Novus Optimum Labs et al v. Tamayo et al

Defendant: Gina Tamayo and Edgardo Tamayo
Plaintiff: Novus Optimum Labs and Meliza Reyes
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01119
Filed: March 12, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 8 Ex Parte Application. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
July 2, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DENYING APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 18 NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING for Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
August 26, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WITHDRAW re 46 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Edgardo Tamayo, Gina Tamayo. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 26, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
January 24, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS, INCLUDING CASE-TERMINATING SANCTIONS, SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/12/2014 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2014.Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on January 24, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
February 6, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause hearing will go forward as scheduled on 2/12/2014 2:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco. Both Gina Tamayo and Edgardo Tamayo are ordered to appear in person. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/6/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
May 15, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER SETTING HEARING RE: First Discovery Letter Brief 65 . Responses due by 5/28/2014. Replies due by 6/2/2014. Hearing set for 6/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
September 18, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/16/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Novus Optimum Labs et al v. Tamayo et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Tamayo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Tamayo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novus Optimum Labs
Represented By: Dorna Moini
Represented By: Otis McGee, Jr.
Represented By: Morgan Forsey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meliza Reyes
Represented By: Otis McGee, Jr.
Represented By: Morgan Forsey
Represented By: Dorna Moini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]