Prussin et al v. Bekins Van Lines, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Prussin and Judy M. Prussin
Defendant: Bekins Van Lines, LLC, Bekins Van Lines, Inc., Triple Crown Maffucci Storage Corporation and Does 1-5, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2013cv02874
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 41 defendant Triple Crown Maffucci Storage Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 10, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Status Conference. Conference set for 2/24/2015, 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/10/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
April 3, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd CONDITIONALLY granting 49 Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for defendant Bekins Van Lines LLC. 4/7/2015 hearing vacated. Motion granted subject to the condition that papers may continue to be served on attorney Gregg Garfinkel for forwarding purposes, unless and until Bekins Van Lines LLC appears through other counsel. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prussin et al v. Bekins Van Lines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Prussin
Represented By: Gavin E Kogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy M. Prussin
Represented By: Gavin E Kogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bekins Van Lines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bekins Van Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple Crown Maffucci Storage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]