LPL Financial, LLC et al v. Briley et al

Defendant: Hayashi & Wayland Accountin and Consulting, LLP, Warren Wayland, Hayashi & Wayland Retirement Plan Services, Steve Shearn, Hayashi & Wayland Administrative and Insurance Services, Michael T Briley, Hayashi & Wayland Investment Services, LLC and Leigh Jeter
Plaintiff: LPL Financial, LLC and William Hastie
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01207
Filed: March 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 16 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 15 for filing of Second Amended Complaint filed by LPL Financial, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/8/13. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 16, 2013 19 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation with Proposed Order to Remand filed by William Hastie, LPL Financial, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/16/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
June 5, 2013 9 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER selecting Private ADR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on June 5, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LPL Financial, LLC et al v. Briley et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayashi & Wayland Accountin and Consulting, LLP
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Represented By: James Forrest Hetherington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Wayland
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Represented By: James Forrest Hetherington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayashi & Wayland Retirement Plan Services
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Represented By: James Forrest Hetherington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Shearn
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Represented By: James Forrest Hetherington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayashi & Wayland Administrative and Insurance Services
Represented By: James Forrest Hetherington
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T Briley
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Represented By: James Forrest Hetherington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayashi & Wayland Investment Services, LLC
Represented By: James Forrest Hetherington
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Jeter
Represented By: James Forrest Hetherington
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LPL Financial, LLC
Represented By: David Samuel Markun
Represented By: Jon R. Giffen
Represented By: Jeffrey Karl Compton
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Gregory Eugene Bullard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hastie
Represented By: David Samuel Markun
Represented By: Jon R. Giffen
Represented By: Jeffrey Karl Compton
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Gregory Eugene Bullard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]