Rustro v. Black et al

Defendant: Kyoko Black and Keiko Ortiz
Plaintiff: Lino Francisco Mandujano Rustro
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01327
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting Court-sponsored Mediation. The parties shall hold the Mediation by the presumptive deadline, 90 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on June 3, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
December 3, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS re 23 Stipulation and Order to Dismiss filed by Lino Francisco Mandujano Rustro. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/3/2013. The clerk shall close the file (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
May 6, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to file response to complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on May 6, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rustro v. Black et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyoko Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keiko Ortiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lino Francisco Mandujano Rustro
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]