Guidi et al v. Paul Financial LLC et al

Plaintiff: Larry R. Guidi and Sharon Guidi
Defendant: Paul Financial LLC, RBS Financial Products Inc., Random Properties Acquisition Corp. III, Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation and Quality Loan Service Company
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01919
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Filing Oppposition to Ex Parte Application filed by Sharon Guidi, Larry R. Guidi. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 16, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 16, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to file Affidavit in Support of 35 Ex Parte Application filed by Sharon Guidi, Larry R. Guidi. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 16, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 17, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Filing Opposition to Withdrawn Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 17, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
November 6, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing; Continuing Case Management Conference to 2/12/2014. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/6/2013. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
January 7, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 26 Motion to Dismiss; granting 27 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
February 6, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to File a Joint Case Management Statement by February 7, 2014, at 5 P.M. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/6/2014.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
March 14, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE*** ORDER TO FILE BRIEFS BY MARCH 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/14/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014) Modified on 3/14/2014 (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Guidi et al v. Paul Financial LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry R. Guidi
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Guidi
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Financial LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Financial Products Inc.
Represented By: Donna Lynne Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Random Properties Acquisition Corp. III
Represented By: Donna Lynne Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]