Dunbar v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Keith Dunbar
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv03305
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 304 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part (44) Motion to Dismiss (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
August 23, 2013 303 EXHIBITS re 292 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,, Exhibits A-1, A-2, A-4, A-5, A-8, A-9, A-10, A-19, and H to Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Conditionally File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Related document(s) 292 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 302 EXHIBITS re 292 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,, 301 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,,,,,, Exhibits A-3, A-6, A-7, A-11, A-12, A-13, A-14, A-15, A-16, A-17, A-18, A-20, and G to Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Conditionally File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order REDACTED filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Related document(s) 292 , 301 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 301 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 292 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,, Exhibits A-3, A-6, A-7, A-11, A-12, A-13, A-14, A-15, A-16, A-17, A-18, A-20, and G to Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Conditionally File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order Part 1 by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-3, A-6, A-7, A-11, A-12, A-13, A-14, A-15, A-16, A-17, A-18, A-20, and G to Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Conditionally File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order - Part 2, # 2 Exhibit A-3, A-6, A-7, A-11, A-12, A-13, A-14, A-15, A-16, A-17, A-18, A-20, and G to Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Conditionally File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order - Part 3, # 3 Exhibit A-3, A-6, A-7, A-11, A-12, A-13, A-14, A-15, A-16, A-17, A-18, A-20, and G to Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Conditionally File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order - Part 4, # 4 Exhibit A-3, A-6, A-7, A-11, A-12, A-13, A-14, A-15, A-16, A-17, A-18, A-20, and G to Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Conditionally File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order - Part 5, # 5 Exhibit B, C, and D to Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Conditionally File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 300 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce the Court's January 8, 2013 Discovery Order 244 re 299 Document E-Filed Under Seal, 292 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, REDACTED filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) REDACTED - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) REDACTED - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) REDACTED - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) REDACTED - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) REDACTED - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) REDACTED - Part 6)(Related document(s) 299 , 292 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/23/2013) Modified text on 8/27/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2013 299 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 292 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,, Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A, B, C, E, F, G and N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) - Part 6, # 7 Exhibit I, J, K, L and M to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce the Courts January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244))(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 298 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses re 292 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 297 Document E-Filed Under Seal,Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zohair Hyder in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 3 Exhibit F to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 4 Exhibit G to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 5 Exhibit I to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 6 Exhibit J to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 7 Exhibit M to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 8 Exhibit N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 9 Exhibit P to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 10 Exhibit U to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED)(Related document(s) 292 , 297 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/23/2013) Modified text on 8/26/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2013 297 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 292 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,, Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zohair Hyder in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 3 Exhibit F to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 4 Exhibit G to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 5 Exhibit I to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 6 Exhibit J to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 7 Exhibit M to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 8 Exhibit N to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 9 Exhibit P to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 10 Exhibit U to Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 296 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses re 295 Document E-Filed Under Seal, 292 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses REDACTED - Part 3)(Related document(s) 295 , 292 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/23/2013) Modified text on 8/26/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2013 295 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 292 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 3 Exhibit B, C, D and E to Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 19, 2013 294 EXHIBITS re 293 Document E-Filed Under Seal, 290 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, EXHIBIT A To The Declaration Of Deepak Jindal In Support Of Defendant Google Inc.s Administrative Motion To File Documents And Portions Of Documents Under Seal [REDACTED] filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B to Jindal Decl [REDACTED], # 2 Exhibit D to Jindal Decl [REDACTED], # 3 Exhibit E to Jindal Decl [REDACTED], # 4 Exhibit F to Jindal Decl [REDACTED])(Related document(s) 293 , 290 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 293 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 290 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, EXHIBIT A To The Declaration Of Deepak Jindal In Support Of Defendant Google Inc.s Administrative Motion To File Documents And Portions Of Documents Under Seal by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 18, 2013 292 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2013)
August 16, 2013 291 Featured Case *** ORDER FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. THE COURT TO ISSUE SUBSEQUENT ORDER *** ORDER DENYING 254 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Because the designating party did not file any timely responsive declaration, the document or proposed filing will be made part of the public record. See Civ. L. R. 79-5(d). The moving party shall proceed consistent with Civ. L. R. 79-5(e). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Modified text on 8/16/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2013 290 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
