Ligon v. California Highway Patrol et al

Defendant: Joseph Farrow, California Highway Patrol, Joe Lafuaci and Cory Walczak
Plaintiff: James Ligon
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02875
Filed: June 21, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2013 12 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 10 to Dismiss Second, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Causes of Action. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/19/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
February 19, 2014 19 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 16 Re: Selection of ADR Process. Case Referred to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/19/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
May 30, 2014 26 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 23 Re: Continuance of ENE Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/30/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
August 12, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/12/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
September 27, 2013 8 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 7 to Continue Case Management Conference and Dismissal of Defendants California Highway Patrol and Commissioner Joseph Farrow. California Highway Patrol and Joseph Farrow (California Highway Patrol Commissioner) Terminated. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/27/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ligon v. California Highway Patrol et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Farrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lafuaci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Walczak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ligon
Represented By: Nelson Karl McElmurry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]