Gonzalez v. Sepulveda et al

Plaintiff: Eric L. Gonzalez
Defendant: Michael Sepulveda and Darin Bright
Case Number: 5:2013cv01272
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
November 21, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 8 Motion to compel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
August 15, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 14 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/14/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
July 15, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION Dispositive Motion due by 10/15/2013.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/13/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Sepulveda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric L. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.