Purple Heart Patient Center, Inc v. Military Order of the Purple Heart of the United States of America, Inc

Defendant: Military Order of the Purple Heart Service Foundation, Inc and Military Order of the Purple Heart of the United States of America, Inc
Plaintiff: Purple Heart Patient Center, Inc
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00902
Filed: February 28, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 11 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
May 20, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JOHANNA WILBERT by Hon. William Alsup denying 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 21, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY DAVID CROSS by Hon. William Alsup denying 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 22, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING WILBERT PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 22, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING CROSS PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
June 7, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING KOVELANT PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
July 3, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND AND EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER by Judge Alsup terminating 36 Motion for Leave to File; granting 39 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 23, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY PAK FOR ATTORNEY LEE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 41 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
August 5, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY HANDLER by Hon. William Alsup granting 44 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
February 11, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ON CLAIMS THREE THROUGH ELEVEN AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Judge Alsup denying 49 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
March 6, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 57 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
April 8, 2014 62 Featured Case ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR APRIL 15 Status Conference set for 4/15/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 8, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
August 12, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS NOTICE RE WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY RICHARD KOVELAND. re 66 , 67 Notice Withdrawal. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 12, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Purple Heart Patient Center, Inc v. Military Order of the Purple Heart of the United States of America, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Military Order of the Purple Heart Service Foundation, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Military Order of the Purple Heart of the United States of America, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purple Heart Patient Center, Inc
Represented By: Steven Kuang-Yu Lee
Represented By: Eric Andrew Handler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]