Zig Zag Holdings LLC v. Hubbard et al

Defendant: Glen Hubbard, Inc., Glen K. Hubbard, Lynn Simon and Does 1-10, inclusive
Plaintiff: Zig Zag Holdings LLC
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02643
Filed: June 10, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 26 Featured Case JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER.(PRIOR MOTIONS TO APPEAR BY PHONE TERMINATED AS MOOT) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
October 23, 2013 31 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/22/13. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
April 25, 2014 46 Featured Case ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL 36 38 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/25/2014 (tfS, COURT STAFF).The parties shall file these supplemental briefs, along with any materials from the bankruptcy court record, no later than May 5, 2014. Counsel are reminded to provide the Court with chambers copies of all filings
June 6, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 11, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 38 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 23, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 60 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
July 9, 2014 64 Featured Case ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL AND REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 25, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS 62 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zig Zag Holdings LLC v. Hubbard et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Hubbard, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen K. Hubbard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Simon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zig Zag Holdings LLC
Represented By: Ian Fischer Burns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]