Merritt et al v. Mckenney et al

Defendant: Kevin E. Mckenney, Mark H. Pierce, Socrates P. Manoukian, Santa Clara Superior Court, Lynn Searle, Thomas W Cain and MICHAEL DESMERAIS
Plaintiff: Salma Merritt, David Merritt and Beatrice Pacheco-Starks
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01391
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
 
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/25/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. I, the undersigned Judge of the court, finding myself disqualified from presiding over the above-entitled action, hereby recuse myself from this case and request that it be reassigned pursuant to the applicable provisions of this District's Assignment Plan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/25/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
July 9, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON 19 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; 42 First MOTION to Appoint Counsel For Plaintiff Pacheco-Starks; 17 MOTION to Dismiss ; and 14 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 9, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
August 1, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PROPOSED AMICUS TO RE-NOTICE: 52 First MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 21, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 60 Application for Disability Accommodations - TO APPEAR VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 27, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion to Dismiss, GRANTING 17 Motion to Dismiss, DENYING 42 First Motion to Appoint Counsel For Plaintiff Pacheco-Starks, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, AND 54 Denying First Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 27, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
November 1, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 27, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS PER 77 USCA Order of Referral and INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 27, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Merritt et al v. Mckenney et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin E. Mckenney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark H. Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socrates P. Manoukian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Superior Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Searle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DESMERAIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salma Merritt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Merritt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Pacheco-Starks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]