Sargent v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A et al

Plaintiff: Caryl A. Sargent
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York and WAMU Mortgage Pass-Through Certificate Series 2006-AR12 Trust
Case Number: 5:2013cv01690
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/28/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 31, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 17, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/17/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING DEADLINES, HEARING, AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, 14 Renotice motion hearing, filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York, WAMU Mortgage Pass-Through Certificate Series 2006-AR12 Trust, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/2/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 23, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MOVING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/23/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 25, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 7 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
August 19, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sargent v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryl A. Sargent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A
Represented By: Jessica Marie Luhrs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Marie Luhrs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Jessica Marie Luhrs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAMU Mortgage Pass-Through Certificate Series 2006-AR12 Trust
Represented By: Jessica Marie Luhrs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]