Vasquez v. Lewis

Petitioner: Joel Jesse Vasquez
Respondent: G. D. Lewis
Case Number: 5:2012cv03157
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Del Norte
Referring Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
August 14, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/14/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/14/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
October 4, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Answer due by 1/4/2013.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/3/12. (Attachments: # 1 cert of service)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
January 10, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Application for Enlargement of Time to File Answer (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joel Jesse Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G. D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.