Beardsley v. County of Santa Clara et al

Defendant: Department of Corrections, County of Santa Clara, Hammond, City of San Jose and Ramirez
Plaintiff: Lloyd Beardsley
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01378
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 Stipulation to Enlarge Time filed by County of Santa Clara. The time within which the defendant County of Santa Clara to respond to the complaint in this action filed on March 27, 2013 shall be extended to September 27, 2013. This date will not affect any previously set case management dates. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/3/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
September 23, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 9/30/2013 demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 9/27/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/23/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
October 1, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court reschedules this action for a Case Management Conference on 10/25/2013 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement on or before 1 0/18/2013. The court advises Plaintiff that failure to comply with further deadlines will result in the dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) without further notice. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/1/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
March 4, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 5/2/2014. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other pretrial deadlines and h earing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 7, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 43 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Joel Hammond ONLY filed by Hammond. Hammond (Corrections Officer) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/7/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. The clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/7/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
July 15, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE The 120-day period for service provided by Rule 4(m) will expire on July 25, 2013. Accordingly, the court issues the instant Order to Show Cause ("OSC") requiring that Plaintiff, no later than July 31, 2013, either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on defendants; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court Plaintif f is notified that the court will dismiss this action if Plaintiff fails to comply with this OSC or otherwise fail to show good cause as directed above. In light of the OSC, the Case Management Conference scheduled for July 19, 2013, is VACATED. ***7/19/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/15/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Beardsley v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramirez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Beardsley
Represented By: James E Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]