May 8, 2013 289 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh finding as moot 255 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in light of 257 . THIS IS A TEXT ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 24, 2013 288 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kirk J. Wolden (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 23, 2013 287 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Google Inc.s Notice of Withdrawal of Three Motions to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal (Re: Docket Nos. 252, 261, and 276) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 23, 2013 286 NOTICE by Keith Dunbar re 248 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Notice of and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion For Class Certification, 250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exhibit to Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support Thereof, 277 Statement of Recent Decision, 285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Materials, 249 MOTION to Certify Class , 269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Notice of Withdrawal of Pending Motions and Supporting Materials) (Tapley, F.) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 17, 2013 285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Materials filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lutz, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration Tapley, # 4 Exhibit RR, # 5 Exhibit SS, # 6 Exhibit TT)(Tapley, F.) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 16, 2013 284 Status Report Concerning 271 the Court's April 2, 2013 Order by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/16/2013) Modified text on 4/17/2013 doc #271 linked (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 282 Order (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 283 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 281 Motion for Leave to File.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 282 Featured Case ORDER RE: APRIL 18, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 15, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 12, 2013 281 MOTION for Leave to File Supplementary Material (Stipulated) filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and Stipulation)(Lutz, Hirlye) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 10, 2013 280 Joint Status Report in Response to the Court's April 8, 2013 Order by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/10/2013) Modified text on 4/11/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2013 279 Featured Case ORDER RE: MDL PANEL RULING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 8, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 278 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Defendant Google Inc.'s Statement of Recent Decision Relevant to Google's Opposition to Plainitff's Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 261 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 5, 2013 277 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION RELEVANT TO PENDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed by Keith Dunbar. (Related document(s) 269 ) (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 4/5/2013) Modified text on 4/8/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2013 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Reply In Support of its Motion For Class Certification [D269] filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration HAN LEE, # 3 Exhibit A to Han Lee Dec. [REDACTED], # 4 Exhibit B to Han Lee Dec. [REDACTED], # 5 Exhibit C to Han Lee Dec. [REDACTED], # 6 Exhibit D to Han Lee Dec. [REDACTED], # 7 Exhibit E to Han Lee Dec. [REDACTED], # 8 Exhibit F to Han Lee Dec. [REDACTED], # 9 Exhibit G to Han Lee Dec. [REDACTED], # 10 Exhibit H to Han Lee Dec. [REDACTED], # 11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 275 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/02/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2013. (Related documents(s) 274 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 274 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Keith Dunbar for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Tapley, F.) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 273 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google, Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 2, 2013 271 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE re 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce the Court's January 8, 2013 Discovery Order filed by Keith Dunbar. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 2, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
April 2, 2013 270 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 254 : The court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/2/2013)
April 1, 2013 272 Featured Case MDL TRANSFER ORDER: pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in that district. Signed by Judge MDL PANEL on 4/1/2013. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 28, 2013 269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Keith Dunbar(Individually as a representative on behalf of all similarly situated persons). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lutz, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Reply Memorandum (Redacted), # 4 Trial Plan (Redacted), # 5 Declaration Green (Redacted), # 6 Declaration Rommel (Redacted), # 7 Declaration Dunbar, # 8 Declaration Tapley, # 9 Exhibit U (Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit V (Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit W (Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit X, # 13 Exhibit Y (Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit Z (Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit AA (Under Seal), # 16 Exhibit BB (Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit CC (Under Seal), # 18 Exhibit DD (Under Seal), # 19 Exhibit EE (Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit FF, # 21 Exhibit GG Part 1, # 22 Exhibit GG Part 2, # 23 Exhibit HH, # 24 Exhibit II, # 25 Exhibit JJ (Under Seal), # 26 Exhibit KK, # 27 Exhibit LL (Under Seal), # 28 Exhibit MM, # 29 Exhibit NN, # 30 Exhibit OO, # 31 Exhibit PP, # 32 Exhibit QQ)(Tapley, F.) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 14, 2013 268 REPLY (re 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce the Court's January 8, 2013 Discovery Order ) filed byKeith Dunbar. (Tapley, F.) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 8, 2013 267 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Google, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce The Court's January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) Exhibits 1 through 3 - Highlighted Version (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 8, 2013 266 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SUPPORTING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL Exhibits A through H - Highlighted Version (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 7, 2013 265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Google, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce The Court's January 8, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 244) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Han Lee iso Admin Motion to Seal, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Lee Decl - REDACTED, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Lee Decl - REDACTED, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Lee Decl - REDACTED)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 264 EXHIBITS re 263 Declaration in Support,, EXHIBITS AA-GG to Sardo Decl ISO Opp to Class Cert Motion [Opp Brf. - submitted under seal] filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA [main doc] Exh. BB (Attachment 1), # 2 Exhibit CC, # 3 Exhibit DD, # 4 Exhibit EE, # 5 Exhibit FF, # 6 Exhibit GG)(Related document(s) 263 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 263 Declaration of RAY SARDO ISO Opp to Class Cert Motion [Opp Brf. - submitted under seal] filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 262 Declaration of AARON ROTHMAN ISO Opp to Class Cert Motion [Opp Brf. - submitted under seal] filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Rothman Decl ISO Opp to Class Cert Motion [Opp Brf. - submitted under seal])(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SUPPORTING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Han Lee iso Admin Motion To Seal, # 3 Exhibit A to Lee Decl., # 4 Exhibit B to Lee Decl., # 5 Exhibit C to Lee Decl. (Part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit C to Lee Decl. (Part 2 of 2), # 7 Exhibit D to Lee Decl., # 8 Exhibit E to Lee Decl., # 9 Exhibit F to Lee Decl., # 10 Exhibit G