UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Acts Revival Center

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Acts Revival Center
Case Number: 5:2013cv01542
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/4/2014. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 29, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNICATIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/29/2014. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
November 13, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/13/2014. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 24, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/24/2014. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
January 30, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/30/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
February 5, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/5/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Acts Revival Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Adair Ford Boroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acts Revival Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.