J & J Sport Productions, Inc., v. Munguia

Plaintiff: J & J Sport Productions, Inc.,
Defendant: Baudelia Munguia
Case Number: 5:2013cv02004
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553 Communications Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
April 17, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 16 Motion to Alter Judgment.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
June 4, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 18 Motion to Set Aside Default. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sport Productions, Inc., v. Munguia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sport Productions, Inc.,
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baudelia Munguia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.