to Lee Decl., # 11 Exhibit H to Lee Decl. (Part 1 of 2), # 12 Exhibit H to Lee Decl. (Part 2 of 2))(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 28, 2013 260 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 259 Declaration in Support, Exhibits A through N - Highlighted Version (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 28, 2013 259 Declaration of Han Lee in Support of 258 Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #, [D258-2] filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through N of the Declaration of Han Lee in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #, [258-3])(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/28/2013) Modified on 3/1/2013 linking entry to document #258 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2013 258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal, # 2 Declaration of Han Lee in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit A through N of Declaration of Han Lee in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 26, 2013 257 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 256 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 22, 2013 256 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 255 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Administrative Motion To Extend Page Limits Of Google Inc.s Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 22, 2013 255 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Administrative Motion To Extend Page Limits Of Google Inc.s Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 21, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce the Court's January 8, 2013 Discovery Order: Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 21, 2013 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce the Court's January 8, 2013 Discovery Order filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 4, 2013 253 Declaration in Support of 252 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal Declaration of Deepak Jindal in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 252 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
February 4, 2013 252 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 29, 2013 251 ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM 246 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Amended Counterclaim, by Keith Dunbar. (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 1/29/2013) Modified text on 1/30/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2013 250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exhibit to Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support Thereof filed by Keith Dunbar. (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 28, 2013 249 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Keith Dunbar. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 3/7/2013. Replies due by 3/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sean Rommel in Support Thereof, # 2 Exhibit B to Rommel Declaration, # 3 Exhibit H to Rommel Declaration, # 4 Exhibit I to Rommel Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Q to Rommel Declaration, # 6 Exhibit T-1 to Rommel Declaration, # 7 Exhibit T-2 to Rommel Declaration, # 8 Exhibit T-3 to Rommel Declaration, # 9 Exhibit T-4 to Rommel Declaration, # 10 Exhibit T-5 to Rommel Declaration)(Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 28, 2013 248 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Notice of and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion For Class Certification filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support Thereof, # 2 Proposed Order to Conditionally File Under Seal)(Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 24, 2013 247 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/08/2013, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2013. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 14, 2013 246 Google Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Third COUNTERCLAIM Google Inc.'s Answer and Third Amended Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Complaint against Keith Dunbar byGoogle, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 9, 2013 245 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01-08-13, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2013. (las, ) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 8, 2013 244 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION re 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion, Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Keith Dunbar. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 8, 2013. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 8, 2013 243 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-29-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 8, 2013 242 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/8/2013 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 1/8/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2013)
January 8, 2013 241 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/8/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 215 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Keith Dunbar: The court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2013)
January 4, 2013 240 CLERKS NOTICE CONFIRMING JANUARY 8, 2013 DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEThe case that was scheduled to go to trial before Judge Koh the first week in January has settled. Case Management Conference in this case will proceed on Tuesday, January 8 at 2:00 p.m. ****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY**** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 3, 2013 239 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 237 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
January 2, 2013 238 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 237 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7376624.) filed by Keith Dunbar. (Travis, Christopher) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 28, 2012 236 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 235 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 27, 2012 235 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 21, 2012 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Portions of Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Complaint Under Seal filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian, # 3 Exhibit A to Somvichian Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Somvichian Declaration REDACTED, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 19, 2012 233 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 231 Declaration in Support, 232 Exhibits, A through F (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 19, 2012 232 EXHIBITS re 231 Declaration in Support, Exhibits E and F to Jindal Declaration filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E - Part 2 of 3, # 2 Exhibit E - Part 3 of 3, # 3 Exhibit F - Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit F - Part 2 of 2)(Related document(s) 231 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 19, 2012 231 Declaration in Support of 230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 230 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 19, 2012 230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 18, 2012 229 REPLY (re 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion, Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses ) In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed byKeith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sean Rommel, # 2 Exhibit G to Rommel Declaration, # 3 Exhibit H to Rommel Declaration)(Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 14, 2012 228 AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) against Google, Inc.. Filed byKeith Dunbar. (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 12, 2012 227 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 12, 2012 226 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 205 Motion for Leave to File.(lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 7, 2012 225 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Google Inc.s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, Declaration of Zohair Hyder, and Exhibits to the Declaration of Whitty Somvi, 223 Declaration in Support,, 224 Declaration in Support, (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 7, 2012 224 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of 223 Declaration in Support,, of Google's Brief in Opp. to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit O, # 9 Exhibit Q, # 10 Exhibit R, # 11 Exhibit S, # 12 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) 223 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 7, 2012 223 Declaration of Deepak Jindal in Support of 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Google Inc.s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, Declaration of Zohair Hyder, and Exhibits to the Declaration of Whitty Somvi chian filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 222 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 7, 2012 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Google Inc.s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, Declaration of Zohair Hyder, and Exhibits to the Declaration of Whitty Somvichian filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 30, 2012 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration, and Exhibits in Support of His Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Deepak Jindal in Support of Defendants Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration, and Exhibits ISO His Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 2 Exhibit A to Jindal Declaration - Submitted Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit B to Jindal Declaration - Submitted Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit C to Jindal Declaration - Part 1 of 2 - Submitted Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit C to Jindal Declaration - Part 2 of 2 - Submitted Under Seal, # 6 Proposed Order Allowing Portions Of Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points and Authorities, Declaration, and Exhibits in Support of His Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to be Filed Under Seal)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 29, 2012 220 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/29/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 11/29/2012). Further Case Management Conference continued to 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/29/2012)
November 21, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 215 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses: Deadline to file sealing papers 11/30/2012. Google's deadline to file response to Motion to Compel: 12/7/2012. Plaintiff's deadline to file reply: 12/18/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 219 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 217 Stipulation (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 218 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 16, 2012 217 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion, Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Declaration, Response, and Reply Regarding Plaintiffs Administrative Motion and Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 14, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 215 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses: Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 216 Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden in Support of 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion, Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed byKeith Dunbar. (Related document(s) 215 ) (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion, Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 9, 2012 214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply in Support of His Motion for Leave to Amend and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Sean Rommel filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Allowing Portions of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of His Motion for Leave to File His Third Amended Class Action Complaint to be Filed Under Seal, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Deepak Jindal in Support of Defendants Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of His Motion for Leave to Amend and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Sean Rommel, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Deepak Jindal in Support of Defendants Administrative Motion)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 2, 2012 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kirk J. Wolden, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 19, 2012 212 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/29/2012, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2012. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 19, 2012 211 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File His Third Amended Complaint Proof of Service (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 18, 2012 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File His Third Amended Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Deepak Jindal, # 3 Exhibit A to Jindal Declaration - Opposition Submitted Under Seal, # 4 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian, # 5 Exhibit A to Somvichian Declaration - Submitted Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit B to Somvichian Declaration, # 7 Exhibit C to Somvichian Declaration, # 8 Exhibit D to Somvichian Declaration)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 4, 2012 209 Declaration of Deepak Jindal in Support of 208 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal 205 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint , 204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File his Third Amended Class Action Complaint , 206 Declaration in Support, and the Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley Thereto filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 205 , 204 , 208 , 206 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified text on 9/5/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend and Plaintiff's Proposed Third Amended Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Allowing Portions of Plaintiffs Motion For Leave to File His Third Amended Class Action Complaint to Be Filed Under Seal)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified text on 9/5/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2012 207 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/29/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/30/2012). Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2012)
August 28, 2012 206 Declaration of F. Jerome Tapley in Support of 205 MOTION for Leave to File His Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed byKeith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 205 ) (Tapley, F.) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 28, 2012 205 MOTION for Leave to File His Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tapley, F.) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 28, 2012 204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File his Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tapley, F.) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 28, 2012 203 Certificate of Interested Entities by Keith Dunbar (Tapley, F.) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 28, 2012 202 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 200 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 22, 2012 201 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 200 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Maco Stewart ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7066005.) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 199 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. Defendant Google Inc.s Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 20, 2012 198 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 196 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 197 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 195 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 17, 2012 196 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Hirlye R. "Ryan" Lutz, III ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7054961.) filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Lutz, Hirlye) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 195 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for F. Jerome Tapley ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7054830.) filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Tapley, F.) