exhibit 35)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 808 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 6-20 to the Declaration of Michael L. Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Errata 10, # 5 Exhibit 11, # 6 Exhibit 12, # 7 Exhibit 13, # 8 Exhibit 14, # 9 Exhibit 15, # 10 Exhibit 16, # 11 Exhibit 17, # 12 Exhibit 18, # 13 Exhibit 19, # 14 Exhibit 20, # 15 Exhibit 6, # 16 Exhibit 7, # 17 Exhibit 10, # 18 Exhibit 11, # 19 Exhibit 12, # 20 Exhibit 13, # 21 Exhibit 14, # 22 Exhibit 15, # 23 Exhibit 16, # 24 Supplement 17, # 25 Exhibit 18, # 26 Exhibit 19)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 807 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O, # 2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit P, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit R, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit S, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit T, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit U, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit V, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit W, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit X, # 11 Exhibit Y, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Z, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit AA, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit BB, # 15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit CC, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit DD, # 17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit EE, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit FF, # 19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit GG, # 20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit HH, # 21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit II, # 22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit JJ, # 23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit KK, # 24 Exhibit LL, # 25 Unredacted Version of Exhibit MM, # 26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit NN, # 27 Unredacted Version of Exhibit OO, # 28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit PP, # 29 Unredacted Version of Exhibit QQ Part 1, # 30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit QQ Part 2, # 31 Unredacted Version of Exhibit RR Part 1, # 32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit RR Part 2, # 33 Unredacted Version of Exhibit RR Part 3, # 34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit SS, # 35 Unredacted Version of Exhibit TT, # 36 Redacted Version of Exhibit UU, # 37 Unredacted Version of Exhibit UU, # 38 Unredacted Version of Exhibit VV, # 39 Exhibit WW, # 40 Unredacted Version of Exhibit XX, # 41 Exhibit YY, # 42 Redacted Version of Exhibit ZZ, # 43 Unredacted Version of Exhibit ZZ, # 44 Exhibit Exhibit AAA, # 45 Unredacted Version of Exhibit AAA, # 46 Unredacted Version of Exhibit BBB, # 47 Unredacted Version of Exhibit CCC, # 48 Unredacted Version of Exhibit DDD, # 49 Unredacted Version of Exhibit EEE, # 50 Unredacted Version of Exhibit FFF, # 51 Unredacted Version of Exhibit GGG Part 1, # 52 Unredacted Version of Exhibit GGG Part 2)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 806 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jordan Bekier In Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple's Motion to Exclude Certain Unreliable and Impermissible Expert Testimony, # 4 Declaration of Casey McCracken In Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony, # 5 Proposed Order re Motion to Exclude, # 6 Exhibit A1 - B5 to the Declaration of Casey McCracken, # 7 Exhibit B6 - C2 to the Declaration of Casey McCracken, # 8 Exhibit C3 - C5 to the Declaration of Casey McCracken, # 9 Exhibit C6 - Part 1 to the Declaration of Casey McCracken, # 10 Exhibit C6 - Part 2 to the Declaration of Casey McCracken, # 11 Exhibit C6 - Part 3 to the Declaration of Casey McCracken)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 805 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Seal, # 3 Public Redacted Version of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Sealed Version of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Declaration Declaration of Michael Fazio In Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 1, # 12 Exhibit 2, # 13 Exhibit 4, # 14 Exhibit 5)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 804 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Fazio in support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Apple's Compliance with the Court's Order Regarding Case Narrowing, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Michael Fazio in support of Samsung's Motion to Enforce, # 5 Exhibit #1 to Fazio Declaration, # 6 Exhibit #2 to Fazio Declaration, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit #3, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit #3, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit #4, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit #4, # 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit #5, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit #5, # 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit #6, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit #6, # 15 Redacted Version of Exhibit #7, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit #7, # 17 Redacted Version of Exhibit #8, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit #8, # 19 Redacted Version of Exhibit #9, # 20 Redacted Version of Exhibit #9, # 21 Redacted Version of Exhibit #10, # 22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit #10, # 23 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Enforce)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 803 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos In Support of Admin Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler In Support of Admin Motion to Seal, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Apple Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 6 Declaration Of Andrew Cockburn, # 7 Cockburn 1, # 8 Cockburn 2, # 9 Cockburn 3, # 10 Declaration of Jennifer J. Rho In Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit A1-C6, # 12 Exhibit D1a, # 13 Exhibit D1b, # 14 Exhibit D2-E9)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 802 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Undredacted Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts, # 4 Redacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain Apple Experts, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 10 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, # 17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit K, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Redacted Version of Exhibit M, # 21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M)(Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 801 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Corrected Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal 800 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of Apple's Corrected Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 9, 2013 800 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Filed with Apple Inc.'s Combined Opposition to Samsung's (1) Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge 790 and (2) Emergency Request to Stay 789 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Apple Inc.'s Combined Opposition to Samsung's (1) Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 790) and (2) Emergency Request to Stay, # 2 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 799 Proposed Order re 798 Opposition/Response to Motion, DENYING SAMSUNGS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Nokia Corporation. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 798 RESPONSE Opposing ( 790 MOTION for Relief from Non-dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate re 785 October 2, 2013 Order ) filed by Nokia Corporation. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 10/9/2013) Modified text on 10/10/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2013 797 Proposed Order re 796 Opposition/Response to Motion DENYING SAMSUNGS EMERGENCY MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO STAY OCTOBER 2, 2013 ORDERS by Nokia Corporation. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 796 RESPONSE Opposing (re 789 MOTION to Stay 785 October 2, 2013 Orders ) filed by Nokia Corporation. