Fitbug Limited v. Fitbit, Inc

Plaintiff: Fitbug Limited
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv01418
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 108 motion for review of the Clerk's taxation of costs 106 , and taxing $63,660.94 in costs. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
December 13, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Discovery due by 9/22/2014. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Jury Selection set for 2/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco bef ore Hon. Samuel Conti. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/13/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
January 2, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 01/02/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
January 26, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 50 Fitbit Inc.'s motion for summary judgment and granting in part and denying in part [47-3] Fitbug Ltd.'s motion for summary judgment. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on January 26, 2015. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitbug Limited v. Fitbit, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitbug Limited
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Represented By: Mark Jon Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.