Fread et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Rafael Carrillo and Robert Fread
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv01961
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2013 12 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Rommel.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2013)
May 12, 2013 11 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Wyly.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2013)
May 12, 2013 10 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Lutz.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2013)
May 12, 2013 9 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Tapley.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2013)
May 10, 2013 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sean F. Rommel ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7690851.) filed by Robert Fread. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Rommel, Sean) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 10, 2013 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jim Wyly ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7690846.) filed by Robert Fread. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Wyly, James) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 7, 2013 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 6 ). Case Reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedigs. Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 6, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. This case is related to 13-md-02430. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/6/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Lutz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7676674.) filed by Rafael Carrillo, Robert Fread. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Tapley, F.) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for F. Jerome Tapley ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7676430.) filed by Rafael Carrillo, Robert Fread. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Tapley, F.) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 29, 2013 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 1 INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Summons issued., Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611013568). Filed by Robert Fread, Rafael Carrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fread et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Carrillo
Represented By: Hiryle Ryan Lutz, III
Represented By: Sean F Rommel
Represented By: F. Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Kirk J. Wolden
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fread
Represented By: Sean F Rommel
Represented By: Hiryle Ryan Lutz, III
Represented By: F. Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Kirk J. Wolden
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.