Chartis Specialty Insurance Company et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Chartis Specialty Insurance Company and Whittaker Corporation
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2013cv01527
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST re 107 Proposed Order filed by Whittaker Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/24/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
December 2, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 105 Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 2, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 105 Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
April 12, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 4/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 18, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 27 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry, JOINT STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Whittaker Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 29, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 filed by Whittaker Corporation Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2013. Def's Motion to dismiss due 5/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
July 16, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 67 Statement of Recent Decision, filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 19, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Serve Rule 26(A) Initial Disclosures; [Proposed] Order filed by Chartis Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 19, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 51 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
September 25, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 REGARDING TREATMENT OF PROTECTED INFORMATION filed by United States of America, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING THE INADVERTENT DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED INFORMATION filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
April 1, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION filed by Whittaker Corporation Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/5/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/1/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chartis Specialty Insurance Company et al v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chartis Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: David Ferguson Wood
Represented By: Matthew J. Schroeder
Represented By: Colin George Martin
Represented By: Scott Louis Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whittaker Corporation
Represented By: Caroline Louise Plant
Represented By: Mark Erik Elliott
Represented By: Reynold Lloyd Siemens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael C Augustini
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: C. Scott Spear
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]