Sanchez v. Peacock Cupertino, Inc et al

Defendant: Veeravenkata Durgaprasad Vasireddy, Ramchander Gopalswamy, Jam and Ram and Peacock Cupertino, Inc
Plaintiff: Nahum Hernandez Sanchez
Case Number: 5:2013cv02107
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 12 to Remand to State Court. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/27/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
October 2, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of jurisdiction and revoking 13 Remand Order because case was never filed in state court. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 8, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court *****FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCKET No. 16*****
October 8, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending 14 Order Dismissing Case (correcting the case number in the Order) (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Peacock Cupertino, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veeravenkata Durgaprasad Vasireddy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramchander Gopalswamy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jam and Ram
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peacock Cupertino, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nahum Hernandez Sanchez
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]