HOD Carriers Local 166 West Bay Consolidated Pension Fund v. James Island Plastering, Inc.,

Defendant: James Island Plastering, Inc.,
Plaintiff: HOD Carriers Local 166 West Bay Consolidated Pension Fund
Case Number: 5:2013cv03545
Filed: July 31, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ORDER, re 16 . 11/5/2013 Case Management Conference is continued to 1/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/4/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
January 3, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ORDER: 1/7/2014 Case Management Conference is continued to 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/3/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
February 10, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ORDER, granting 20 . 2/11/2014 Case Management Conference is continued to 4/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/10/2014. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOD Carriers Local 166 West Bay Consolidated Pension Fund v. James Island Plastering, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Island Plastering, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOD Carriers Local 166 West Bay Consolidated Pension Fund
Represented By: Sue Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.