Topka v. The Seti Institute

Defendant: The Seti Institute
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Topka
Case Number: 5:2013cv01283
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Remand. The hearing scheduled for 6/28/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
September 26, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismissthe action. Joint Stat ement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 11/25/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/6/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***ALL Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Seti Institute. The Clerk shall close this file. ***ALL Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Topka v. The Seti Institute
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Seti Institute
Represented By: David M. King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Topka
Represented By: Gay Lynne Carroll-Haring
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]