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 7, 2012 194 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 193 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 6, 2012 193 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for M. Chad Trammell ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7024177.) filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Trammell, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 3, 2012 192 STATUS REPORT Parties Joint Status Report in Response to the Courts July 23, 2012 Order Re Motion To Dismiss [ECF No. 180] by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 2, 2012 191 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 188 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 190 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 187 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 1, 2012 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitty Somvichian Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Google Inc. (Michael G. Rhodes and Whitty Somvichian) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 188 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sean F. Rommel ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7015545.) filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rommel, Sean) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 187 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jim Wyly ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7015479.) filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wyly, James) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 30, 2012 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk J. Wolden of Clifford L. Carter (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk J. Wolden (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 27, 2012 184 NOTICE by Keith Dunbar to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim [ECF No. 120] (Mann, Peter) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 26, 2012 183 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 181 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 182 Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice by Keith Dunbar. (Mann, Peter) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 25, 2012 181 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6998053.) filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mann, Peter) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 23, 2012 180 Featured Case ORDER re 120 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim filed by Keith Dunbar. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
June 27, 2012 179 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 5:10-cv-00194. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 22, 2012 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California San Jose Division per order. (sm, )
June 7, 2012 177 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Schneider: Scheduling Conference held on 6/7/2012. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (lgp, )
June 5, 2012 176 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
June 5, 2012 175 Featured Case ORDER granting 174 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-reply re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer. Sur-replies due by 6/5/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/5/12. (mrm, )
June 1, 2012 174 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 172 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 31, 2012 173 Sealed Document. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan filed by Keith Dunbar Rommel (Rommel, Sean)
May 29, 2012 172 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
May 29, 2012 171 Featured Case ORDER granting 168 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report. Rule 26 Report due by 5/31/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/28/12. (bas)
May 29, 2012 170 Featured Case ORDER granting 169 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 169 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Reply due by 5/29/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/28/12. (bas)
May 24, 2012 169 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 23, 2012 168 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 18, 2012 167 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 166 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Rommel, Sean)
May 17, 2012 166 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 17, 2012 165 Featured Case ORDER granting 164 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer. Responses due by 5/17/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/17/12. (mrm, )
May 16, 2012 164 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 11, 2012 163 Featured Case ORDER granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Responses due by 5/16/2012 Replies due by 5/25/2012.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/11/2012. (sm, )
May 7, 2012 162 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Google's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
April 23, 2012 161 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer.. (Babcock, Charles)
April 20, 2012 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
April 12, 2012 159 Featured Case ORDER TO MEET, REPORT, AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Michael H. Schneider.) Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/11/12. (mrm, )
March 22, 2012 Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven no longer assigned to case. (sm, )
March 22, 2012 158 Featured Case ORDER VACATING 157 REFERRAL OF PRETRIAL MATTERS to Judge Craven. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/22/2012. (sm, )
March 20, 2012 157 Featured Case MISC ORDER 12-1. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider for all further proceedings and referred to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. (REFERRAL TO CRAVEN VACATED PER ORDER) Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/16/12. (mrm, ) Modified on 3/22/2012 (sm, ).
March 16, 2012 156 Sealed ORDER; denying 100 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, denying as moot 122 Plaintiff's Objections to and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Linda S. Mullenix and Linda S. Mullenix as Google's Expert (mrm, )
January 9, 2012 155 Sealed Transcript for Class Certification Hearing dated 12/8/11. (mrm, )
December 8, 2011 154 Class Certification Hearing Exhibit List. (Exhibits in Texarkana vault) (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff Exhibit List)(mrm, )
December 8, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Mediation Conference held on 12/8/2011. (Court Reporter none.) (lfs, )
December 8, 2011 153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Class Certification Hearing held on 12/8/2011. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
December 2, 2011 152 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 120 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
December 2, 2011 151 NOTICE by Keith Dunbar of Counter-Designations (supplemental) (Mann, Peter)
December 2, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #147 Notice submitted by Keith Dunbar. No certificate of servicewas included and there was no signature by atty. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
December 1, 2011 150 Featured Case ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Defendant's Deadline to Designate Experts and Serve Expert Reports. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/1/11. (mrm, )
December 1, 2011 149 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Google Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs Exhibits (Babcock, Charles)
December 1, 2011 148 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Google Inc.'s Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Babcock, Charles)
December 1, 2011 147 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Keith Dunbar of Counter-Designations (supplement) (Mann, Peter) Modified on 12/2/2011 (sm, ).
