Mordaunt v. Bausch & Lomb, Inc.,

Defendant: Bausch & Lomb, Inc.,
Plaintiff: David Mordaunt
Case Number: 5:2013cv02026
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 18 Selecting ADR Process. Case Referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/28/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
September 18, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 31 to Continue Hearing on Motion to Transfer and to Continue Case Management Conference. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/18/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 16 Motion to Transfer Case to the Central District of California.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mordaunt v. Bausch & Lomb, Inc.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch & Lomb, Inc.,
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Represented By: Diamond M Hicks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mordaunt
Represented By: Eleanor Catherine Schuermann
Represented By: Thomas Tae Kim
Represented By: Eric Christopher Kastner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]