Cerezo et al v. U.S.Bank National Association et al

Plaintiff: Nida F. Cerezo and Loeto G. Cerezo
Defendant: U.S.Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank N.A and NDEX West LLC
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01540
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 9, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 17 Motion Expunge (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 30, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 30, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cerezo et al v. U.S.Bank National Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nida F. Cerezo
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Represented By: Megan Dailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loeto G. Cerezo
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Represented By: Megan Dailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.Bank National Association
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West LLC
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]