December 1, 2011 146 NOTICE by Keith Dunbar of Counter-Designations (Rommel, Sean)
November 30, 2011 145 Featured Case ORDER, ( Class Certification Hearing set for 12/8/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom). The Court further hereby sets a time limit of 90 minutes per side. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/11. (mrm, )
November 22, 2011 144 SEALED Sur-REPLY to Motion re 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Christopher W. Clifton, # 2 Supplemental Declaration of Shannon Zmud Teicher, Pt. 1, # 3 Supplemental Declaration of Shannon Zmud Teicher, Pt. 2)(Babcock, Charles)
November 22, 2011 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim filed by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
November 22, 2011 142 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Supplemental Expert Disclosure (Babcock, Charles)
November 21, 2011 141 NOTICE by Keith Dunbar Class Certification Hearing Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Designations, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Witness List)(Rommel, Sean)
November 21, 2011 140 Witness List by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
November 21, 2011 139 Exhibit List for Class Action Hearing by Google, Inc... (Babcock, Charles)
November 21, 2011 138 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Filing Google Inc.'s Deposition Designations (Babcock, Charles)
November 18, 2011 137 Featured Case ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Deadline to Exchange Witness Lists, Exhibit Lists and Deposition Designations. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/18/11. (mrm, )
November 17, 2011 136 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 134 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Linda Mullenix, Pt. 1, # 2 Declaration of Linda Mullenix, Pt. 2, # 3 Declaration of Linda Mullenix, Pt. 3)(Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2011 135 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Extension of Deadline to Exchange Witness Lists, Exhibit Lists and Deposition by Keith Dunbar, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2011 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re 122 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Linda S. Mullenix and Linda S. Mullenix as Google's Expert filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Zmud Teicher, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 14, 2011 133 RESPONSE to Motion re 120 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 14, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Mediation Conference held on 11/14/2011. (lfs, )
November 10, 2011 132 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Judge Craven. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/10/11. (mrm, )
November 10, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Mediation Conference held on 11/10/2011. (Court Reporter none.) (lfs, )
November 9, 2011 131 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Authority to seal) : 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion.. (Rommel, Sean) Modified on 11/9/2011 (sm, ).
November 8, 2011 130 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W)(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 129 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit R, # 3 Exhibit S, # 4 Exhibit T, # 5 Exhibit U, # 6 Exhibit V)(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 128 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N(l-n), # 2 Exhibit N(o-q), # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit P)(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 127 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N(i), # 2 Exhibit N(j-k))(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 126 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N(e-f), # 2 Exhibit N(g-h))(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 125 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N(c), # 2 Exhibit N(d))(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 124 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N(a-b))(Rommel, Sean)
November 7, 2011 123 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Third Amended Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
October 31, 2011 122 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Linda S. Mullenix and Linda S. Mullenix as Google's Expert by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
October 27, 2011 121 AMENDED ANSWER to 117 Google Inc's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Second Amended Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Keith Dunbar. (Mann, Peter)
October 27, 2011 120 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim by Keith Dunbar(Individually as a representative on behalf of all similarly situated persons). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
October 25, 2011 119 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Teicher, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Teicher Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2-3 to Teicher Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4-24 to Teicher Declaration, # 5 25-39 to Teicher Declaration, # 6 Declaration of Dr. Christopher Clifton, Pt. 1, # 7 Declaration of Dr. Christopher Clifton, Pt. 2, # 8 Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal, # 9 Declaration of Jack Weixel, Pt. 1, # 10 Declaration of Jack Weixel, Pt. 2, # 11 Declaration of John Collins, # 12 Declaration of Steve Crossan, # 13 Declaration of Linda Mullinex, Pt. 1, # 14 Declaration of Linda Mullinex, Pt. 2, # 15 Declaration of Linda Mullinex, Pt. 3, # 16 Declaration of Linda Mullinex, Pt. 4, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 17, 2011 118 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Expert Disclosure (Babcock, Charles)
October 13, 2011 117 RESPONSE to 91 Sealed Document, Google Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Second Amended Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
October 11, 2011 116 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Second Amended Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
October 6, 2011 115 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension of Defendants Deadline to Designate Experts and Serve Expert Reports by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 4, 2011 114 Featured Case ORDER granting 112 Motion to Unseal Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Exhibits; 96 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 91 Sealed Document Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 93 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 95 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 92 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 97 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 98 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 94 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/4/11. (mrm, )
October 3, 2011 113 Featured Case ORDER granting 111 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 91 Sealed Document. Responsive Pleading due by 10/13/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/11. (mrm, )
October 3, 2011 112 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document 96 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 91 Sealed Document, 93 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 95 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 92 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 97 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 98 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 94 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
September 27, 2011 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 91 Sealed Document by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 23, 2011 110 Featured Case ORDER re 109 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google, Inc. The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff respond to Google's motion no later than September 28, 2011, at 5:00 P.M. Google's reply, if any, shall be filed no later than September 30, 2011, at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/23/11. (mrm, )
September 21, 2011 109 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl C. Butzer, # 2 Exhibit A1-A5 of Buzter Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A6-A11 of Buzter Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 19, 2011 108 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Motion for an Extension of Page Limitation for Class Certification briefing. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/19/11. (mrm, )
