Abrams v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Spencer Abrams
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc., Lonnie Smith, Gary Guthart, Salvatore J. Brogna, Augusto V. Castello, Jerome McNamara, Mark J. Meltzer, Marshall L. Mohr, Colin Morales and David Rosa
Case Number: 5:2013cv01920
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Darian Adel. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/20/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
October 11, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE. Having determined this case was inadvertently closed with a properly-closed related case (see Docket Item No. 39 ), the court orders that the clerk shall reopen this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/9/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
November 18, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Hawaii signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on November 18, 2013. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
August 12, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 81 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Employees' Retirement System of the State of Hawaii. Attorney Danielle Elizabeth Stampley; Javier Bleichmar and Cynthia Ann Hanawalt terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 21, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 21, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
September 4, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 84 Stipulation REGARDING TIME TO RESPOND TO OPERATIVE COMPLAINT filed by Colin Morales, Mark J. Meltzer, Gary Guthart, Jerome McNamara, David Rosa, Intuitive Surgical, Inc., Marshall L. Mohr, Salvatore J. Brogna, Augusto V. Castello, Lonnie Smith. Accordingly, Defendant's response will be due no later than Friday, October 10, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
November 17, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila.In addition, after considering th e parties' arguments in the Joint Case Management Conference Statement, disclosure and discovery are stayed until further order of the court. This court finds that the pending Motion for Reconsideration is akin to a Motion to Dismiss that warrants a stay on discovery. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/17/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Abrams
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Represented By: Arthur Charles Leahy
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Guthart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore J. Brogna
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusto V. Castello
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome McNamara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Meltzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall L. Mohr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Morales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rosa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]