Pham v. Redline Recovery Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Hoan Pham
Defendant: Redline Recovery Services, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Chase Home Finance, LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv01843
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/13/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
January 13, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 Modify Case Management Order as to Fact Discovery Cutoff. Fact Discovery Cutoff continued to 3/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/13/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
February 11, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 to Modify 23 Case Management Order as to Expert Discovery Cutoff. Expert Discovery Cutoff is 4/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/11/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 25, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 as to Fact Discovery Cutoff. Fact Discovery Cutoff is 4/1/2014. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/25/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
March 6, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/1/2014 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/6/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pham v. Redline Recovery Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoan Pham
Represented By: Katherine M Lehe
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Scott C. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redline Recovery Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.