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 10/9/2013) Modified text on 10/10/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2013 795 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 794 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 8, 2013 794 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Third Party Declarations filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 7, 2013 793 Samsung's Further Reduction of Invalidity References by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Kang, Robert) (Filed on 10/7/2013) Modified text on 10/8/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2013 792 Apple Inc.'s Case Narrowing Identification of Invalidity References/Systems/Combinations by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/7/2013) Modified text on 10/8/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2013 791 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh re 788 Motion to Shorten Time (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 7, 2013 790 MOTION Relief from Non-dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate re 785 Order, Samsung's Motion for Relief from Non-dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 10/9/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Becher, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Relief)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 7, 2013 789 MOTION to Stay re 785 Order, Samsung's Emergency Admin. Motion to Stay filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 10/7/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Becher, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 7, 2013 788 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing re 1. Samsung's Emergency Motion to Stay and 2. Samsung's Motion for Relief from Non-dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Becher, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 4, 2013 787 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation) Samsung's October 4, 2013 Case Narrowing Statement (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 786 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Apple Inc.'s Additional Submission on Case Narrowing Pursuant to Court Order of April 24, 2013 (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 2, 2013 785 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION re 768 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 2, 2013. (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 2, 2013 784 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 783 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 783 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENTATION OF INTERROGATORY RESPONSES filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 30, 2013 782 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Louis Fazio of Susan R. Estrich (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 30, 2013 781 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Louis Fazio of Robert J. Becher (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 30, 2013 780 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Louis Fazio of Michael T. Zeller (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 30, 2013 779 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Louis Fazio of Daniel C. Posner (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 25, 2013 778 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 775 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 777 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 776 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 24, 2013 776 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Swedlow ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25CGDVB0.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/24/2013 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Swedlow, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 775 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Amendment of Case Schedule filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Regarding Amendment of Case Schedule)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 19, 2013 774 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan W. Koppelman OF RANDALL L. ALLEN FOR NON-PARTY NOKIA CORPORATION (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 18, 2013 773 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan W. Koppelman OF PATRICK J. FLINN FOR NON-PARTY NOKIA CORPORATION (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 18, 2013 772 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan W. Koppelman FOR NON-PARTY NOKIA CORPORATION (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 18, 2013 771 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING SEPTEMBER 20, 2013 HEARING (In Re: Docket Nos. 741 and 742 ). ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 18, 2013 770 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 769 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 17, 2013 769 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 746 Order on Stipulation Regarding Requests for Admission Concerning Authenticity of Documents and Supplementation of Interrogatory Responses filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 16, 2013 768 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Samsung's Notice of Withdrawal of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. No. 741) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 15, 2013 767 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 766 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion Related to September 20, 2013 Hearing (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/15/2013)
September 15, 2013 766 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion Related to September 20, 2013 Hearing filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph Mueller in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/15/2013)
September 12, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 765 : Hearing (In Re: Docket Nos. 741 and 742 set for 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 12, 2013 765 Featured Case ORDER RE: HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal setting hearing for 741 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; and 742 Stipulation (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 9, 2013 764 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 763 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 763 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Claims filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 4, 2013 762 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 706 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 761 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 642 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 760 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 635 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 759 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 606 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 758 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 600 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 757 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 597 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 756 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 530 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 755 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 518 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 754 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 589 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 753 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 588 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 3, 2013 752 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 751 Stipulation (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013) Modified on 9/4/2013 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2013 751 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/2/2013)
August 28, 2013 750 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-31-13, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (Related documents(s) 733 ) (las, ) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 23, 2013 ***SET IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD***Set Hearing: Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Discovery and for Sanctions for Violations of Protective Order (In Re: Docket No. 2374-2) set for 10/1/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013) Modified on 8/26/2013 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2013 749 Declaration of Jae-Hwan Kim in Support of 738 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 738 ) (Fazio, Michael) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 22, 2013 748 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 318 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. See Docket No. 329. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 22, 2013 747 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/13/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2013. (Related documents(s) 734 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 21, 2013 746 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 745 Stipulation Regarding Requests for Admission Concerning Authenticity of Documents.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 20, 2013 745 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extension of Authenticity of Documents filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 19, 2013 744 RESPONSE to ( 738 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) SAMSUNG'S RESPONSE TO APPLE'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY NOKIA CORPORATION filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/19/2013) Modified text on 8/20/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2013 743 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Response to Apple's Notice of Joinder filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jae-Hwan Kim, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 18, 2013 742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY NOKIA CORPORATION (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/18/2013)
August 18, 2013 741 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jae-Hwan Kim In Support of SAdministrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/18/2013)
