J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Nguyen et al

Defendant: Britannia Arms Pub & Restaurant, Inc. and Xuanlan Nguyen
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02008
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553 Communications Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DECEMBER 19, 2013, AT 1:30 P.M.; REFERRING PARTIES TO COURT MEDIATION WITH A DEADLINE OF FEBRUARY 4, 2014 (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
December 19, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/19/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
January 7, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
March 14, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/14/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 18, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Staying Case. The Clerk shall administratively close the case file. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/18/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Nguyen et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britannia Arms Pub & Restaurant, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xuanlan Nguyen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]