PersonalWeb Technologies LLC et al v. EMC Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications, LLC and PersonalWeb Technologies LLC
Defendant: EMC Corporation and VMware, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv01358
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING/SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court advises the parties in each case that date of the Case Management Conference will not be modified further. Requests to change or continue the date of the conference will not be cons idered and should not be filed. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
October 28, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12, the court finds that the above-entitled cases ARE RELATED. Accordingly, the clerk shall administratively relate these files. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/28/2013.(ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
March 29, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/29/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
October 28, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 28 Amended MOTION For Administrative Relief Seeking Leave to Supplement The Record On Defendants' Motion To Stay re 8 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review MOTION for Leave to File filed by EMC Corporation, VMware, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/28/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
January 13, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Stay. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE these files. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE these files. These actions are STAYED in their entirety pending final exhaustion of the relevant review proceedings, incl uding any appeals. This order does not preclude any party from moving to reopen this action, when appropriate. Each defendant in each case shall file, on or before January 20, 2013, a notice indicating their consent or declination to be bound by the above-described estoppel limitations. The notice shall not exceed one page in length. Defendants are hereby notified that, absent full consent, the court may sua sponte reconsider this Order. The parties in each case shall submit a joint status repor t apprising the court of the status of the relevant review proceedings on July 13, 2014, and every six months thereafter. These reports shall be filed as separate docket entries on ECF/PACER. The parties in each case shall provide notice to the court within one week of final exhaustion of all relevant review proceedings, including appeals. In their notice, the parties shall request that this matter be reopened, and that a case management conference be scheduled. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 13, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014) Modified on 1/13/2014 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 1/13/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC et al v. EMC Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC
Represented By: Lawrence M. Hadley
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Corporation
Represented By: Cynthia D. Vreeland
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Represented By: Cortney Cilenn Hoecherl
Represented By: Robert M. Galvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Represented By: Cortney Cilenn Hoecherl
Represented By: Robert M. Galvin
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Represented By: Cynthia D. Vreeland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]