Los Gatos Mercantile, Inc et al v. E.I DuPont De Nemours and Company et al

Defendant: Huntsman International, LLC, E.I DuPont De Nemours and Company, Millennium Inorganic Chemicals, Inc and Kronos Worldwide, Inc
Plaintiff: AE Hardware of South Walton, Inc, Lexington Home Center, LLC, Cusimano Carstar Collision, Inc, The Carpetshoppe, Inc, Los Gatos Mercantile, Inc, Fred Swain, Inc and R.F. Cole, Inc
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01180
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 70 MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/22/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
June 11, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 14, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13., Motions terminated: 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint,, Ext ending Time for Defendants to Respond (Civil Local Rule 6-1(a)) and Stipulated Request for Order Continuing Initial Case Management and Related Deadlines (Civil Local Rule 6-1(b) & 6-2) filed by Millennium Inorganic Chemicals, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13., Motions terminated: 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint,, Extendin g Time for Defendants to Respond (Civil Local Rule 6-1(a)) and Stipulated Request for Order Continuing Initial Case Management and Related Deadlines (Civil Local Rule 6-1(b) & 6-2) filed by Millennium Inorganic Chemicals, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
July 19, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
September 23, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 50 MOTION for Telephonic Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Parties may appear via telephone. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/23/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
December 19, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS, AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINE re 65 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2014. Motions to Dismiss to be heard 4/23/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
April 21, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/21/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
May 9, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2014 01:30 PM. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 7/10/2014 09:00 AM. All hearings to be held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman Courtroom #3, 5th Floor 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/09/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Los Gatos Mercantile, Inc et al v. E.I DuPont De Nemours and Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman International, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I DuPont De Nemours and Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Inorganic Chemicals, Inc
Represented By: Robert Hallman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kronos Worldwide, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AE Hardware of South Walton, Inc
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Home Center, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cusimano Carstar Collision, Inc
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Carpetshoppe, Inc
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Gatos Mercantile, Inc
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Swain, Inc
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.F. Cole, Inc
Represented By: Sandra Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]