Johnson v. Blossom Hill Pavilion, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Defendant: Blossom Hill Pavilion, L.P. and Does 1-20
Case Number: 5:2013cv01414
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT INSPECTION, AND LAST DAY TO FILE NOTICE OF NEED FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 28, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2013)
January 31, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/31/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
April 21, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Plaintiff's Request and Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/21/14. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
June 11, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Directing Parties to File Consent Forms. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/11/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 13, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Reassigning Case to a Magistrate Judge for All Purposes. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/13/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
February 3, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 56 . Settlement Conference continued to 3/26/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/3/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 27, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 55 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
May 22, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 95 . Settlement Conference continued to 6/16/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/22/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Blossom Hill Pavilion, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Represented By: Irene Lenislav Karbelashvili
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Pinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blossom Hill Pavilion, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.