Costa v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Kim D. Costa
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01724
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO INFORM COURT WHETHER THEY CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit- Consent Form )(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
March 7, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying in part 19 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Court remands this case for further administrative proceedings. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Case remanded to Social Security Administration for further administrative proceedings, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
April 17, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 2 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/17/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Costa v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim D. Costa
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]