Cassidy v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Maureen Cassidy
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2013cv01873
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Stipulation for Extension. Defendant's responsive brief due by 6/28/2014. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 4/30/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
October 4, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court issues the instant OSC requiring that Plaintiff, no later than 10/15/2013 either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on defendant; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/4/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 15, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/15/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassidy v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Cassidy
Represented By: Cynthia Gail Starkey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]