Asbury Melvin v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Brenda L. Asbury Melvin
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01868
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 11 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 9 STIPULATION Requesting an Extension of Time to Submit Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
September 6, 2013 16 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting an Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall have a first extension of time up through and including Tuesday, September 24, 2013, in which to e-file her Moion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/06/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 25, 2013 18 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. The matter is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/25/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Asbury Melvin v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Asbury Melvin
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]