September 16, 2011 107 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference): 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification.. (Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 106 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification.. (Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 105 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Authority to seal): 91 Sealed Document.. (Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 104 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K-2, # 2 Exhibit K-3, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 103 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K-1)(Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 102 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J)(Rommel, Sean)
September 15, 2011 101 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I)(Rommel, Sean)
September 15, 2011 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Rommel, Sean)
September 15, 2011 99 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Class Certification Briefing by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
September 15, 2011 98 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit T-4, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit V)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 97 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T-3)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 96 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit T-2)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 95 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit T-1)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 94 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit S)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 93 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit P)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 92 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 91 Second Amended Complaint by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 9/16/2011 (sm, ). Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 1, 2011 90 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER:( Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2011., Mediation Completion due by 11/2/2011.), granting 89 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Google, Inc., Keith Dunbar. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/31/11. (mrm, )
August 24, 2011 89 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by Keith Dunbar, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
August 22, 2011 88 Featured Case ORDER granting 86 Motion regarding objections under protective order and to disquality plaintiff experts ORDERING that dft shall not be required to show cause and FURTHER ORDERED that no fees or expenses shall be awarded to dft pursuant to courts order (#62) regarding pla motion to compel and no fees or expenses shall be awarded to pla pursuant to courts order (#83) regarding dfts objection and motin to disqualify. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/22/2011. (sm, )
August 17, 2011 87 Featured Case ORDER granting as modified 80 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order. The parties are further hereby ORDERED to confer and to jointly file a revised proposed scheduling based on the foregoing within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/17/11. (mrm, )
August 17, 2011 86 Joint MOTION To Resolve The Courts Order On Defendant Google Inc.s Objection Under Protective Order And Motion To Disqualify Plaintiffs Experts, And Alternatively To Conduct Disqualification Discovery re 83 Order, Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by Keith Dunbar, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
August 11, 2011 85 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 80 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
August 1, 2011 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
July 25, 2011 83 Featured Case ORDER, granting in part and denying in part 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery filed by Google, Inc.; ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written brief to be filed within 45 days of this Order, why it should not pay Plaintiff's expenses, including attorney's fees, in opposing Google's motion ( Show Cause Response due by 9/8/2011.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/25/11. (mrm, )
July 25, 2011 82 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 39 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the Alternative, to Strike Prayer for Relief; denying 58 Motion to Dismiss Google, Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/25/11. (mrm, )
July 22, 2011 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
July 20, 2011 80 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Babcock, Charles)
July 20, 2011 79 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery And Request For Expedited Review filed by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
July 14, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery SurReplies due by 7/20/2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/14/2011. (sm, )
July 13, 2011 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
July 11, 2011 76 Featured Case ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-reply re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery. Sur-replies due by 7/13/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/11/11. (mrm, )
July 7, 2011 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 71 Response in Opposition to Motion, 74 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
June 28, 2011 74 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bennet Yee)(Babcock, Charles)
June 28, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #73 Sealed Reply submitted by Google, Inc.. Exceeds the page limit for filing a reply per local rules. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled (sm, )
June 27, 2011 73 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bennet Yee)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 6/28/2011 (sm, ).
June 27, 2011 72 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. First Amended Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
June 16, 2011 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Rommel, Sean)
June 13, 2011 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Teicher pt. 1, # 2 Declaration of Shannon Teicher pt. 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
June 7, 2011 69 RESPONSE to Motion re 58 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 27, 2011 68 Featured Case ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 58 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim. Responses due by 6/7/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/27/11. (mrm, )
May 26, 2011 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 58 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 25, 2011 66 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 10, 2011, Motion Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2011. (aec, )
May 25, 2011 65 Featured Case REDACTED ORDER dkt # 60 ; denying 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Dunbar. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/25/11. (mrm, )
May 24, 2011 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 63 Motion to Seal 60 Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/24/11. (mrm, )
May 24, 2011 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 60 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This order has now been sealed per Motion for leave to seal. (sm, )
May 23, 2011 63 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Preliminary Injunction Order (Dkt No 60) by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 23, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER denying 45 Motion to Compel Google to Provide Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/23/11. (mrm, )
May 23, 2011 61 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/23/11. (mrm, )
May 18, 2011 59 Answer to 50 First Amended Counterclaim by Keith Dunbar(Individually as a representative on behalf of all similarly situated persons). (Rommel, Sean) Modified on 5/19/2011 (sm, ).
