Bernstein v. Apollo Group, Inc. et al

Defendant: Mary Roe 1-50, John Doe 1-50, Apollo Group, Inc., The University of Phoenix, Inc., XYZ Corp 1-50 and ABC LLC 1-50
Plaintiff: Mary Helen Bernstein
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01701
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 103 Featured Case ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 55 AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR JOINDER 96 97 99 101 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/28/13. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
January 24, 2014 198 Featured Case ORDER vacating hearings. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 1/24/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
February 28, 2014 201 Featured Case ORDER (1) GRANTING 55 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART; (2) DENYING 96 97 99 101 MOTIONS FOR JOINDER; (3) DENYING 105 106 MOTIONS FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS; AND (4) DENYING 160 161 162 163 164 165 169 170 171 173 174 175 176 177 178 179 180 181 182 MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/28/2014. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 215 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 210 Motion to Relate Case. 14-cv-01404 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
August 6, 2014 270 Featured Case ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (228) Ex Parte Application ; denying (229) Ex Parte Application ; denying (234) Ex Parte Application ; denying (239) Motion to Compel; denying (240) Motion to Compel; denying (242) Motion to Compel; denying (243) Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part (245) Motion for Protective Order; denying (252) Motion for Discovery in case 5:13-cv-01701-LHK; denying (36) Ex Parte Application ; denying (37) Ex Parte Ap plication ; denying (38) Ex Parte Application ; denying (42) Motion to Compel; denying (43) Motion to Compel; denying (45) Motion to Compel; denying (46) Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part (48) Motion for Protective Order; denying (55) Motion for Discovery in case 5:14-cv-01404-LHK (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2014: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 45 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 19 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 22 Motion to Appear by Telephone (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bernstein v. Apollo Group, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Phoenix, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC LLC 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Helen Bernstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]