San Francisco Baykeeper v. Premier Recycle Company

Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: Premier Recycle Company
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01695
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2013. Case Management Conference continued to 9/10/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Related deadlines adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on August 13, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
September 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Case Management Conference to 10/1/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2013. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/6/13. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2013)
September 18, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/18/13. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Case Management Conference to 10/29/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2013. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/23/13. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
October 22, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (MODIFIED) re 25 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES filed by Premier Recycle Company. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/22/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
January 6, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 Entry of Consent Decree and Dismissal filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/3/2014. Court retains jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing compliance with the consent decree. The clerk shall close the file.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014) Modified on 1/6/2014 (hrllc1, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Initial Case Management Conference to 8/20/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on June 28, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper v. Premier Recycle Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Kopecky
Represented By: Jayni Foley Hein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Recycle Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]