Mohebbi v. Khazen et al

Defendant: U.S. Immigration Investment Center LLC, Conti Stacey, Pirooz Parvarandeh, Violet Parvarandeh, Michael Shadman, Mahnaz Khazen, USIIC LLP, USIIC I LP and Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Plaintiff: Saeid Mohebbi
Case Number: 5:2013cv03044
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/10/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 15, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 11 Motion for TRO.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 25, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
December 9, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Regarding Correct Case Management Conference Date. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/9/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
April 21, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/21/2014. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
May 9, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/12/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Hearing to be held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman Courtroom #3, 5th Floor 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/09/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 13, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman denying 54 Motion to Shorten Time. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
June 23, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting in part and denying in part 34 48 Motion to Dismiss; granting 50 Motion to Amend/Correct; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document no later than July 14, 2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohebbi v. Khazen et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration Investment Center LLC
Represented By: Edward Gartenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conti Stacey
Represented By: Edward Gartenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pirooz Parvarandeh
Represented By: Edward Gartenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Violet Parvarandeh
Represented By: Edward Gartenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shadman
Represented By: Edward Gartenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahnaz Khazen
Represented By: Edward Gartenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USIIC LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USIIC I LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saeid Mohebbi
Represented By: Edward Gartenberg
Represented By: Aria Vatankhah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]