August 18, 2013 740 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 742 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/18/2013) Modified on 8/19/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2013 739 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 738 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 16, 2013 738 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 14, 2013 737 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO ENFORCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 736 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 735 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 734 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 733 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 732 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 731 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 726 Stipulation (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 730 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY NOKIA CORPORATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 724 Stipulation (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 13, 2013 729 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of 721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Financial Documents filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 721 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 728 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/13/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 669 Samsung's Motion to Compel: Mr. Lyon moves to seal the courtroom; no opposition by Mr. Fazio. The court denies Mr. Lyon's request to seal the courtroom. Counsel present oral arguments. The court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 727 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 725 Stipulation Dismissing Claims Without Prejudice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 726 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time to Conduct Deposition filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 12, 2013 725 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Claims Without Prejudice filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 12, 2013 724 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule for Motion for Protective Order by Nokia Corporation (Docket No. 647) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 7, 2013 723 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Continuing 718 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Intel, or in the Alternative, a Declaration, Regarding Authentication of Documents from Intel Corporation: Due to the court's unavailability, 9/10/2013 Motion Hearing is continued to 10/1/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 6, 2013 722 NOTICE Regarding Exhibits to the Declaration of Amar L. Thakur in Support of Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and to Enforce April 12, 2013 Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/6/2013) Modified on 8/7/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2013 721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Financial Documents filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 720 REPLY in Support of Its Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents (re 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael L. Fazio, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/6/2013) Modified text on 8/7/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2013 718 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Intel, or in the Alternative, a Declaration, Regarding Autentication of Documents from Intel Corporation filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/19/2013. Replies due by 8/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Amar L Thakur ISO Samsungs MTC Deposition Testimony of Intel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/5/2013) Modified text on 8/6/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2013 717 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony From Intel, and Exhibits Thereto filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 716 NOTICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Anna Tin-Yee Lee (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 2, 2013 715 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF PATENTS, CLAIMS, AND ACCUSED PRODUCTS by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 2, 2013 714 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Samsung's Notice of Dismissal of Patents, Claims and Accused Products by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 31, 2013 719 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2013 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 7/31/2013), Further Case Management Conference held on 7/31/2013 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 7/31/2013). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 713 Order, Further Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 713 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; ORDER DENYING SAMSUNGS MOTION TO AMEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS ANSWER TO APPLES COUNTERCLAIMS IN REPLY; ORDER DENYING SAMSUNGS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/31/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 30, 2013 712 Declaration of Rod Stone in Support of 711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and to Enforce the April 12, 2013 Order Corrected Declaration of Rod Stone In Support of Apple's Opposition (Document 711-6) filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4 to the Declaration of Rod Stone)(Related document(s) 711 ) (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 30, 2013 711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and to Enforce the April 12, 2013 Order filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Buckley In Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Declaration of Shannon Mader In Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Apple's Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and to Enforce the April 12, 2013 Order, # 5 Declaration of Mark Buckley In Support of Apple's Opposition, # 6 Declaration of Rod Stone In Support of Apple's Opposition, # 7 Exhibit 1-4 to the Declaration of Rod Stone)(Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 29, 2013 710 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO CONDUCT DEPOSITIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 707 Stipulation (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 29, 2013 709 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 704 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Motion to Quash Apple's Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Testimony (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 29, 2013 708 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Supplemental Case Management Conference Statement filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 29, 2013 707 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extension of Time to Conduct Depositions filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 25, 2013 706 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Steven S. Kim ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7875790.) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Supplement New York Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kim, Steven) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 24, 2013 705 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Authenticity of Source Code filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 704 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 703 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 700 Stipulation (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 702 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 689 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Response to Interrogatory No. 32 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Non-Party Declaration of Susan Sweeney in Support of Sealing Exhibit 37 to Samsung's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Response to Interrogatory No. 32, # 4 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 689 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 701 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re [614-3] Google's Motion to Quash Subpoenas: Motion not heard. A further stipulated request to withdraw Google's Motion to Quash in its entirety previously filed. The court expresses its concern over Google's request to seal case citations. Counsel for Google states requests were erroneously submitted. (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 700 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 699 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Withdrawal of Google's Motion to Quash Apple's Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Testimony Revised Stipulation Regarding Withdrawal of Google's Motion to Quash Apple's Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Testimony filed by Google Inc.. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 22, 2013 699 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Withdrawal of Google's Motion to Quash Apple's Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Testimony filed by Google Inc.. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 22, 2013 698 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 697 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 22, 2013 697 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Stipulation and Proposed Order Modifying Briefing Schedule For Motion For Protectice Order By Nokia Corporation filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 22, 2013