Abiola v. HVM, LLC et al

Defendant: Does 1 through 14, inclusive and HVM, LLC
Plaintiff: Moses O. Abiola
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv03496
Filed: July 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge Spero For All Purposes. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/18/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 20, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/20/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE GREWAL. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/20/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
March 3, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend Claims Two, Seven, Eleven and Twelve Within Thirty Days and vacating March 14, 2014 motion hearing; Case Management Conference set for March 14, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. is moved to 2:00 pm on the same date (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
May 27, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Dismiss, vacating motion hearing and moving May 30, 2014 Case Management Conference from 9:30 am to 2:00 pm. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
June 4, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS AND RULE 12(b)(6) DISMISSAL MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/3/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 18, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO COURT'S MAY 27, 2014 ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 18, 2014. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Abiola v. HVM, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 14, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVM, LLC
Represented By: Mary Delia Walsh
Represented By: Lindbergh Porter, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses O. Abiola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]