Sandoval et al v. City of Watsonville

Defendant: City of Watsonville
Plaintiff: Omar Sandoval and Maria Sandoval
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01909
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. The Clerk shall reassign this case to an available magistrate judge according to the relevant portions of this District's assignment plan. All matters previously scheduled before District Judge Edward J. Davila are VACATED and should be re-noticed before the newly assigned judge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
November 7, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 13, 2013 34 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 29 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by City of Watsonville filed by City of Watsonville. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/13/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
April 3, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 47 Motion to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sandoval et al v. City of Watsonville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Watsonville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Sandoval
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sandoval
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]