Caldwell v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Nancy C Caldwell
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Regional Trustee Services Corporation and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01344
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/26/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
April 3, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION AND OPPOSITION TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 3, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
July 12, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 12, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 16, 2013 25 Featured Case Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 21 Motion for TRO.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
February 12, 2014 39 Featured Case ORDER Vacating 2/13/2014 Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/13/2014. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 26, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 27 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 35 Motion for Leave to File. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Caldwell v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy C Caldwell
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Trustee Services Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Kimberly Neff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]