SoftVault Systems, Inc. v. Citrix Systems, Inc.

Defendant: Citrix Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: SoftVault Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv00754
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Extension of Time re 20 Notice (Other) filed by SoftVault Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 28, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
July 2, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal; granting 25 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
March 13, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER (correcting case number from 13-cv-00750 to 13-cv-00754). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/13/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SoftVault Systems, Inc. v. Citrix Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrix Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SoftVault Systems, Inc.
Represented By: P.J. Benedict O'Mahoney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]