May 13, 2011 58 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim by Keith Dunbar(Individually as a representative on behalf of all similarly situated persons). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 10, 2011 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2011 re 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google filed by Keith Dunbar, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc., 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Dunbar, 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the alternative, to Strike Claim for Relief filed by Keith Dunbar. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
May 9, 2011 56 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/9/11. (mrm, )
May 9, 2011 55 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 54 Response to Motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Babcock, Charles)
May 9, 2011 54 RESPONSE to Motion re 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 6, 2011 53 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit Q)(Rommel, Sean)
May 6, 2011 52 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Keith Dunbar, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles)
April 29, 2011 51 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side will have five (5) minutes for oral argument. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/29/11. (mrm, )
April 28, 2011 50 Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Keith Dunbar by Google, Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
April 28, 2011 49 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
April 28, 2011 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
April 25, 2011 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
April 22, 2011 46 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Rommel, Sean)
April 22, 2011 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rommel, Sean)
April 21, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER Re-setting Hearing on Motions 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint, 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the alternative, to Strike Claim for Relief :( Motion Hearing reset for 5/10/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/21/11. (mrm, )
April 20, 2011 43 NOTICE of Disclosure by Keith Dunbar Notice of Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Rommel, Sean)
April 20, 2011 42 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
April 19, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint, 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the alternative, to Strike Claim for Relief : Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side will have a total of 20 minutes for oral argument as to all of the abovementioned motions (for a total hearing length of 40 minutes). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/19/11. (mrm, )
April 11, 2011 40 ANSWER to 29 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Keith Dunbar.(Mann, Peter)
April 11, 2011 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the alternative, to Strike Claim for Relief by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Case - Madry v Fina Oil & Chemical Co.)(Mann, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
April 8, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss PlaintiffsFirst Amended Class Action Complaint and its Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction until 4/28/2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on April 8, 2011. (rml, )
April 7, 2011 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Sur-Reply Briefs by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
April 6, 2011 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Redacted Version per 4/5/11 Order [Dkt # 35] filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve Crossan)(Babcock, Charles)
April 5, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion to File Unsealed, Redacted Version of Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/5/11. (mrm, )
April 4, 2011 34 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's proposed docket control order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Defendant's proposed docket control order)(Rommel, Sean)
April 1, 2011 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Keith Dunbar)(Rommel, Sean)
April 1, 2011 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhbit C to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit H to Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit I to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit J to Complaint, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit N to Complaint, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit O to Complaint, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit P to Complaint)(Rommel, Sean)
April 1, 2011 31 Unopposed MOTION to File Unsealed, Redacted Version of Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 24, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Replies due by 4/1/2011. 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, Responses due by 4/1/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/24/11. (mrm, )
March 23, 2011 29 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Keith Dunbar by Google, Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
March 23, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion for extension of time to conduct the Rule 26(f) conference. ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to conduct the Rule 26(f) conference shall be up to and including March 28, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/23/11. (mrm, )
March 23, 2011 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Motion to Dismiss by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
March 21, 2011 26 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) conference by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
March 14, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 3/24/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/14/11. (mrm, )
March 11, 2011 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
March 10, 2011 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl C. Butzer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 8, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Seal Documents; Defendant shall be permitted to file its Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and the exhibits attached thereto under seal. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/8/11. (mrm, )
March 7, 2011 21 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Declaration of Carl Butzer): 20 Sealed Response to Motion.. (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 3/8/2011 (sm, ).
March 7, 2011 20 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve Crossan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 7, 2011 19 Agreed MOTION to Seal Documents by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 1, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/4/2011.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/28/11. (mrm, )
February 21, 2011 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Google, Inc., filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, # 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, # 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT I, # 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT J, # 11 Exhibit EXHIBIT K, # 12 Exhibit EXHIBIT L, # 13 Exhibit EXHIBIT M, # 14 Exhibit EXHIBIT N, # 15 Exhibit EXHIBIT O, # 16 Exhibit EXHIBIT P)(Rommel, Sean)
February 18, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Responses due by 3/7/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/18/11. (mrm, )
February 17, 2011 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 4, 2011 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
February 4, 2011 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl C. Butzer, # 2 Exhibit 1-8 to the Declaration of Carl C. Butzer, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 3, 2011 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
February 3, 2011 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
December 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 2/4/2011. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 15, 2010 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Babcock, Charles)
December 15, 2010 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Zmud Teicher on behalf of Google, Inc. (Teicher, Shannon)
December 15, 2010 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl Christof Butzer on behalf of Google, Inc. (Butzer, Carl)
December 15, 2010 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T Moran on behalf of Google, Inc. (Moran, David)
December 15, 2010 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles L Babcock on behalf of Google, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
December 15, 2010 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George L McWilliams on behalf of Google, Inc. (McWilliams, George)
December 10, 2010 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Dunbar. Google, Inc. served on 11/30/2010 via certified mail, answer due 12/21/2010. (sm, )
November 22, 2010 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 6-734 (dlk, )
November 17, 2010 3 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher L Travis for Keith Dunbar ($100 phv fee paid - Receipt #6-735). (sm, )
November 17, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (sm, )
November 17, 2010 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc.. (sm, )
November 17, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. (Check for Filing fee of $350 received), filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunbar v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dunbar
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Represented By: Michael Chad Trammell
Represented By: Christopher L. Travis
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L Babcock
Represented By: Carl Christof Butzer
Represented By: George L. McWilliams
Represented By: David T Moran
Represented By: Shannon Zmud Teicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]