DG Berry, Inc v. Driscoll Strawberry Associates, Inc

Plaintiff: DG Berry, Inc
Defendant: Driscoll Strawberry Associates, Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv01236
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
June 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Conference reset for 7/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
July 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 TO RE-SET STATUS CONF. filed by Driscoll Strawberry Associates, Inc Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
August 15, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESET STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Driscoll Strawberry Associates, Inc Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
September 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Reset status conference filed by Driscoll Strawberry Associates, Inc Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
October 11, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REQUESTING DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE filed by DG Berry, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DG Berry, Inc v. Driscoll Strawberry Associates, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DG Berry, Inc
Represented By: Stephen James Beals
Represented By: Effie F. Anastassiou
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driscoll Strawberry Associates, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]