Hakim v. McHugh

Plaintiff: Deena Hakim
Defendant: John McHugh
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01895
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court (*** DISREGARD - POSTED UNDER WRONG CASE - DISREGARD**) ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/17/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013) Modified on 7/17/2013 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing Date on 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing continued to 9/24/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on August 13, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
October 7, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The clerk shall close this file. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013) Modified on 10/7/2013 (hrllc1, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hakim v. McHugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deena Hakim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McHugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]