Zaidi v. Horton et al

Defendant: Thomas Horton and Clem Bason
Plaintiff: Sayed Hasan Arzoo Zaidi
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01586
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 15 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice,. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 13, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CMC Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/12/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2013 19 Featured Case SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by NOON ON 7/1/2013. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/24/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
July 9, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER RE REQUEST TO TRANSFER AND AMEND COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge 7/9/2013 [granting 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER RE REQUEST TO TRANSFER AND AMEND COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING [re 20 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Sayed Hasan Arzoo Zaidi]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/9/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/9/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER re 29 Declaration in Support, filed by Thomas Horton, 27 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/1/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 23, 2013 36 Featured Case SECOND ORDER RE REQUEST TO TRANSFER AND AMEND COMPLAINT re 20 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Sayed Hasan Arzoo Zaidi. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/23/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
September 3, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/3/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zaidi v. Horton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Horton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clem Bason
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayed Hasan Arzoo Zaidi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]