Sung v. Bussio et al

Defendant: Jessica Bjarnson, Skyler Boyd Jarman, Jeffrey Nicol, Richard Scott Nemrow, Novus North LLC, Phillip Edward Gannuscia, Angela Bussio and John Does 1-100
Plaintiff: Arleen Sung
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01786
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 21 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 20 Requesting Changing Briefing Schedule Time and Setting Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss for (1) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) Improper Venue; and (3) Failure to State Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/22/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
August 29, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER denying defendants' motion to dismiss as moot, rescheduling motion hearings, and requiring defendants to revise and re-file their second motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/29/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
September 17, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER 38 Continuing Hearings. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint for (1) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) Improper Venue; and (3) Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, 30 MOTION to Strike 24 Amended Complaint, 26 Opposition/Response to Motion,, , 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint for: (1) L ack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) Improper Venue; (3) Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted or In the Alterna. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/17/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 44 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 39 Changing Briefing Schedule Time. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/17/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 30, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER 45 to Continue Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 30 MOTION to Strike 24 Amended Complaint, 26 Opposition/Response to Motion,, , 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum to Dism iss Amended Class Action Complaint for: (1) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) Improper Venue; (3) Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted or In the Alterna. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/30/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
November 7, 2013 53 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 52 Selecting ADR Process. Case Referred to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/7/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 19, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte re 37 granting motion to dismiss plaintiff's RICO claim, denying motions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and improper venue, denying motion to transfer or compel arbitration; finding as moot 30 Motion to Strike; granting 48 Motion to Strike. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sung v. Bussio et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Bjarnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyler Boyd Jarman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Nicol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Scott Nemrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novus North LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Edward Gannuscia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Bussio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arleen Sung
Represented By: Grenville Thomas Pridham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]